Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/17/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 09-09705
|
04/17/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
05/01/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 09-10816
|
05/01/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 09-10817
|
08/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (60 days). | | 09-20003
|
08/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: October 16, 2009. | | 09-20215
|
10/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to Permit Appellant to File A Brief Exceeding Eighty (80) Pages. | | 09-25337
|
10/16/2009 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. Via E-Flex. (FILED PER ORDER 10/19/09). | | |
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 of 48. | | 09-25368
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 of 48. | | 09-25369
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 of 48. | | 09-25374
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4 of 48 | | 09-25376
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5 of 48 | | 09-25377
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6 of 48 | | 09-25379
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7 of 48 | | 09-25380
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8 of 48 | | 09-25381
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9 of 48 | | 09-25383
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10 of 48 | | 09-25384
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11 of 48 | | 09-25386
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 12 of 48 | | 09-25387
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 13 of 48 | | 09-25388
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 14 of 48 | | 09-25389
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 15 of 48 | | 09-25390
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 16 of 48 | | 09-25391
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 17 of 48 | | 09-25392
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 18 of 48 | | 09-25393
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 19 of 48 | | 09-25395
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 20 of 48 | | 09-25396
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 21 of 48 | | 09-25397
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 22 of 48 | | 09-25398
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 23 of 48 | | 09-25399
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 24 of 48 | | 09-25400
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 25 of 48 | | 09-25401
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 26 of 48 | | 09-25402
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 27 of 48 | | 09-25403
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 28 of 48 | | 09-25405
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 29 of 48 | | 09-25406
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 30 of 48 | | 09-25408
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 31 of 48 | | 09-25409
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 32 of 48 | | 09-25410
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 33 of 48 | | 09-25411
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 34 of 48 | | 09-25412
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 35 of 48 | | 09-25413
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 36 of 48 | | 09-25414
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 37 of 48 | | 09-25415
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 38 of 48 | | 09-25416
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 39 of 48 | | 09-25417
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 40 of 48 | | 09-25418
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 41 of 48 | | 09-25419
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 42 of 48 | | 09-25420
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 43 of 48 | | 09-25421
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 44 of 48 | | 09-25422
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 45 of 48 | | 09-25423
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 46 of 48 | | 09-25424
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 47 of 48 | | 09-25425
|
10/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 48 of 48 | | 09-25426
|
10/19/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on October 16, 2009, via E-file. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | | 09-25462
|
10/19/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 09-25466
|
11/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-28030
|
11/18/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file the answering brief. Due: January 18, 2010. | | 09-28104
|
01/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | | 10-01433
|
01/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 18, 2010 | | 10-01882
|
02/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Third Request. | | 10-04331
|
02/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Answering brief due March 22, 2010. | | 10-04649
|
03/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File 78 Page Answering Brief | | 10-07535
|
03/22/2010 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. Received via E-Flex. (FILED PER ORDER 03/24/10). | | |
03/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on March 22, 2010, via E-Flex. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 10-07648
|
03/24/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 10-07655
|
04/23/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (45) days. | | 10-10623
|
04/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: June 7, 2010. | | 10-10843
|
06/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (10) days. | | 10-14541
|
06/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: June 17, 2010. | | 10-15233
|
06/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Request to Take Judicial Notice | | 10-15881
|
06/17/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Exhibits to Request to Take Judicial Notice | | 10-15882
|
06/17/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 10-15884
|
06/17/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
06/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to take judicial notice. | | 10-16681
|
09/08/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for October 3, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the En Banc Court. | | 11-27349
|
09/19/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 11-28507
|
09/20/2011 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 11-28666
|
09/23/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 11-29090
|
09/29/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Joyce Kotnik of KSNV Las Vegas, NBC Channel 3, requesting to video tape the oral arguments in Las Vegas on Monday, October 3, 2011. (via fax). | | 11-29715
|
09/29/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matters. Joyce Kotnik of KSNV Las Vegas is designated as pool coordinator. Nos. 48295/54080/54011/53626. | | 11-29750
|
09/29/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Shareef Abul-Ela of KTNV requesting cameras in the courtroom. Nos. 48295/54080/54011/53626. | | 11-29758
|
09/29/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Shareef Abul-Ela of KTNV is granted permission to participate in the photographic or electronic media coverage. KTNV shall arrange with Joyce Kotnik of KVBC in order to pool their coverage. Nos. 48295/54080/54011/53626. | | 11-29767
|
09/30/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Dennis Neuhausel of KLAS TV requesting permission to videotape the oral arguments scheduled on October 3, 2011 (via fax). | | 11-29921
|
09/30/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: electronic media coverage of oral argument. Dennis Neuhauselof KLAS-TV is granted permission to participate in the photographic or electronic media coverage. KLAS-TV shall arrange with Joyce Kotnik of KVBC in order to pool their coverage. Nos. 48295/54080/54011/53626. | | 11-29945
|
10/03/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
02/25/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Cherry, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 11. EN BANC | | 16-06014
|
03/14/2016 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Petition for Rehearing. | | 16-08050
|
03/21/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: April 4, 2016. | | 16-08838
|
04/05/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 16-10593
|
04/05/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance. | | 16-10595
|
05/12/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/66473 (Letter entered in Docket No. 65424 as document no. 16-14923.) | | |
05/19/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Cherry and Saitta, JJ., dissenting. EN BANC. | | 16-15839
|
05/20/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion to Stay the Remittitur. | | 16-15904
|
05/25/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until September 16, 2016. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by that date, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by September 16, 2016, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. | | 16-16368
|
08/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed The Application for an Extension of Time within which to File a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari in the Above-Entitled Case has been Presented to Justice Kennedy, who on August 9, 2016, Extended the Time to and Including October 3, 2016. | | 16-25214
|
10/13/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed October 3, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 16-6316. | | 16-31895
|
11/28/2016 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Supreme Court of the United States addressed to Steven Owens directing their office to file a response by December 23, 2016. | | 16-36778
|
03/10/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from the Supreme Court of the Untied States, Office of the Clerk regarding an opinion that was announced. | | 17-08185
|
04/07/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U S Supreme Court. (Certified copy of the mandate and a certified copy of the judgment.) | | 17-11549
|
08/02/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Fn2[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Cherry, J., Concurring in part and dissenting in part. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. EN BANC | | 18-29605
|
08/21/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. | | 18-32285
|
08/27/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Request to Take Judicial Notice. | | 18-33236
|
08/27/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. The clerk of this court is directed to file the petition for rehearing received on August 27, 2018. Respondent's Answer to the Petition for Rehearing due: 15 days. | | 18-33447
|
08/27/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 18-33448
|
09/12/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 18-35566
|
09/27/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We shall take judicial notice of the Petition for Writ of Certiorari and Respondent's Brief in Opposition attached to the motion filed August 27, 2018. | | 18-37783
|
12/07/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing and Amending Opinion. The opinion in Rippo V therefore is amended as follows: On page 34, 423 P.3d at 1102, the fourth sentence in the paragraph that begins with "Turning to the prejudice prong" is deleted and replaced. With this change to the opinion, we deny rehearing. fn1[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Pickering, J., with whom Cherry, J. joins dissenting. (SC) | | 18-907554
|
01/03/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-00372
|
01/03/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/17/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 8, 2019. (SC) | | 19-00372
|