Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
18-24597: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70220
Short Caption:IN RE: N.J., A MINOR CHILDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 1510DC1243Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Juvenile
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/07/2017 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/21/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Juvenile Matter.
04/21/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED).
05/10/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.16-14621
08/18/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 2, 2016.16-25664
08/26/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kathy Terhune stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/16/16.16-26628
08/31/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.16-27164
09/07/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-27719
09/26/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address of Law Firm. Attorney Troy C. Jordan's Notice of Change of Law Firm.16-29812
10/11/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: October 21, 2016.16-31547
10/20/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-32897
11/21/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: December 5, 2016.16-36241
12/05/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-37553
12/05/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/25/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-13612
09/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 7, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-32458
10/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-36259
11/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
06/28/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 48.18-24597
07/23/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-28000
07/23/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/27/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 24, 2018.18-28000