Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/10/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. (SC) | | |
07/10/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-21837
|
07/10/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee/Proper Person. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-21839
|
07/10/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Exhibit List - Addendum to Notice of Appeal. (SC) | | 23-21892
|
07/19/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Victor Ugochukwu Emenike Gold. Money Order No. 22-036121694. (SC) | | |
07/21/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC) | | 23-23451
|
07/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC) | | 23-23817
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-24201
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-24202
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-24203
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-24205
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-24206
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 23-24207
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 7. (SC) | | 23-24208
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 8. (SC) | | 23-24210
|
08/04/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 66-100, 117-149, 279-280, 344-361, and 1034-1044. (SC) | | |
08/16/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Documents. Appellant's docketing statement and transcript request form due: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-26799
|
08/31/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 23-28534
|
08/31/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/29/23, 06/20/23. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC). | | 23-28535
|
08/31/2023 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Pro Se Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC). | | 23-28536
|
10/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Fast Track Response. To date, however, respondent has not filed the fast track response or otherwise communicated with this court. Respondent's fast track response due: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-32988
|
10/26/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice. Re: Extension to the response deadline.(SC) | | 23-34960
|
11/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Request to Extend Time to Answer. (SC) | | 23-35527
|
11/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Respondent's fast track response due: November 30, 2023. (SC) | | 23-35828
|
12/06/2023 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Child Custody Fast Track Response.(SC) | | 23-39576
|
01/08/2024 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
02/06/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 24-04361
|
02/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
02/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
02/21/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person (Victor Emenike Gold) Notice of Change of Address(SC) | | 24-06193
|
05/23/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (COA) | | 24-18179
|
05/23/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (SC) | | |
06/13/2024 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Review by the Supreme Court (Rule 40 and 40B). (COA). | | 24-20661
|
06/13/2024 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Victor Ugochukwu Emenike Gold. Money Order No. 22-062984397. (COA) | | |
08/26/2024 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). COA-MG/BB/DW. (COA) | | 24-30603
|
09/12/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court.(COA) | | |
09/12/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals.(SC) | | |
09/12/2024 | Case Status Update | Case Closed.(COA) | | |
09/12/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 24-33507
|
09/12/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
09/17/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Returning Document Unfiled.(Petition for Review)(SC) | | 24-34322
|
09/24/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 9/13/24. (SC) | | 24-33507
|