Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 49350
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T OF MOTOR VEHICLES VS. JUNGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A529007Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/21/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/30/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/30/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)07-09562
05/09/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/28/07. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd.07-10345
05/17/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.07-10934
05/23/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 28, 2007. Court Reporter: Victoria W. Boyd.07-11357
08/30/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief.07-19207
08/30/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.07-19209
10/16/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Answering Brief.07-22888
02/04/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This matter shalll be submitted for decision on the opening brief and appendix and the record before this court. Fn1 [The notice issued on October 16, 2007, directing respondent to file an answering brief within 15 days is hereby vacated. Respondent shall not file an answering brief in this appeal.]08-02716
02/04/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. It appears that this court's resolution of the issues presented on appeal may be assisted by briefing from both parties in this matter. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file his answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 30 days from the date when respondent's answering brief is served to file any reply brief. The court requests that the American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada participate in this appeal as amicus curiae by filing a brief. We direct the DMV and Junge to serve copies of their briefs on [ACLU] within 30 days from the date of this order. We direct the DMV to serve the ACLU with their appendix and the transcript for the February 28, 2007, proceedings before the district court. Should the ACLU consent to participate as amicus curiae, this court requests that they file and serve their amicus brief within 60 days from the date appellant's reply brief is served. If an amicus brief is filed and served, the DMV and Junge may file and serve a reply to that brief within 30 days from the date the amicus brief is served. fn1-[We vacate our February 4, 2008, order, which stated that respondent shall not file an answering brief, and that this matter shall be submitted for decision on the opening brief and appendix and the record before this court.]08-15129
08/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Briefing. As Junge has failed to comply with deadlines set in our June 13 order, we conclude Junge has elected not to file briefs in this appeal. Accordingly, appellant need not file a reply brief. Should the ACLU consent to participate as amicus curiae, this court requests that they file and serve their amicus brief addressing the issues outlined in our June 13 order within 30 days of the date of this order. Appellant may file any response to the ACLU's brief within 30 days of the date the ACLU's brief is filed and served.08-21399
09/19/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Invited Amicus Curiae's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of Amicus Curiae.08-24321
09/19/2008BriefReceived Amicus Brief. American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada.08-24325
09/26/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. the motion is granted. The clerk shall file the amicus brief received on September 19, 2008. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief to the amicus brief.08-24939
09/26/2008BriefFiled Amicus Brief. American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada.08-24325
10/10/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant's Motion to Extend time to File Response Brief to American Civil Liberties Union's (ACLU) Amicus Brief. Document due date: November 26, 2008.08-26173
11/13/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Second Motion to Extend Time to File Response Brief to ACLU's Amicus Brief.08-28861
12/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until December 26, 2008, to file a Reply Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by the American Civil Liberties Union.08-30988
12/30/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Response Brief to the ACLU's Amicus Brief.08-32940
01/05/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Appellant's Response Brief to the ACLU's Amicus Brief.09-00178
01/12/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. To allow Amicus ALCU of Nevada to File a Reply to Appellant's Response Brief.09-00766
01/20/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to ACLU's Motion to File Reply.09-01441
01/27/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to File Reply. ACLUN: 15 days to file a reply brief.09-02304
02/13/2009BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Reply Brief of Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada.09-03910
02/17/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Reply Brief of Amicus Curiae ACLU of Nevada.09-04029
03/03/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from DMV 15 days.09-05335
03/19/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response.09-06947
03/20/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to Allow Amicus ACLU of Nevada to File a Response to this Court's March 3, 2009 Order to Show Cause.09-07108
03/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Leave to File Response. We direct the clerk of this court to file the ACLUN's response to our show cause order, which is attached to the SCLUN's motion. Fn1 [We caution the ACLUN that proposed responses submitted with motions for leave to file those documents should be included with, but not attached to, the motion.]09-07939
03/30/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to March 3, 2009, Order to Show Cause.09-07946
04/02/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is hereby scheduled before the en banc court on Monday, May 4, 2009, at the hour of 11:30 a.m., in Carson City. Because respondent William Junge is unrepresented by counsel, the American Civil Liberties Union shall argue on behalf of respondent as amicus curiae. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.09-08252
04/20/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.09-09832
05/01/2009MotionFiled Motion. Letter requesting a continuance of oral argument.09-10849
05/01/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to reschedule oral argument (letter).09-10867
05/01/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to continue oral argument. Amicus curiae filed a motion to continue the oral argument of this matter and counsel for appellant filed an opposition. The motion is granted. This court hereby vacates the oral argument presently scheduled for May 4, 2009, at 11:30 a.m., and directs the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar.09-10868
05/21/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the en banc court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.09-12609
05/21/2009Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision.
07/07/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-JH/RP/MD/MC/NS/MG/KP09-16689
08/04/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur.09-17567
08/04/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/14/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 6, 2009.09-17567