Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/05/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
02/05/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 15-03921
|
02/05/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 15-03924
|
02/05/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 15-03926
|
02/05/2015 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Alex B. Ghibaudo | | |
02/09/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 15-04217
|
02/12/2015 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. | | 15-04802
|
02/23/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Cross-Appeal. (Welt) | | |
02/23/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Welt) | | 15-05627
|
02/23/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Respondent/Cross-Appellants, Welt) | | 15-05630
|
02/23/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 15-05632
|
02/26/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 15-06081
|
02/27/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Michael P. Lowry. E-payment Ref. No. 15022762434220. (Cross-Appeal) | | |
03/02/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Case Appeal Statement). | | 15-06367
|
03/03/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 15-06558
|
03/13/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Service of Case Appeal Statement. | | 15-07775
|
03/18/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-08356
|
03/20/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and Settlement Judge is working with counsel to schedule mediation session. | | 15-08609
|
03/25/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge). | | 15-09015
|
04/20/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 4, 2015, at 9:30 a.m. Nos. 67363/67596 | | 15-11927
|
05/08/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these (2) matters. Docket Nos 67363/67596. | | 15-14208
|
05/12/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal 67363. Nos. 67363/67596 | | 15-14477
|
05/20/2015 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and Countermotion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Sanctions Against Respondents and the Law Firm of Thorndal, Armstrong Et Al. | | 15-15434
|
05/26/2015 | Motion | Filed Reply re Motion to Dismiss. | | 15-15977
|
06/19/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: Consolidate Appeals/No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellants/cross-respondents (Shapiro) and respondents/cross-appellants (Welt): 15 days transcript request. Shapiros' opening brief and appendix due: 90 days; Welts' combined answering/opening brief due: 45 days from service of opening brief; Shapiros' combined reply/answering brief due: 30 days from service of answering/opening brief; Welts' reply brief on cross-appeal due: 14 days from service of combined reply answering brief. fn1[ The Welts' May 12, 2015, motion to dismiss Docket No. 67363 is denied. The Shapiros' May 20, 2015, countermotion for fees, costs, and sanctions in Docket No. 67363 is denied.] Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-18813
|
07/07/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/24/14. To Court Reporter: Tracy Rawlinson. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-20513
|
07/07/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/24/14 To Court Reporter: Tracy Rawlinson. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-20514
|
08/06/2015 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Traci Rawlinson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/24/14. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-23692
|
09/14/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants/Cross-Respondents Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 1, 2015. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-27807
|
10/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Extend Time for Opening Brief and Appendix Already Filed and Completed. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-29906
|
10/21/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix, provisionally received in this court via E-flex on October 2, 2015. Respondents/cross-appellants in Docket No. 67363 shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 67363, and opening brief in Docket No. 67596, as well as a single combined appendix on cross-appeal in Docket No. 67363 and appendix on appeal in Docket No. 67596. Appellants/cross-respondents in Docket No. 67363 shall have 30 days from service of the combined brief to file and serve a single combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 67363, and answering brief in Docket No. 67596. Finally, respondents/cross-appellants in Docket No. 67363 shall have 14 days from service of the combined brief to file and serve a single combined reply brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 67363 and reply brief on appeal in Docket No. 67596, if deemed necessary. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-32028
|
10/21/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-32031
|
10/21/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-32033
|
11/23/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike New Argument from Appellant's Opening Brief in 67363. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-35772
|
11/23/2015 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix (67596). Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-35808
|
11/23/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief (67363) & Opening Brief (67596). | | 15-35829
|
12/04/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent/cross-appellants have filed a motion to strike a portion of the opening brief in this appeal on the ground that it raises a new constitutional argument that was not raised in the district court and not noted in the docketing statement. Having considered the motion, we deny it. This court retains the discretion to consider claims of constitutional error raised for the first time on appeal. Accordingly, we deny the motion. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-37040
|
12/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to File Supplemental Answering Brief in 67363. | | 15-37140
|
12/14/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae and to Participate in Oral Argument. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-37959
|
12/17/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Filing Consent for NPA, TripAdvisor, and Yelp to File Brief as Amici Curiae. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-38658
|
12/18/2015 | Motion | Filed Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to File Supplemental Answering Brief in 67363. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-38735
|
12/23/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief in Docket No. 67363 and the answering brief in Docket No. 67596 due: January 6, 2016. (appellant/cross-respondents) Nos. 67363/67596. | | 15-39507
|
