Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/01/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
12/01/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 17-41462
|
12/01/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 17-41465
|
12/01/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 17-41467
|
12/04/2017 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz | | |
12/04/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 17-41603
|
12/06/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 17-42038
|
12/08/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. | | 17-42391
|
12/20/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 17-43981
|
12/21/2017 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 17-44097
|
12/26/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-44420
|
12/28/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/01/16, 02/07/17, 02/16/17, 03/30/17, 09/14/17, 10/02/17. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. | | 17-44809
|
01/05/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/01/16, 02/07/17, 02/16/17, 03/30/17, 09/14/17, 10/02/17. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. | | 18-00632
|
01/22/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/7/17, 10/2/17 and 10/3/17. Proceedings were not requested to be reported on 9/1/16, 2/16/17, 3/30/17 and 9/14/17; therefore, there is o record to produce. | | 18-02773
|
03/20/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 4, 2018. | | 18-10925
|
04/05/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-12965
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1, Part 1. | | 18-12977
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1, Part 2. | | 18-13044
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1, Part 3. | | 18-13045
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2, Part 1. | | 18-13047
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2, Part 2. | | 18-13049
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3, Part 1. | | 18-13050
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3, Part 2. | | 18-13051
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4, Part 1. | | 18-13052
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4, Part 2. | | 18-13055
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5, Part 1. | | 18-13056
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5, Part 2. | | 18-13057
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5, Part 3. | | 18-13058
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6, Part 1. | | 18-13059
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6, Part 2. | | 18-13060
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. | | 18-13062
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. | | 18-13063
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. | | 18-13084
|
04/30/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Between All Counsel For Extension Of Time For Respondent To File Answering Brief. | | 18-16320
|
04/30/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 4, 2018. | | 18-16324
|
06/04/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Four-Day Extension to File Answering Brief. | | 18-21126
|
06/19/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received via E-Flex on June 7, 2018. | | 18-23254
|
06/19/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 18-23255
|
06/19/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. | | 18-23256
|
07/19/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 2, 2018. | | 18-27638
|
07/31/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Michael F. Bohn in place of Richard Vilkin for Respondent). | | 18-29361
|
08/02/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Between All Counsel for Extension of Time for Appellant to File Reply Brief. | | 18-29756
|
08/07/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 9, 2018. | | 18-30203
|
08/09/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-30646
|
08/09/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
07/03/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Vacated and Remanded." Before: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC) | | 19-28443
|
07/22/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-30911
|
07/22/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael F. Bohn. (SC) | | |
07/22/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED: DUPLICATE PETITION FOR REHEARING). (SC) | | |
07/23/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael F. Bohn. (SC) | | |
08/20/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: 14 days. (SC). | | 19-34889
|
08/28/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: September 17, 2019. (SC) | | 19-35996
|
09/16/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Filing Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-38560
|
09/18/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's Answer to the Petition for Rehearing due: October 1, 2019. (SC). | | 19-38993
|
09/23/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-39558
|
11/01/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC). | | 19-44978
|
11/26/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-48270
|
11/26/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/13/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 3, 2019. (SC) | | 19-48270
|