Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/09/2024 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
01/09/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | |
01/09/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 24-00836
|
01/16/2024 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from F. Peter James. (SC) | | |
01/16/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 24-01588
|
01/17/2024 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 24-01708
|
01/31/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Transcript Request. (SC) | | 24-03764
|
02/06/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 14, 2024, to file and serve the transcript request form or certificate that no transcripts will be requested. (SC) | | 24-04343
|
02/06/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay (Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(3)). (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 02/07/24 NOTICE) | | 24-04392
|
02/06/2024 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 24-04418
|
02/07/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 24-04496
|
02/07/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
02/07/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
02/07/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay (Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(3)). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 02/07/24 NOTICE). (COA) | | 24-04497
|
02/07/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Imposing Temporary Partial Stay. Having reviewed the emergency motion, we conclude that a temporary partial stay is warranted pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition. In light of the upcoming eviction hearing, we temporarily stay the portion of the decree awarding the 3120 Achilles Drive property (which includes the rental property at 855 Atlas Court) to Townley, such that Townley may not proceed with evicting the tenants, pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition and further order of this court. Townley's response to the stay motion is due by February 13, 2024, and Mezzano shall have 3 days from the date that the response is served to file and serve any reply. (COA) | | 24-04681
|
02/07/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice - Opposition to Motion to Stay (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/8/2024). (COA) | | |
02/08/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (COA) | | 24-04709
|
02/08/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Motion - Opposition to Motion to Stay (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH ATTORNEY OFFICE). (COA) | | |
02/08/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Stay. (COA) | | 24-04764
|
02/08/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice - Supplemental Declaration of John Townley in Support of Opposition to Motion to Stay. (COA) | | 24-04811
|
02/12/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Excess Pages to Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Stay. (COA) | | 24-05221
|
02/14/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Excess Pages. (COA) | | 24-05516
|
02/14/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Transcript Request. (COA) | | 24-05632
|
02/28/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Transcript Request. (COA) | | 24-07272
|
03/05/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Transcript Estimate. (COA) | | 24-07944
|
03/12/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Transcript Estimate. (COA) | | 24-08873
|
03/13/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Transcript Request. Proceedings: 12/11/2019, April 6, 2022; August 29, 2022; March 13, 2023; April 17, 2023; May 4, 2023; July 6, 2023; October 18, 2023; November 2, 2023; and November 3, 2023. Court Reporter: Noble Transcription Services. (COA) | | 24-09045
|
03/14/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Receipt for Transcript Deposit. (COA) | | 24-09091
|
03/15/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay and Granting Motion for Leave to File a Late Transcript Request Form. The motion for stay is denied, and our February 7 temporary stay is hereby lifted. Mezzano's motions for extensions of time to file the transcript request form are granted, and thus, the request form was timely filed on March 13, 2024. Townley's request for sanctions is denied. (COA) | | 24-09348
|
04/30/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Directives. (COA) | | 24-15103
|
05/16/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (COA) | | 24-17285
|
05/21/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (COA) | | 24-17864
|
05/28/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (COA) | | 24-18614
|
06/10/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On April 30, 2024, appellant filed a "motion for directives" with this court. On May 16, 2024, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix, providing she "do[es] not anticipate that [she] will receive final transcripts until after this court rules on the pending Motion for Directives." Respondent has opposed the motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix, and appellant has replied. Appellant now requests "an additional three weeks from the time the transcripts are filed with the district court, to file the opening brief and appendix." Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix is granted to the following extent. Appellant shall have three weeks from the date of this order to file the opening brief and appendix. (COA) | | 24-20152
|
06/20/2024 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Substitution of Appellant's Counsel(Andrew Switlyk of the Switlyk Lae Firm, P.A. as attorney of Record in Place and Stead of F. Peter James, Esq., Law Offices of F. Peter James, Esq). (SC) | | 24-21351
|
06/27/2024 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Veritext Legal Solutions stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No Dates Listed. (COA) | | 24-22352
|
07/01/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (COA) | | 24-22887
|
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 1. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 2. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 3. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 4. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 5. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 6. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 7. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 8. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 9. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 10. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 11. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 12. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 13. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 14. (COA) | | |
07/01/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Joint Appendix - Vol. 15. (COA) | | |
07/02/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal the Joint Appendix. (COA) | | 24-22992
|
07/10/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The stipulation for substitution of appellant's counsel, filed by appellant on June 20, 2024, is approved. The clerk shall add Andrew Switlyk of The Switlyk Law Firm as counsel of record for appellant and shall remove F. Peter James of the Law Offices of F. Peter James, Esq., as counsel for appellant. (COA) | | 24-24045
|
07/24/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Seal Joint Appendix. In divorce actions, the records and evidence shall be sealed upon the written request of either party, as the district court ordered below. NRS 125.110. Accordingly, the motion is granted, and the clerk shall file the joint appendix, received on July 1, 2024, under seal. (COA) | | 24-25802
|
08/01/2024 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: August 14, 2024. (SC) | | 24-26934
|
08/12/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief(COA) | | 24-28368
|
08/13/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief(COA) | | 24-28537
|
09/09/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Streamlined Request for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (COA) | | 24-32624
|
09/10/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Approve Appellant's Streamlined Extension. Streamlined extension approved. Reply Brief due: September 25, 2024. (COA) | | 24-32924
|
09/18/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (COA) | | 24-34509
|
09/19/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (COA) | | |