01/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-00418
|
01/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to extend time to file appellant's answering brief and reply brief and stipulation to permit filing of a supplement answering brief by respondent. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-00433
|
01/07/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawing Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief 1-7-16. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-00501
|
01/07/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Robert Noggle and Alex Ghibaudo to Replace Evan Schwab as counsel for Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Howard and Jenna Shapiro). | | 16-00519
|
01/21/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. We direct the clerk of this court to file amici's brief, received on December 14, 2015. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental answering brief received on December 7, 2015. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single combined reply brief in Docket No. 67363 and answering brief in Docket No. 67596. Appellants in Docket No. 67596 shall have 30 days from the date of service of the answering brief to file and serve a reply brief in Docket No. 67596, if deemed necessary. fn1[We deny amici's request for leave to participate in oral argument without prejudice to our right to order participation if oral argument is scheduled.] Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-02091
|
01/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief - Amici Curiae by Nevada Press Association, TripAdvisor, Inc., and Yelp, Inc. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-02092
|
01/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Answering Brief in Docket No. 67363. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-02093
|
02/11/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Answering Brief (67596) and Reply Brief (67363). Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-04490
|
02/17/2016 | Brief | Filed Welts' Reply Brief re 67363 (Cross-Appeal) & 67596. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-04997
|
02/19/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 67363/67596. | | |
06/07/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-17652
|
07/29/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Law Firm - Attorney Michael Lowry is now with the law firm of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP. (Substitution of Attorney for Glenn Welt, Rhoda Welt, Lynn Welt, and Michele Welt). Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-23679
|
08/01/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Alex Ghibaudo of G Law to Replace Robert Noggle of Noggle Law as counsel for Appellant/Cross-Respondent). Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-23757
|
10/04/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, November 18, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 16-30888
|
11/08/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 16-34874
|
11/09/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion of Amici Curiae Nevada Press Association, Tripadvisor, Inc., and Yelp, Inc. for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-34949
|
11/10/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Expedited Response. On November 9, 2016, amici curiae filed a motion for leave to participate in the oral argument of these consolidated cases, scheduled for November 18, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Having reviewed the motion, we conclude that an expedited response would assist the court in deciding the motion. Accordingly, appellant shall have until 12:00 noon on Monday, November 14, 2016, to file a response to the motion. Amici curiae shall have until 4:00 p.m. on Monday, November 14, 2016, to file a reply. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-35150
|
11/16/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Amici Curiae's Motion To Participate In Oral Argument. Extraordinary reasons having been demonstrated, amici curiae's unopposed motion for leave to participate in the oral argument of these consolidated cases is granted. NRAP 29(h). The oral argument, scheduled for 30 minutes on November 18, 2016, at 10:30 a.m., is hereby extended to allow amici curiae a maximum of ten minutes to argue. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-35634
|
11/16/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Amici Curiae's Motion To Participate In Oral Argument. Extraordinary reasons having been demonstrated, amici curiae's unopposed motion for leave to participate in the oral argument of these consolidated cases is granted. NRAP 29(h). The oral argument, scheduled for 30 minutes on November 18, 2016, at 10:30 a.m., is hereby extended to allow amici curiae a maximum of ten minutes to argue. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-35635
|
11/17/2016 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter Requesting Permission to Allow Video Camera's in Court Room for Oral Argument being held 11/18/16 @ 10:30 AM (8 News Now) Via Fax. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-35957
|
11/17/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Oral Arguments Currently Scheduled for November 18, 2016. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 16-35985
|
11/17/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Stipulation to Continue Oral Arguments Currently Scheduled for November 18, 2016. Nos. 67363/67596). | | 16-36003
|
11/17/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument, rescheduling Oral Argument, and Granting Media Request. Oral argument of this matter, scheduled for November 18, 2016, at 10:30 a.m., is hereby vacated. we direct the clerk of this court to reschedule this matter for argument on Wednesday, December 7, 2016, at 11;30 a.m. at the regional Justice Center in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 40 minutes. Permission for photographic or electronic coverage of the hearings is granted. Dennis Neuhausel of KLAS-TV is designated as pool coordinator. Nos. 67363/67596 | | 16-36016
|
11/23/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 16-36599
|
12/07/2016 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. NNP MC/MD/MG | | |
02/02/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded with instructions." Before: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas.133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6. NNP16D-MC/MD/MG | | 17-03797
|
02/06/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 67363/67596. | | 17-04087
|
02/06/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael P. Lowry | | |
03/31/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 67363/67596. | | 17-10847
|
04/25/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-13617
|
04/25/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
05/15/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2017. | | 17-13617
|