Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
01/27/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 09-02292
|
02/11/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 09-03653
|
02/11/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/12/08 (Renee Vincent), 1/29/09 (Kristen Lunkwitz). | | 09-03656
|
02/17/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/12/08. | | 09-04116
|
02/23/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Amended Notice of Appeal for NORMAN FLOWERS, Defendant | | 09-04691
|
02/25/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/29/09. | | 09-04880
|
05/21/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-12644
|
05/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 25, 2009. | | 09-12905
|
08/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 09-20573
|
09/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 9, 2009. | | 09-22207
|
10/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (60) days. | | 09-24759
|
10/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have until December 9, 2009, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Any additional extensions will be granted only on showing of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. | | 09-26082
|
12/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (10) days. | | 09-29798
|
12/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 19, 2009. | | 09-29993
|
12/18/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Appendix Volumes 1-3. | | 09-30722
|
12/21/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief. (39) pages. | | 09-30859
|
12/21/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 39 pages granted. | | 09-30861
|
12/21/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 09-30862
|
12/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1-3. | | 09-30958
|
01/20/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | | 10-01635
|
01/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: February 19, 2010. | | 10-01637
|
01/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Notice Concerning Font Size. | | 10-01729
|
02/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 38 Page Answering Brief. | | 10-04609
|
02/19/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 38 pages granted. | | 10-04610
|
02/19/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 10-04613
|
03/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (45) days. | | 10-06997
|
03/18/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: May 3, 2010. | | 10-07182
|
04/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals for Decision and Use of the Appendix. Nos. 55759/53159. | | 10-10177
|
05/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 10-11337
|
05/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. We grant appellant's unopposed motion to consolidate these appeals for purposes of disposition only. When briefing the appeal in Docket No. 55759, the parties may cite to the appendices filed in Docket No. 53159. Any additional documents necessary for the appeal in Docket No. 55759 that have not been included in the appendices filed in Docket No. 53159 must be provided in a supplemental appendix filed in Docket No. 55759. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 10-13282
|
07/01/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Nos. 53159/55759. (10-17160) | | |
08/02/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nos. 53159/55759. (10-19857) | | |
01/06/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for February 15, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas. Nos. 53159/55759. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | | 11-00593
|
02/01/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 11-03217
|
02/02/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Corrected Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 11-03261
|
02/08/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Flowers Rule 28J. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 11-04001
|
02/15/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | | |
06/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeals. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 11-17607
|
06/15/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We will take no action on the motion or these appeals at this time. Appellant shall file a written report with the clerk of this court on or before July 21, 2011, regarding the status of the proceedings and sentencing in district court case no. C216032. Nos. 53159/55759 | | 11-17842
|
07/19/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Regarding Status of Sentencing. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 11-21707
|
08/01/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Regarding Status of Sentencing. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 11-22978
|
08/18/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Regarding Status of Sentencing. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 11-25146
|
09/28/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." Nos. 53159/55759. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. | | 11-29581
|
04/18/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeals. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-14864
|
04/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Motion to Reinstate Appeals Volume I of III. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-14865
|
04/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Motion to Reinstate Appeals Volume III of III. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-14866
|
04/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Motion to Reinstate Appeals Volume II of III. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-14867
|
04/25/2018 | Motion | Filed State's Opposition to Flower's Motion to Reinstate Appeals 53159 and 55759. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-15835
|
05/11/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (C.B. Kirschner as counsel for appellant Norman Keith Flowers.) Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-18156
|
05/11/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to State's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeals. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-18172
|
07/09/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Appeal. Under the very narrow circumstances presented here, we grant appellant's motion and hereby reinstate these appeals. fn1[Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a reply to the opposition is granted; the clerk of this court shall filed the reply provisionally received in this court on May 11, 2018.] Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-25926
|
07/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Reply to State's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeals. | | 18-25927
|
08/16/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant is directed to refile the appendices in Case Nos. 53159 and 55759 within 30 days of the date of this order. Further, the parties shall inform this court within 30 days of the date of this order whether the briefs filed in Case Nos. 53159 and 55759 require amendment so that the citations in the briefs correspond to the newly-filed appendices. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-31815
|
08/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Remand for Appointment of New Counsel. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-33007
|
08/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Federal Public Defender's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellant. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-33008
|
08/24/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Special Public Defender's Office for Appellant). Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-33231
|
09/14/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to Refile Appendices. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-36001
|
09/20/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The Special Public Defender has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion is denied without prejudice. The Special Public Defender shall have 20 days from the date of this order to comply with this court's August 16, 2018, order. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-36800
|
09/27/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. The clerk shall remove C.B. Kirschner and the Office of the Federal Public Defender as counsel of record for appellant. As appellant remains represented by the Special Public Defender, the motion to remand this appeal to the district court for the appointment of new counsel is denied. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-37767
|
10/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to Refile the Appendices in Volumes 1 through 3 (First Request). Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-39657
|
10/29/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the appendix received on October 22, 2018. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether the briefs filed in Case Nos. 53159 and 55759 require amendment so that the citations in the briefs correspond to the newly-filed appendices. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-42382
|
10/29/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 1 of 3. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-42383
|
10/29/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 2 of 3. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-42384
|
10/29/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 3 of 3. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-42385
|
10/31/2018 | Motion | Filed Response to Order Dated October 29, 2018. Nos. 53159/55759. | | 18-42780
|
11/02/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 53159/55759. | | |
02/08/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Authorities. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve supplemental authorities that support the arguments raised in his opening and reply briefs. Respondent shall then have 14 days from the date when appellant's supplement authorities are filed to file and serve responding supplemental authorities in support of the arguments raised in its answering brief. The parties' filings shall not exceed 15 pages or one-half the type-volume specified for an opening or answering brief in a noncapital case by NRAP 32(a)(7)(A)(ii). No extensions of time will be permitted. Nos. 53159/55759. (SC) | | 19-06090
|
02/19/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 53159/55759. (SC) | | 19-07682
|
02/26/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 53159/55759. (SC) | | 19-08709
|
04/29/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC) | | 19-18712
|
05/29/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 19-23262
|
06/11/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before Northern Nevada Panel. KP/RP/EC (SC) | | |
01/30/2020 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. Author: Pickering, C.J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1. NNP19-KP/RP/EC Nos. 53159/55759.(SC) | | 20-04160
|
02/24/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-07275
|
02/24/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/06/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 28, 2020. (SC) | | 20-07275
|