Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/12/2013 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
12/12/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 13-37566
|
12/12/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days | | 13-37571
|
01/02/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Franny A. Forsman appearing on behalf of Appellant). | | 14-00025
|
01/02/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 14-00027
|
01/06/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 14-00361
|
01/17/2014 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeals and to Remove Appeal No. 64609 from the Fast Track Program. Nos.64591/64609. | | 14-01781
|
01/21/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice/Request re: Transcripts. | | 14-01994
|
01/21/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Erratum to Notice/Request re: Transcripts. | | 14-02012
|
01/27/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We construe Desai's notice as a notice that no transcripts are being requested. We deny as moot Desai's request to suspend the requirement to request transcripts. The motion to consolidate these appeals is denied. Lakeman also requests removal of his appeal from the fast track program. We agree that full briefing of that appeal is warranted and grant the motion to remove Lakeman's appeal from the fast track program. Lakeman shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Fn1[Lakeman's request for an extension of time to file the fast track statement is denied as moot.] Nos. 64591/64609. | | 14-02686
|
03/17/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Janiie L. Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 4/22/13 and 6/27/13. | | 14-08615
|
04/03/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (120 days). | | 14-10683
|
04/21/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 21, 2014. | | 14-12798
|
07/11/2014 | Motion | Filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 14-22645
|
07/18/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 2, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 14-23377
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 | | 14-28697
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 | | 14-28698
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3 | | 14-28699
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4 | | 14-28700
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5 | | 14-28701
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6 | | 14-28702
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7 | | 14-28704
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8 | | 14-28705
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9 | | 14-28707
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10 | | 14-28708
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11 | | 14-28709
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12 | | 14-28711
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13 | | 14-28713
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14 | | 14-28714
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15 | | 14-28715
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 16 | | 14-28718
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 17 | | 14-28719
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 18 | | 14-28720
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 19 | | 14-28721
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 20 | | 14-28722
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 21 | | 14-28723
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 22 | | 14-28724
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 23 | | 14-28727
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 23, (Continued) | | 14-28729
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 24 | | 14-28731
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 25 | | 14-28732
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 26 | | 14-28734
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 27 | | 14-28736
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 28 | | 14-28737
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 29 | | 14-28738
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 30 | | 14-28739
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 31 | | 14-28740
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 32 | | 14-28741
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 33 | | 14-28743
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 34 | | 14-28744
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 35 | | 14-28746
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 36 | | 14-28747
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 37 | | 14-28748
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 38 | | 14-28749
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 39 | | 14-28750
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 40 | | 14-28751
|
09/02/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 41 | | 14-28753
|
09/03/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to Exceed Page/Word Limit for Opening Brief. | | 14-28979
|
09/03/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. | | 14-29007
|
09/04/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. | | 14-29331
|
09/25/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Brief. We direct the clerk of this court to reject the brief received via E-Flex on September 3, 2014. Appellant shall have until October 3, 2014, to file and serve an opening brief that complies with NRAP 32 and does not exceed 20,825 words. | | 14-31986
|
09/30/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 14-32522
|
10/29/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief - First Request. | | 14-36048
|
11/03/2014 | Motion | Filed Notice of Non-Opposition to Extension of Time. | | 14-36189
|
11/06/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: December 29, 2014. | | 14-36755
|
12/29/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Second Request - Answering Brief). | | 14-42297
|
01/09/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 28, 2015, to file and serve the answering brief. | | 15-00991
|
01/28/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time - Third Request. | | 15-03069
|
01/30/2015 | Motion | Filed Opposition to State's Third Request for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief. | | 15-03239
|
02/03/2015 | Motion | Filed Response to Desai's Opposition to State's Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 15-03673
|
02/06/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 27, 2015. | | 15-04016
|
03/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Respondent's Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations. | | 15-06372
|
03/03/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on March 2, 2015. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 15-06683
|
03/03/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 15-06684
|
03/27/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief (First Request) | | 15-09400
|
03/27/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: May 2, 2015. | | 15-09417
|
03/30/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Corrected Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved: Reply Brief due date: May 4, 2015. | | 15-09467
|
04/30/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to Exceed Page/Word Limit for Reply Brief. | | 15-13206
|
05/15/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on April 30, 2015. | | 15-14921
|
05/15/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-14922
|
05/15/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
05/22/2015 | Motion | Filed Statement of Reasons for Scheduling Oral Argument. | | 15-15853
|
07/17/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Document. The motion to file the independent medical evaluation under seal is denied. The clerk shall return the appendix received on September 4, 2015, unfiled. District Court Clerk's Certified Copy of the Independent Medical Evaluation dated April 14, 2013, due: 15 days. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file the evaluation in this court's public file. | | 15-21622
|
07/28/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Independent Medical Evaluation. | | 15-22801
|
02/02/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 16-03483
|
02/03/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 5, 2016, at 11:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 16-03671
|
03/21/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 16-08826
|
03/31/2016 | Other | Chief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
04/05/2016 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
06/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Substitution of Personal Representative. | | 17-18776
|
06/14/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Substitute a Party. Appellant has filed a motion pursuant to NRAP 43 to substitute Kusum Desai as the personal representative of appellant Dipak Kantilal Desai, deceased. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption of this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. | | 17-19738
|
07/27/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Fn1[The honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter. The honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 48. EN BANC | | 17-24918
|
08/21/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-27807
|
08/21/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
09/01/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 28, 2017. | | 17-27807
|