Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/05/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
12/05/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-49365
|
01/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-01595
|
01/24/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Counsel. (SC) | | 20-03517
|
01/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Rough Draft Transcript Request and Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-03555
|
01/24/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-03556
|
01/24/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). (SC) (REJECTED PER 02/04/20 ORDER). | | |
02/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's untimely motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement and transcript request form is granted. The docketing statement and rough draft transcript request form were filed on January 24, 2020. However, this court is unable to accept the rough draft transcript request form. This appeal is not subject to the fast track rules, see NRAP 3C(a)(3), and appellant must request certified transcripts rather than rough draft transcripts, see NRAP 9(a). In addition, the rough draft transcript request form does not bear the file-stamp of the district court clerk. See NRAP 9(a)(3)(1). Accordingly, the clerk shall reject the rough draft transcript request form filed on January 24, 2020. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: 7 days. Appellant has filed a pro se letter in which she points out counsel's failure to timely file the docketing statement and transcript request form and requests guidance regarding how to remedy counsel's "lack of interest." This court is confident that counsel for appellant will act diligently to meet all future deadlines in this appeal. (SC). | | 20-04771
|
02/10/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/12/19, 8/13/19, 8/14/19, 8/15/19, 8/16/19, 8/19/19, and 10/18/19. To Court Reporter: Gina Villani. (SC) | | 20-05597
|
03/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts. (SC). | | 20-11447
|
03/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Briefing. Court Reporter Gina Villani's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: April 29, 2020. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 28, 2020. (SC). | | 20-12282
|
04/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Appoint Appellate Counsel or, Alternatively, Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (SC) | | 20-16490
|
05/06/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/12/19, 8/19/19, 8/13/19, 8/14/19, 8/15/19, 8/16/19, 10/18/19. (SC) | | 20-17153
|
05/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Craig A. Mueller has filed a motion to appoint appellate counsel, or to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC). | | 20-17528
|
05/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Second Motion to Appoint Counsel or, Alternately, Motion to Withdraw as Appellate Counsel. (SC) | | 20-19693
|
06/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. Attorney Craig Mueller has filed a renewed motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. This is not a fast track appeal and is not governed by NRAP 3C(b)(2) as suggested in the motion. Nevertheless, the motion is granted. District Court's Order Appointing Counsel due: 37 days. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 20-21141
|
06/19/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Minute Order Appointing Counsel. Clark County Public Defender Appointed as Counsel for Appellant. Entered in district court on June 17, 2020. (SC) | | 20-22931
|
07/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The transcripts requested by appellant's previous counsel have been prepared and filed in the district court. If appellant requires the preparation of any additional transcripts, appellant shall file a serve a supplemental transcript request form within 14 days of the date of this order. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 20-25544
|
07/23/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Howard S. Brooks for Appellant. (SC) | | 20-26920
|
07/23/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested:02/09/18, 03/20/18, 04/05/18, 04/17/18, 05/03/18, 05/09/18, 05/17/18, 05/23/18, 05/31/18, 06/14/18, 06/19/18, 06/26/18, 07/05/18, 08/01/18, 08/15/18, 08/21/18, 09/25/18, 10/02/18, 10/11/18, 10/24/18, 11/20/18, 12/05/18, 01/08/19, 01/23/19, 02/20/19, 03/05/19, 03/07/19, 03/12/19, 03/19/19, 03/20/19, 05/15/19, 06/12/19, 07/10/19, 07/25/19, 08/08/19, 08/12/19, 08/13/19, 08/14/19, 08/15/19, 08/16/19 and 08/19/19. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins, Sara Richardson and Gina Villani. (SC) | | 20-26921
|
08/11/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/19/19, 08/08/19, 06/17/20. (SC). | | 20-29624
|
09/03/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Sharon Dickinson and Removing Howard S. Brooks. (SC) | | 20-32620
|
09/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Brooks as counsel of record for appellant and add Ms. Dickinson in his place. (SC) | | 20-33150
|
09/21/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/20/18, 4/15/18, 4/17/18, 5/3/18, 5/9/18, 5/17/18, 5/23/18, 5/31/18, 6/14/18, 6/19/18, 6/26/19, 7/5/18, 8/1/18, 8/15/18, 8/21/18, 9/25/18, 10/2/18, 10/11/18, 11/20/18, 12/5/18, 1/8/19, 1/23/19, 2/20/19, 3/5/19, 3/7/19, 3/12/19, 3/20/19, 5/15/19, 6/12.19, 7/10/19, and 7/25/19. | | 20-34645
|
10/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Motion for an extension of time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-36952
|
10/08/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Due date to file Opening Brief is November 9th, 2020. (SC) | | 20-37000
|
11/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-40968
|
11/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: January 14, 2021. (SC) | | 20-42031
|
01/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-01290
|
01/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 15, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-01972
|
03/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07405
|
03/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-08180
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 1 (SC) | | 21-08264
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 2 (SC) | | 21-08267
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-08268
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 4 (SC) | | 21-08269
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 5 (SC) | | 21-08272
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-08273
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-08275
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-08277
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-08279
|
03/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 10. (SC) | | 21-08278
|
03/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of Type Volume Limitations. (SC) | | 21-08358
|
03/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-08359
|
04/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The opening brief and appendix were filed on March 23, 2021. Respondent shall have until April 22, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-09960
|
04/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jonathan VanBoskerck. (SC) | | 21-11587
|
04/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-11588
|
04/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until June 21, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-12466
|
06/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-17570
|
06/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-18351
|
07/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits. (SC) | | 21-19806
|
07/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Excess Pages/Word Count for Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-19807
|
07/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 7/19/21). (SC) | | |
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-19809
|
07/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to State's Motion Seeking to File an Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations. (SC) | | 21-19899
|
07/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations. (SC) | | 21-19999
|
07/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. The clerk shall strike the answering brief filed on July 9, 2021. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief that contains no more than 20,000 words. (SC) | | 21-20690
|
07/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Original Exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court original State's Exhibits 105, 106, and 107, identified on the district court exhibit list as "DVD Westin Video," "DVD Westin Video Zoomed," and "DVD Caesar's Video" respectively. (SC) | | 21-21645
|
07/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-21684
|
08/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-23647
|
08/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date September 27, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23654
|
09/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-27779
|
09/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Transmit Exhibit. (SC) | | 21-27780
|
09/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Amended Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC) | | 21-27821
|
09/28/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting in Part Motion to Transmit Original Exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court original exhibit 110, identified on the district court exhibit list as "DVD (911 Calls)." The motion is denied without prejudice to the extent appellant seeks transmission of original exhibit 111. (SC) | | 21-29812
|
12/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for January 11, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-34511
|
12/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-36836
|
01/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Allow Oral Argument to be Conducted Via Video Conferencing Or by Appearing in Person in Las Vegas. (SC) | | 22-00060
|
01/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. The parties have filed a motion requesting that they be allowed to appear in the Las Vegas courtroom for oral argument given current pandemic conditions and recurring flight cancellations. The motion is granted. (SC) | | 22-00254
|
01/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. AS/EC/KP. (SC) | | |
06/02/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before: Silver/Cadish/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Silver/Cadish/Pickering. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. NNP22-AS/EC/KP. (SC). | | 22-17530
|
06/20/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-19476
|
06/20/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. (SC) | | |
07/01/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-20835
|
07/14/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-22296
|
07/18/2022 | Other | Justice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings | | |
07/27/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [The Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-23610
|
08/22/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-26090
|
08/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC) | | |
09/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 24, 2022. (SC) | | 22-26090
|