Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/17/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
02/17/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 06-03650
|
03/02/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 06-04757
|
03/15/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | | |
03/31/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-respondent.) | | 06-06883
|
04/07/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 06-07399
|
04/12/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/09/03. To Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. | | 06-07739
|
04/12/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/11/04 and 01/27/05. To Court Reporter: Tessa Heishman. | | 06-07740
|
04/12/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/10/04. To Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. | | 06-07742
|
04/24/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to Comply with NRAP 9(a). Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 10 days to file and serve the request for transcripts. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against respondent's counsel. | | 06-08607
|
05/04/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 06-09349
|
05/05/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Randolph Moore's Motion to Dismiss State's Appeal (respondent/cross-appellant). | | 06-09480
|
05/05/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss State's Appeal. | | 06-09483
|
05/11/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply to State's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss State's Appeal. | | 06-09908
|
05/11/2006 | Motion | Received Reply to Response. Reply to State's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss State's Appeal. | | 06-09909
|
06/29/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 2/10/04; 5/11/04; 1/27/05. Court Reporters: Gina M. Shrader and Tess R. Heishman. | | 06-13523
|
07/28/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. This motion was erroneously docketed in 46247 and was transferred to this case on 08/30/06. | | 06-18049
|
08/30/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Transcript. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Transcript due: 20 days. If more time is need, Ms. MacDonald shall within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time or if the transcript cannot be produced, notify this court, in writing, of this fact. | | 06-18037
|
08/30/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 80 Page Opening Brief. | | 06-18052
|
08/31/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and 19-volume appendix received on August 30, 2006. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. | | 06-18142
|
08/31/2006 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 06-18067
|
08/31/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 19. | | 06-18068
|
09/15/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: October 9, 2003. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. | | 06-19036
|
10/04/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 48 pages. | | 06-20356
|
10/04/2006 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 06-20358
|
10/19/2006 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 06-21571
|
11/20/2006 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Reply to Cross-Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 06-23728
|
11/20/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
11/21/2006 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. | | 06-23892
|
11/27/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. to Remand (Response to Reply Brief filed November 20, 2006). | | 06-24188
|
01/11/2007 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 07-00842
|
01/25/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief and Issue. | | 07-02056
|
01/25/2007 | Brief | Received Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief on Issue of Aiding and Abetting Instructions. FILED PER ORDER OF 1/8/07. | | 07-02057
|
01/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. States Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief and issue. | | 07-02478
|
02/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to file a supplemental brief. The clerk of this court shal file the brief provisionally submitted with Moore's motion on January 25, 2007. State: 20 days to file supplemental answering brief. Moore: 10 days to file a supplemental reply brief from receipt of service of the State's brief. | | 07-03267
|
02/08/2007 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief on Issue of Aiding and Abetting Instructions. | | 07-02057
|
02/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Voluntary recusal of Justice Douglas from participation in this matter. Sat in district court proceedings. | | 07-03629
|
03/05/2007 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 07-05220
|
03/14/2007 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief on Issue of Aiding and Abetting Instructions. | | 07-05956
|
07/06/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This appeal was previously submitted on the briefs and record filed herein. We have subsequently determined, however, that oral argument would be of assistance in the disposition of this appeal. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall schedule this appeal for oral argument before En Banc Court on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. | | 07-14741
|
07/11/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Disclosure of Negotiation for Employment. | | 07-15090
|
07/13/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 60 minutes in Carson City on September 4, 2007, at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc) | | 07-15210
|
08/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Robert E. Rose, Senior Justice in place of Justice Douglas for oral argument scheduled for September 4, 2007. | | 07-17379
|
08/15/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change in Status of Counsel for Appellant & Cross-Respondent. (Effective 8/27/07 JoNell Thomas joins the office of Special Public Defender and will retain her appointment as attorney of record for appellant/cross-respondent.) | | 07-18038
|
08/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 07-18420
|
09/04/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
09/21/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. fn1-[ We grant Moore's motion to file a reply to the State's opposition to the motion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall file the reply provisionally submitted with the motion.] The State shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file an amended notice of appeal in the district court. | | 07-20841
|
09/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Reply to State's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss State's Appeal. | | 06-09909
|
09/25/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 07-21073
|
10/02/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 07-21688
|
11/01/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny Moore's motion to dismiss the State's cross-appeal. fn5[The Honorable Robert Rose, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to sit in place of the Honorable Michael Douglas, Justice.] | | 07-24010
|
11/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Supplemental Briefing. Moore: 20 days to file supplemental brief. | | 07-24373
|
11/28/2007 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief on Issue of First Degree Murder Instructions and Polk V. Sandoval. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). | | 07-25707
|
12/07/2007 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. | | 07-26602
|
04/23/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn42[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to sit in place of the Honorable Michael Douglas, Justice, who voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC-MG/WM/JH/RP/MC/NS/RR | | 08-10045
|
05/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Application for Certiorari (NRAP 41). | | 08-11098
|
05/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion for stay of issuance of the remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until August 1, 2008. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by August 1, 2008, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by August 1, 2008, the remittitur shall issue on August 4, 2008. | | 08-11838
|
07/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed July 17, 2008 and placed on the docket as Case No. 08-5384. | | 08-19495
|
07/30/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Filing of Petition for a Writ of Certiorari. | | 08-19626
|
10/16/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. | | 08-26712
|
10/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to Issue Remittitur. We direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur in this appeal. | | 08-27209
|
10/23/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 08-27216
|
10/23/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/04/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 27, 2008. | | 08-27216
|