Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/16/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
06/16/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-18886
|
06/16/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-18888
|
06/16/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lawrence J. Semenza III PC. Check No. 1270. | | |
06/17/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 16-19051
|
07/07/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-21059
|
07/25/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 30, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. | | 16-23053
|
09/02/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-27456
|
09/06/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-27555
|
09/21/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 16-29254
|
11/21/2016 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Opening Brief. | | 16-36298
|
12/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 3, 2017. | | 16-37191
|
01/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeal With Appeal Number 71789 And Set Revised Briefing Schedule. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-01417
|
01/24/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Regarding Briefing. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have until March 31, 2017, to file and serve an opening brief. Appellant in Docket No. 71789 shall then have 30 days to file a combined answering brief and opening brief in regard to the appeal in Docket No. 71789. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 28.1(f)(1). Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-02536
|
03/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-08800
|
04/10/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have until May 1, 2017, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-11812
|
04/25/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name. The law firm of Lawrence J. Semenza, III. P.C. has changed its name to Semenza Kircher Rickard. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-13732
|
05/01/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14289
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14291
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14292
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14293
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14294
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14295
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 6. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14296
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 7. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14297
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 8. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14298
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 9. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14299
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 10. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14300
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 11. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14301
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 12. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14302
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 13. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14303
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 14. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14304
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 15. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14305
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 16. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14306
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 17. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14307
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 18. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14308
|
05/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-17750
|
05/26/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief due: June 30, 2017. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-17756
|
06/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-21481
|
07/31/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the appendix received via E-Flex on July 21, 2017; and the combined answering and opening brief received via E-Flex on July 23, 2017. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a combined reply and answering brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25352
|
07/31/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25357
|
07/31/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25358
|
07/31/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 3. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25359
|
07/31/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25361
|
08/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Wynn Las Vegas, LLC to File Combined Reply and Answering Brief - First Request. | | 17-28698
|
08/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: September 29, 2017. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-28700
|
09/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline to File Its Combined Reply and Answering Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-32623
|
10/16/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the combined brief received on October 13, 2017. Yvonne O'Connell shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief in Docket No. 71789, if deemed necessary. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-35348
|
10/16/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 17-35358
|
11/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-38004
|
11/06/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: December 18, 2017. | | 17-38013
|
12/14/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-43168
|
12/19/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's (Yvonne O'Connell in docket no. 71789) Reply Brief due: January 8, 2018. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-43814
|
01/04/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 18-00480
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00490
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00492
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00493
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00494
|
01/04/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant O'Connell's Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00525
|
01/04/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 70583/71789. | | |
01/18/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. Nos. 70583/71789 | | 18-02505
|
01/18/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
03/12/2018 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
03/15/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. . Voluntary Disclosure. For the record, I wish to disclose that I will be participating in an upcoming spring league tennis team with counsel for appellant, attorney Brian Nettles. I do not believe this situation mandates my disqualification from this matter. However, I make this disclosure so that any party who wishes to request my recusal may do so. Any such request must be made in writing and filed in clerk’s office within 10 days. fn1 [Any such response must be filed by faxing a copy of the response within 10 days, with the original version submitted by mail. The fax number for the clerk’s office is 775-684-1601.] Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-900512
|
05/22/2018 | Other | Justice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Nos. 70583/71789 | | |
08/30/2018 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We AFFIRM the judgment of the district court." Fn1[This appeal was consolidated with the appeal in Docket No. 71789 prior to briefing. We now deconsolidate these appeals for the purposes of disposition only. Accordingly. This order will only be filed within this appeal. The disposition for the appeal in Docket No. 71789 will be entered separately, within the appeal. Otherwise, the appeals remain consolidated for all other appellate purposes.] Tao, J., dissenting.Court of Appeals-MG/AS/JT | | |
08/30/2018 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We AFFIRM the judgment of the district court." Fn1[This appeal was consolidated with the appeal in Docket No. 71789 prior to briefing. We now deconsolidate these appeals for the purposes of disposition only. Accordingly. This order will only be filed within this appeal. The disposition for the appeal in Docket No. 71789 will be entered separately, within the appeal. Otherwise, the appeals remain consolidated for all other appellate purposes.] Tao, J., dissenting.Court of Appeals-MG/AS/JT | | 18-901953
|
09/14/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
09/14/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Respondent's Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-36089
|
09/14/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
09/14/2018 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
11/28/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer. Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Answer to Petition for Review due: 15 days. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 18-906002
|
12/13/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Response to Petition for Review. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 18-908493
|
01/07/2019 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Nos. 70583/71789 (SC) | | |
01/25/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review in Docket No. 70583. (THIS ORDER IS VACATED PER THE ORDER FILED 7/5/19.) fn1[Because neither party has sought our review in Docket No. 71789, we deconsolidate the appeals for all further appellate purposes. fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Chief Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself.] EN BANC Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 19-03911
|
01/25/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge, who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this
appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 19-03969
|
03/07/2019 | Motion | Filed Caesars Entertainment Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC). | | 19-10330
|
03/14/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Opposition to Caesars Entertainment Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief due: March 28, 2019. (SC) | | 19-11465
|
03/28/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 19-13858
|
04/01/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae is denied. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the brief of amicus curiae received via e-flex on March 7, 2019. (SC) | | 19-14135
|
04/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's Motion to Reconsider and Review Action of a Single Justice. (SC) | | 19-14548
|
04/10/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Opposition to Motion to Reconsider and Review Action of a Single Justice. (SC) | | 19-15597
|
04/26/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On April 1, 2019, this court entered an order denying the motion of Caesars Entertainment Corporation (Caesars) for leave to file an amicus brief in support of appellant. Caesars has filed a motion asking this court to reconsider its order. The court denies the motion for reconsideration. (SC). | | 19-18375
|
05/28/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice No Longer Disqualified. Upon further review, Chief Justice Gibbons is no longer disqualified and will be participating in the decision of this appeal. (SC) | | 19-23115
|
06/03/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, July 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. (SC) | | 19-23860
|
06/17/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 19-26150
|
07/02/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
07/05/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We vacate the order granting the petition for review and direct the clerk to issue the remittitur forthwith. fn2[The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participating in the decision in this matter.] (SC) | | 19-28669
|
07/05/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-28672
|
07/05/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC0 | | |
07/05/2019 | Case Status Update | No Disposition Filed/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
07/17/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 10, 2019. (SC) | | 19-28672
|