Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/04/2015 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
11/04/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 15-33583
|
11/04/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 15-33585
|
11/04/2015 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | | 15-33610
|
11/12/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. | | 15-34546
|
11/16/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 15-34979
|
11/19/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate that no Transcript is Being Requested. | | 15-35365
|
11/24/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 15-36042
|
12/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc. | | 15-37213
|
12/21/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the motion to dismiss received on December 7, 2015. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response to the motion that shall not exceed 18 pages, and respondents shall have 5 days from service of the response to file and serve any reply. | | 15-38941
|
12/21/2015 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc. | | 15-38942
|
12/22/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal due: January 14, 2016. | | 15-39185
|
01/15/2016 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction. | | 16-01457
|
01/25/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents reply to response to motion to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction due: February 9, 2016. | | 16-02469
|
02/02/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order Extending Brieifing Schedule Until Issuance of Decision on Motion to Dismiss. | | 16-03517
|
02/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Exceed the Page Limit for their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc. | | 16-04350
|
02/17/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's response to the motion to exceed the page limit for respondents' reply due: March 7, 2016. | | 16-05127
|
03/08/2016 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, etc. and Appellant's Motion to Strike. | | 16-07286
|
03/15/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exceed the Page Limit for their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc. | | 16-08110
|
03/17/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike. | | 16-08443
|
03/23/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Appellant's Motion to Strike. | | 16-09245
|
09/21/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitted For Decision Without Oral Argument. (RESCINDED PER 9/21/16 ORDER.) | | 16-29235
|
09/21/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order. On September 21, 2016, an order submitting this matter for decision without oral argument was erroneously filed in this matter. Accordingly, the order is hereby rescinded. | | 16-29365
|
11/28/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's motion to strike is denied. Respondents' motion to exceed the page limit for their reply in support of their motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the reply received on February 10, 2016, and the supplemental exhibits to the motion to dismiss, received on February 17, 2016. Briefing in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. fn1[Based on this order, we take no action on the parties' stipulation to extend the briefing schedule, filed February 2, 2016.] | | 16-36735
|
11/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc. | | 16-36736
|
11/28/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Exhibits to Their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc. | | 16-36737
|
06/29/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Appeal dismissed." Before: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., dissenting. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. SNP16P-KP/JH/RP (OPINION VACATED PER ORDER 12/20/17). | | 17-21671
|
07/07/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Rehearing due: July 31, 2017. | | 17-22533
|
08/01/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-25425
|
08/01/2017 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
08/01/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondents' Answer due: 15 days. | | 17-25501
|
08/03/2017 | Brief | Filed City of Reno's Amicus Curiae Brief Supporting Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-25901
|
08/10/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-26828
|
08/11/2017 | Motion | Filed Nevada State Contractors Board Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For Rehearing. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF FROM MOTION AND RETURNED UNFILED PER 8/23/17 ORDER.) | | 17-26972
|
08/16/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to the Petition for Rehearing due: August 30, 2017. | | 17-27349
|
08/23/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions and Rejecting Briefs. The motions for leave to file amicus briefs in support of appellant's petition for rehearing are granted. However, we are unable to file the submitted amicus briefs at this time because they contain formatting deficiencies. We direct the clerk of this court to reject the brief submitted via E-Flex on August 9, 2017, and detach the brief from the motion filed on August 11, 2017, and return it unfiled. The Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners and the Nevada State Contractors Board Amicus Briefs due: 5 days. Respondents Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: September 15, 2017. | | 17-28231
|
08/23/2017 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-28371
|
08/24/2017 | Brief | Filed Nevada State Contractor Board's Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For Rehearing. | | 17-28461
|
09/18/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-31336
|
09/29/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Pickering, J., dissenting. | | 17-33162
|
10/03/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. Updated Docket Sheet. | | 17-33555
|
10/05/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: October 30, 2017. | | 17-33845
|
10/31/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 17-37266
|
10/31/2017 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived | | |
11/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Nevada State Contractors Board's Motion To File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For En Banc Reconsideration. | | 17-37771
|
11/03/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. | | 17-37801
|
11/09/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 11/17/17.) | | 17-38789
|
11/17/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: December 4, 2017. | | 17-39694
|
11/17/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall detach the amicus brief from the Board of Medical Examiners' motion filed on November 9, 2017, and file it separately. The Contractors Board shall have until November 27, 2017, to file and serve its amicus brief. | | 17-39769
|
11/17/2017 | Brief | Filed The State of Nevada Board of Medical Examiners' Amicus Brief. | | 17-39777
|
11/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Nevada State Contractors Board's Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For En Banc Review. | | 17-40312
|
12/05/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 17-41730
|
12/20/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. This appeal is reinstated and the opinion dismissing the appeal entered on June 29, 2017, is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this appeal for argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. | | 17-43997
|
01/22/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, March 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 18-02811
|
02/16/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-06429
|
02/27/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Tracy Chase and Yvonne Nevarez-Goodson to argue on behalf of Appellant Nevada Commission on Ethics). | | 18-07572
|
02/27/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Kevin Powers to argue on behalf of Respondents Ira Hansen and Jim Wheeler). | | 18-07701
|
02/27/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). | | 18-07758
|
03/01/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-08268
|
03/05/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
05/31/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Appeal dismissed." Before the court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., with whom Douglas, C.J., and Stiglich, J., agree, dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 40. EN BANC | | 18-20690
|
06/25/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-24089
|
06/25/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/09/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 26, 2018. | | 18-24089
|