Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/03/2015 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
11/03/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 15-33435
|
11/10/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 15-34274
|
11/16/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on 11/2/15. | | 15-34929
|
11/23/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/27/2014, 03/31/2014, 04/01/2014, 04/02/2014, 04/04/2014, 04/07/2014,
04/09/2014, 04/10/2014, 04/11/2014, 04/14/2014, 04/15/2014, 10/30/2014, 11/24/2014, 01/05/2015, 02/17/2015, 06/30/2015, and 10/27/2015. To Court Reporter: DC Dept. 12. | | 15-35877
|
12/29/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/3/14. To Court Reporter: DC Dept. 12. | | 15-39808
|
01/05/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Cornelius stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/25/14, 03/26/14, 03/27/14, 03/31/14, 04/01/14, 04/02/14, 04/03/14, 04/04/14, 04/07/14, 04/09/14, 04/10/14, 04/11/14, 04/15/14, 10/30/14, 11/24/14, 01/05/15, 02/17/15, 06/30/15, 10/27/15. | | 16-00248
|
03/02/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 16-06780
|
03/10/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 2, 2016. | | 16-07672
|
05/02/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 16-13557
|
05/11/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 1, 2016. | | 16-14752
|
06/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for extension of time to file opening brief. | | 16-17043
|
06/15/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 17, 2016. | | 16-18668
|
06/16/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's motion to enlarge page limitation on appellant's opening brief. | | 16-18963
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. | | 16-18964
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. | | 16-18965
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. | | 16-18966
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. | | 16-18967
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. | | 16-18990
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. | | 16-18991
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. | | 16-18992
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8. | | 16-18993
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9. | | 16-18994
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10. | | 16-18995
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11. | | 16-18998
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12. | | 16-18999
|
06/16/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13. | | 16-18996
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14. | | 16-19003
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15. | | 16-19002
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 16. | | 16-19005
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 17. | | 16-19006
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 18. | | 16-19007
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 19. | | 16-19008
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 20. | | 16-19009
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 21. | | 16-19010
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 22. | | 16-19011
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 23. | | 16-19012
|
06/17/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 24. | | 16-19013
|
06/28/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on June 17, 2016. | | 16-20106
|
06/28/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-20107
|
07/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief). | | 16-23505
|
08/09/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: September 26, 2016. | | 16-24643
|
09/26/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief). | | 16-29875
|
10/07/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: October 26, 2016. | | 16-31350
|
10/26/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - Third Request (Answering Brief). | | 16-33546
|
11/23/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief, provisionally received in this court on November 17, 2016. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 16-36558
|
11/23/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-36559
|
12/23/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 16-39997
|
01/04/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: February 6, 2017. | | 17-00099
|
02/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time - Reply Brief. | | 17-04146
|
02/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on February 7, 2017. | | 17-05035
|
02/13/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-05037
|
02/13/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
03/08/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. | | 17-07851
|
03/08/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
04/06/2017 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
04/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Order Directing Scheduling of Oral Argument. The clerk shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-900680
|
04/14/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Thursday, May 18, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes. | | 17-900684
|
04/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion. to Reschedule Oral Argument Setting. | | 17-900793
|
05/02/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Vacating Oral Argument. We deny appellant's motion to reschedule the argument as moot. | | 17-900873
|
05/24/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG | | |
05/24/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG | | 17-901090
|
06/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-901194
|
06/23/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. Petition for Rehearing due: 7 days. | | 17-901309
|
06/30/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-901360
|
08/25/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 17-901757
|
09/13/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
09/13/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. | | 17-30828
|
09/13/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
09/13/2017 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
10/23/2017 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." NRAP 40 B fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] | | 17-36125
|
11/21/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-40139
|
11/21/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
12/07/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 28, 2017. | | 17-40139
|