Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
20-45224: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81966
Short Caption:CARTER VS. DUCKSWORTH (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81966-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D550112Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/20/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Due. (SC)
10/20/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-38400
10/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-38402
10/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC)
11/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Emily Stevens Services. Check no. 5195. (SC)
11/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC)20-40145
11/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC)20-42961
12/02/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-43561
12/02/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript Request Form. (SC)20-43564
12/02/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/9/20, 9/1/20, and 9/17/20. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (SC)20-43567
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's pro se motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. The transcript request form was filed on December 2, 2020. (SC)20-44406
12/14/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Stay Change of Custody Pending Appeal and Related Relief. (SC)20-45221
12/14/2020Fast Track BriefFiled Proper Person's Fast Track Statement. (SC)20-45224
12/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 - 10 via FTP. (SC)20-46012
12/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Emily McFarling, Esq. and Ashlee Vazquez, Esq. of McFarling Law Group appearing as counsel for respondent. (SC)20-46029
12/28/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 147 to 156, 226 to 236, 562 to 572, 1550 to 1559 and 1579 to 1589 (SEALED). (SC)
12/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorneys Emily McFarling and Ashlee Vazquez have filed a notice of appearance on behalf of respondent. Accordingly, Ms. McFarling and Ms. Vazquez shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opposition to appellant's motion for stay filed on December 14, 2020. (SC)20-46631
12/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Transcription Video Services / Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/9/20, 9/1/20, and 9/17/20. (SC)20-46904
12/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: January 11, 2021. (SC)20-46917
12/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's response to appellant's motion to stay due: January 11, 2021. (SC)20-46918
01/08/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion to Stay Change of Custody Pending Appeal and Related Relief. (SC)21-00698
01/11/2021Fast Track BriefFiled Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC)21-00828
01/11/2021TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Transcript Re: All Pending Motions June 9,2020. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/11/21) (SC)
01/11/2021TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Transcript Re: All Pending Motions September 1,2020. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/11/21) (SC)
01/11/2021TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Transcript Re: All Pending Motions September 17,2020. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/11/21) (SC)
01/11/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)21-00840
01/11/2021Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. (SC)
01/15/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. (SC)21-01507
01/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for stay pending appeal. Having considered the motion and opposition, as well as the documents before this court, we are not convinced that the relevant factors under NRAP 8(d) support granting a stay. Accordingly, the motion is denied. (SC)21-02056
01/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-02298
01/25/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15113
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15113