Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/24/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hofland & Tomsheck. Check no. 11453. (SC) | | |
02/24/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 22-06110
|
02/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 22-06114
|
02/25/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 22-06233
|
03/07/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 25, 2022, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 22-07136
|
03/14/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 6, 2022, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 22-07964
|
03/14/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/9/18 and 10/5/18. (SC) | | 22-08027
|
03/17/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's docketing statement due: March 31, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08540
|
03/31/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/31/22) (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-10096
|
03/31/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Volume 1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/31/22) (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Volumes 2 and 3. (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-10103
|
03/31/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 22-10126
|
05/07/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 10, 2022, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 22-14620
|
05/11/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/12/16, 11/2/16, 2/1/17, 3/22/17, 5/31/17, 6/16/17, 11/1/18, 3/18/21, and 4/14/21. (SC) | | 22-14961
|
08/10/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 29, 2022, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 22-25044
|
08/12/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to September 30, 2022. (SC) | | 22-25290
|
10/06/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The attorney's have continued discussions but no resolution has been achieved. (SC) | | 22-31580
|
10/13/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-32266
|
10/26/2022 | Transcript | Filed Request for Transcript Proceedings. Proceedings: 2/9/18, 10/5/18, 10/12/16, 11/2/16, 2/1/17, 3/22/17, 5/31/17, 6/16/17,11/1/18, 3/18/21, and 4/14/21 Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 22-33706
|
12/27/2022 | Other | Justice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
01/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-00813
|
01/19/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Joseph C. Reynolds. (SC) | | 23-01905
|
01/19/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Repondent's Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC) | | 23-01907
|
01/20/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: March 13, 2023. (SC) | | 23-01981
|
03/13/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-07689
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 of 6. Part 1 of 2 (SC) | | 23-07690
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 of 6. Part 2 of 2 (SC) | | 23-07691
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 of 6. Part 1 of 2 (SC) | | 23-07692
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 of 6. Part 2 of 2 (SC) | | 23-07693
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3 of 6 (SC) | | 23-07694
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 4 of 6 (SC) | | 23-07695
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 5 of 6 (SC) | | 23-07696
|
03/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 6 of 6 (SC) | | 23-07698
|
04/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-10785
|
04/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Non-Opposition to Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-10983
|
04/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: June 12, 2023. (SC) | | 23-11313
|
05/31/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Notice of Non-Disqualifying Disclosure for Chief Justice Stiglich. (SC) | | 23-16982
|
06/02/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-17411
|
06/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Non-Opposition to Motion to Extend Time. (SC) | | 23-18060
|
06/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: June 26, 2023. (SC) | | 23-18296
|
06/26/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-20298
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 1 of 2. (SC) | | 23-20300
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 2 of 2. (SC) | | 23-20301
|
07/26/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: August 9, 2023. (SC) | | 23-23883
|
08/09/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-25814
|
08/10/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
09/11/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 23-29586
|
09/11/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
09/11/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
11/28/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (COA) | | 23-38413
|
11/28/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (SC) | | |
12/15/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | 23-40752
|
12/15/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Bradley J. Hofland. (COA) | | |
12/15/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing - Transferred document to COA. (SC) | | |
01/19/2024 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). COA-MG/BB/DW (COA) | | 24-02091
|
02/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/06/2024 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 24-04420
|
02/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
02/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/21/2024 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1 [The Honorable Patricia Lee, Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 24-06117
|
02/21/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 24-06130
|
02/21/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/05/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 02/22/24. (SC) | | 24-06130
|