Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 88263
Short Caption:FAIR MAPS NEV. VS. JENG (BALLOT ISSUE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 23 OC 00138 1B
Carson City - First Judicial District - 23 OC 00137 1B
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/11/2024 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/11/2024How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2024Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/11/2024Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (23 OC 00138 1B). (SC)24-08584
03/11/2024Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (23 OC 00137 1B). (SC)24-08585
03/11/2024Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC)24-08588
03/11/2024Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from McDonald Carano. Check no. 119750. (SC)
03/11/2024MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion to Expedite and Resolve Appeal on the District Court Record(SC)24-08709
03/13/2024MotionFiled Respondent's (Eric Jenga) Partial Opposition To Appellant's Emergency Motion To Expedite And Resolve Appeal On District Court Record. (SC)24-08985
03/14/2024Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting in Part Motion to Expedite and Scheduling Oral Argument. Appellant has filed a motion seeking to expedite this appeal raising a ballot question by resolving it on the district court record after oral argument, pointing to a June 26, 2024, deadline for obtaining signatures to qualify for the ballot. Respondent Eric Jeng opposes the motion to the extent it seeks consideration of the appeal without briefing. We grant the motion to the following extent. Appellant shall have until March 20, 2024, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondents shall have until March 27, 2024, to file and serve answering briefs. Appellant shall file any reply brief by April 1, 2024. No extensions to the deadlines set forth in this order will be granted absent demonstration of extraordinary and compelling circumstances by written motion. Oral argument is scheduled as set forth below, and this court will expedite its consideration of this matter to the extent that its docket permits. Oral argument is scheduled for April 11, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. The parties shall have 2 minutes of uninterrupted argument at the beginning of each side's presentation in addition to 15 minutes each of argument time. The argument shall be limited to a total of 34 minutes. (SC)24-09079
03/19/2024Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries - Docket Sheet. (SC)24-09676
03/19/2024Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)24-09788
03/20/2024BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)24-09953
03/20/2024AppendixFiled Appellant's Joint Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol.1. (SC)24-09954
03/20/2024AppendixFiled Appellant's Joint Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol.2. (SC)24-09955
03/26/2024Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)24-10712
03/26/2024Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Eric Jeng) Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument for David Fox. (SC)24-10775
03/27/2024BriefFiled Respondent's (Francisco Aguilar) Answering Brief. (SC)24-10910
03/27/2024BriefFiled Respondent's (Eric Jeng) Answering Brief. (SC)24-11032
04/01/2024AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. (SC)24-11575
04/01/2024BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)24-11580
04/02/2024Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/02/2024Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument for Jessica Whelan. (SC)24-11663
04/02/2024MotionFiled Las Vegas Review Journal's Request for Permission to Records Oral Argument. (SC).24-11707
04/02/2024Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. A request having been made by Jessica Hill with the Las Vegas Review-Journal seeking access to the Supreme Court oral arguments for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held on April 11, 2024, beginning at 1:30 p.m., in the Las Vegas courtroom, in the above-entitled matter; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all persons participating in such photographic or electronic coverage shall observe the standards set forth in the Supreme Court Rules in all respects. Jessica Hill with the Las Vegas Review-Journal is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. (SC)24-11735
04/11/2024Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day before the En Banc Court. Case submitted for decision. (SC)
05/10/2024Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." En Banc (SC)24-16394
06/04/2024RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)24-19495
06/04/2024Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/13/2024RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on 6/6/24. (SC)24-19495