Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
06/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 08-16267
|
06/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Expedited Appeal. | | 08-16601
|
06/30/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/29/07. To Court Reporter: Eric Nelson. | | 08-16604
|
06/30/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/12/08. To Court Reporter: Jackie Adams. | | 08-16605
|
06/30/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 08-16608
|
07/03/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings (Jackie Adams). | | 08-17046
|
07/03/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings (Eric Nelson). | | 08-17047
|
07/16/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 08/29/07. Court Reporter: Eric Nelson. | | 08-18214
|
07/21/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jackie Adams stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/12/08. | | 08-18766
|
07/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we conclude that an expedited briefing schedule is appropriate, and therefore, we grant appellant's motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Upon the completion of briefing, we will expedite our resolution of this appeal as the court's docket permits. | | 08-18913
|
07/24/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 08-19091
|
07/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols 1-4. | | 08-19093
|
08/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-21848
|
08/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevaqda in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada | | 08-21925
|
09/24/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 08-24662
|
09/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Supplement to Joint Appendix. | | 08-24664
|
10/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Disclosure of Non-Disqualifying Interest. I see no reason to recuse myself from consideration of this appeal. Ron Parraguirre. | | 08-27678
|
02/02/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on March 3, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc) | | 09-02843
|
02/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 09-04098
|
03/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
03/10/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. | | |
03/10/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Voluntary recusal of Justice Parraguirre. | | 09-06027
|
07/29/2010 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court EN BANC. Fn1-[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Author: Douglas, Michael L.. Majority: Douglas/Hardesty/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. Dissent: Pickering. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. EN BANC. | | 10-19578
|
08/24/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-21627
|
08/24/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
08/27/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 25, 2010. REMITTITUR RECALLED PER ORDER FILED ON 9/22/10. | | 10-21627
|
08/31/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Stay Issuance of the Remittitur | | 10-22369
|
09/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition. | | 10-22415
|
09/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur. We recall the remittitur issued by this court on August 24, 2010. Thereafter the reissuance of the remittitur shall be stayed for 120 days. | | 10-24349
|
10/13/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Versuslaw, Inc. and West Group regardng corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 52733, 46417, 55290/55551, 49207, 51920, 52492, 53521, 53168. | | 10-27164
|
11/03/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed 10/27/10 and placed on the docket 10/29/10 as Case No. 10-568. | | 10-28782
|
12/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Stay Issuance of the Remittitur. | | 10-32918
|
12/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Notice of Non-Opposition. | | 10-32941
|
12/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Reissuance of Remittitur until final dispostion has been rendered by the Supreme Court of the United States. | | 10-33704
|
01/18/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. | | 11-01689
|
03/09/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from US Supreme Court requesting certified copies of all documents filed in this case. | | 11-07669
|
03/17/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to US Supreme Court enclosing a certified copy of this court's record, vols. 1 through 3. | | 11-08705
|
07/05/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Appellant - (The Capitol Company substituted as attorney of record for appellant Michael Carrigan in the place and stead of The Sparks City Attorney) | | 11-19747
|
07/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion To Associate Counsel (Rachel M. McKenzie, Esq.). | | 11-21060
|
07/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel (Mark S. Davies, Esq.). | | 11-21061
|
07/13/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Motion (Mark Davies, Esq). | | 11-21069
|
07/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Additional Briefing and Argument. | | 11-21091
|
07/15/2011 | Order/Incoming | Filed Mandate and Judgment from Supreme Court of the United States. | | 11-21386
|
07/19/2011 | Motion | Filed Response to Appellant's Motion for Additional Briefing and Argument. | | 11-21774
|
07/26/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Motion for Additional Briefing and Argument. | | 11-22464
|
07/28/2011 | Other | Record of Proceedings in the Nevada Supreme Court, Vols. 1 through 3, returned to this office by the U.S. Supreme Court. (See 3/17/11 docket entry.) | | |
07/29/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Additional Briefing and Motions to Associate Counsel. Appellant's: Supplemental brief due: 30 days. Nevada attorneys John W. Griffith and Matthew M. Griffin, of The Capitol Company, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. McKenzie and Mr. Davies in this matter. | | 11-22887
|
08/02/2011 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion for Clarification Regarding Supplemental Briefing. | | 11-23324
|
08/08/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion Regarding Supplemental Brief page Limits. The supplemental opening brief and supplemental answering brief shall be no longer than 30 pages and any supplemental reply brief shall be no longer than 15 pages. | | 11-23829
|
08/22/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Yvonne Nevarz-Goodson for Adriana Fralick). | | 11-25556
|
08/22/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Mandate and Judgment of the Supreme Court of the United States. | | 11-25558
|
08/22/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel - John P. Elwood. | | 11-25559
|
08/22/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel - Jeremy C. Marwell. | | 11-25560
|
08/23/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service of Notice of Mandate and Judgment of the Supreme Court of the United States. | | 11-25571
|
08/29/2011 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief of Appellant Michael A Carrigan. | | 11-26253
|
09/27/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Associate Counsel and to Waive Admission Fees. Respondent The Commission on Ethics has filed motions to associate Washington, D.C., attorneys John P. Elwood and Jeremy C. Marwell of the law firm Vinson & Elkins, LLP, in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. Mr. Elwood and Mr. Maxwell shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondent in this appeal. No admission fees shall be required of Mr. Elwood or Mr. Maxwell. | | 11-29431
|
09/29/2011 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief for Respondent The Commission on Ethics State of Nevada. | | 11-29664
|
10/13/2011 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Reply Brief for Appellant Michael A. Carrigan. | | 11-31589
|
10/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 11-31652
|
10/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant Michael A. Carrigan's Opposition to Nevada Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 11-31834
|
10/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Legislature's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 11-32088
|
10/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Response of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada to the Nevada Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. | | 11-32421
|
11/01/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The clerk of this court is directed to return, unfiled, the proposed amicus brief, provisionally received in this court on October 14, 2011. | | 11-33547
|
01/27/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for March 5, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the En Banc Panel. | | 12-02917
|
02/22/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 12-05678
|
03/05/2012 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
04/03/2012 | Order/Incoming | Filed Executive Order. Honorable Alan R. Earl, District Judge, appointed to sit in the place of Justice Parraguirre. | | 12-10592
|
11/27/2013 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Pickering, C.J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Saitta/Earl. Douglas, J., with whom Cherry, J., dissenting. Fn1[After oral argument, the Honorable Allan R. Earl, Judge of the Eighth Judicial District Court, was designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, who voluntarily recused himself.] 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 95. EN BANC | | 13-35859
|
12/23/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 13-38900
|
12/23/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
12/31/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 24, 2013. | | 13-38900
|