Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 56306
Short Caption:DAVIS VS. US BANKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1000856 Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/04/2012 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/04/2012How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).)10-16890
06/29/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
06/30/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Mark Mausert, Esq. Check No. 1311.
07/02/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days.10-17323
07/19/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-18354
07/30/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Koetting stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/08/10.10-19737
08/03/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.10-19978
08/04/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/08/10. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting.10-20088
10/26/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief.10-28063
10/26/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.10-28065
12/06/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Granting Motion to Enlarge time to File Opening Brief and Appendix in Docket No. 56138. Opening brief and appendix in docket no. 56138 due 14 days. Nos. 56306/56138.10-31650
12/14/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Answering Brief. Due Date: 15 days.10-32638
12/23/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief.10-33603
01/21/2011BriefFiled Reply Brief.11-02154
01/21/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief.11-02158
02/28/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Kravitz, Schnitzer, Sloane & Johnson, Chtd. substituted in place and stead of McCarthy & Holthus as counsel for respondent Litton Loan Servicing, LP.11-06065
03/18/2011MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion to File Supplemental Brief.11-08471
05/11/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Respondent Litton Loan Servicing, LP. We direct the clerk of this court to remove Litton Loan Servicing, LP from the caption in this appeal.11-13932
06/28/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Filing of Appendix and Clarification of Counsel. Law Firm McCarthy & Holthus: 15 days to file and serve appendix. Law Firm McCarthy & Holthus and Law Firm Kravitz, Schnitzer, Sloane & Johnson: 15 days to file a response to this order, stating whether they represent US Bank, and if not, identifying US Bank's new counsel.11-19225
07/12/2011AppendixFiled Respondents Appendix. (Submitted by McCarthy & Holthus).11-20723
07/19/2011MotionFiled Response to Order for Clarification for Counsel.11-21668
12/09/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for January 4, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the En Banc Panel.11-37593
12/22/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.11-39424
01/03/2012AppendixFiled Supplement to Appendix to Opening Brief.12-00168
01/03/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. (Robert R. Hager. Esq. of the Law Office of Hager & Hearne, is henceforth associated as co-counsel of record for the above named case).12-00197
01/04/2012Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/24/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED."12-06041
03/21/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur.12-08982
03/21/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
03/27/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2012.12-08982