Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/15/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 09-30421
|
12/15/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
12/15/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | | |
12/30/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 09-31520
|
12/30/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 09-31522
|
02/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (90) days. | | 10-05164
|
03/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. for extension of time. Opening brief due April 26, 2010. | | 10-05217
|
04/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (90) days. | | 10-11071
|
05/06/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. Appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief is granted in part. Appellant: To 6/25/10 to file opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be granted. | | 10-11739
|
06/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (14) days. | | 10-16615
|
07/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening and appendix due July 9, 2010. | | 10-17318
|
07/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 10-17747
|
07/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 20, 2010. | | 10-18603
|
07/20/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to Enlarge page limitation. | | 10-18619
|
07/20/2010 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 07/27/10). Via E-Flex. | | |
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2 | | 10-18644
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 | | 10-18647
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3 | | 10-18648
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4 | | 10-18649
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5 | | 10-18650
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6 | | 10-18651
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 7 | | 10-18652
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 8 | | 10-18653
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 9 | | 10-18654
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 10 | | 10-18655
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 11 | | 10-18656
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 12 | | 10-18668
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 13 | | 10-18669
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 14 | | 10-18670
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 15 | | 10-18671
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 16 | | 10-18672
|
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 17 | | 10-18687
|
07/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We take no action on appellant's motion as it is unnecessary and direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's opening brief received on July 20, 2010. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | | 10-19456
|
07/27/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 8/11/10. | | |
08/04/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Amend Opening Brief. | | 10-20186
|
08/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to file an amended opening brief. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the opening brief filed on July 27, 2010. Amended opening brief due 30 days. | | 10-20715
|
09/10/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Supplemental Appendix. Volume 1. | | 10-23251
|
09/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to enlarge page limitation of Opening Brief. (91) pages. | | 10-23250
|
09/13/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion/File Opening Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on E-Flex on September 10, 2010. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | | 10-23471
|
09/13/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 10-23473
|
10/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time for the Answering Brief. (60) days. | | 10-26809
|
10/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: December 13, 2010. | | 10-26891
|
12/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file the Answering Brief. (60) days. | | 10-32393
|
12/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 11, 2011. | | 10-33075
|
02/10/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-04494
|
03/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for extension of time to file reply brief. | | 11-07760
|
03/15/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reply Brief due May 13, 2011. | | 11-07936
|
05/16/2011 | Motion | Filed Untimely Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (30) days. | | 11-14357
|
05/17/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: June 13, 2011. | | 11-14552
|
06/13/2011 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 11-17568
|
06/13/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
03/23/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to schedule oral argument. This appeal was previously submitted on the briefs and record filed herein. This court has subsequently determined, however, that oral argument would be of assistance in the disposition of this appeal. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter before the en banc court on the next available calendar. | | 12-09269
|
04/26/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for June 4, 2012, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas for 60 minutes before the En Banc Court. | | 12-13331
|
05/21/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 12-15955
|
06/04/2012 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the En Banc Court. | | |
08/01/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn6[The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC | | 12-24268
|
08/16/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 12-25832
|
08/20/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for limited remand to the district court. | | 12-26125
|
08/21/2012 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Limited Remand. | | 12-26261
|
09/19/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing and Motion for Limited Remand. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] | | 12-29694
|
10/15/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 12-32637
|
10/15/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
10/29/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 22, 2012. | | 12-32637
|