Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 10-14613
|
06/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
06/23/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 10-16331
|
06/28/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-16727
|
10/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of time within which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 10-25483
|
10/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: December 6, 2010. | | 10-25687
|
12/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (45) days. | | 10-31694
|
12/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 20, 2011. | | 10-33071
|
01/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Third Request). | | 11-02063
|
01/28/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due: January 31, 2011 | | 11-02824
|
02/01/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Permit Appellant to File an Opening Brief Longer than Eighty Pages. (116) pages. | | 11-03046
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief . Volume 1. | | 11-03059
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2. | | 11-03060
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3. | | 11-03061
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. | | 11-03062
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5. | | 11-03063
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6. | | 11-03064
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 7. | | 11-03065
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 8. | | 11-03066
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 9. | | 11-03067
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 10. | | 11-03072
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 11. | | 11-03073
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 12. | | 11-03074
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 13. | | 11-03075
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 14. | | 11-03076
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 15. | | 11-03077
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 16. | | 11-03078
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 17. | | 11-03079
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 18. | | 11-03080
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 19. | | 11-03081
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 20. | | 11-03082
|
02/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 21. | | 11-03083
|
02/01/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit 70 (DVD) at AA 1892-A. | | 11-03091
|
02/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on February 1, 2011. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | | 11-04749
|
02/14/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 11-04756
|
02/14/2011 | Other Incoming Document | Filed DVD containing Exhibit 70 (part of Appellant's Appendix - AA1892-A). | | 11-04771
|
03/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time First Request to file the Answering Brief. (60) days. | | 11-06859
|
03/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 6, 2011. | | 11-07027
|
05/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time Second Request. | | 11-13427
|
05/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 6, 2011. | | 11-14270
|
06/03/2011 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 11-16394
|
07/01/2011 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-19608
|
07/05/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: September 2, 2011. | | 11-19792
|
09/01/2011 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time Within which to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-26789
|
09/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: September 16, 2011. | | 11-27773
|
09/16/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-28431
|
09/16/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
06/28/2013 | Other | Justice Nancy Saitta disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. | | |
07/18/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn4[The Honorable Nancy Saitta voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. | | 13-21110
|
08/05/2013 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing (Appellant). | | 13-22969
|
11/22/2013 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "We deny the rehearing petition." Fn1[The Honorable Nancy Saitta voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Cherry, J., dissenting. | | 13-35314
|
12/17/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 13-38170
|
12/17/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
12/26/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 17, 2013. | | 13-38170
|