Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/07/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis & Roca check no. 611892. | | |
06/07/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 11-16740
|
06/07/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 11-16742
|
06/09/2011 | Settlement Notice | Filed Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 11-17028
|
06/27/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 11-19073
|
06/29/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 11-19370
|
07/20/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Amended Docketing Statement. | | 11-21802
|
08/02/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9/7/11. | | 11-23260
|
09/12/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 11-27627
|
09/16/2011 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 11-28370
|
10/04/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: January 20, 2011; February 15, 2011; March 14-18, 2011; March 21-25, 2011; March 28-31, 2011; April 1, 2011 and June 7, 2011. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd. | | 11-30146
|
10/27/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/20/11, 2/15/11, 3/14/11, 3/15/11, 3/16/11, 3/17/11, 3/18/11, 3/21/11, 3/22/11, 3/23/11, 3/24/11, 3/25/11, 3/28/11, 3/29/11, 3/30/11, 3/31/11, 4/01/11, and 6/07/11. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 11-33287
|
11/30/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 15, 2012. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 11-36752
|
02/15/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-05038
|
02/15/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due March 16, 2012. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-05040
|
03/16/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). | | 12-08490
|
03/29/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 16, 2012. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 12-09899
|
04/16/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-12131
|
04/27/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening brief and appendix due: May 16, 2012. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-13439
|
05/16/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Fourth Request). Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-15605
|
06/08/2012 | Motion | Filed Status Report Regarding Trial Transcripts and Unopposed Motion for Extension. | | 12-18153
|
06/19/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 16, 2012. Fn1[In light of this order, appellant's May 16, 2012, motion for an extension of time is denied as moot.] Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 12-19253
|
07/17/2012 | Motion | Filed Status Report Regarding Trial Transcripts and Unopposed Motion for Extension. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 12-22461
|
07/25/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 15, 2012. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 12-23491
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25546
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25547
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25550
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25552
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25553
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25554
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25555
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25562
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25563
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25564
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25565
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25566
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25567
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25568
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 15. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25571
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 16. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25572
|
08/14/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 17. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-25573
|
08/15/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 18. | | 12-25594
|
08/15/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 19. | | 12-25598
|
08/15/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 20. | | 12-25599
|
08/15/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 21. | | 12-25600
|
08/15/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 22. | | 12-25601
|
08/16/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation. | | 12-25786
|
09/04/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limit. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief provisionally received on August 16, 2012. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 12-27809
|
09/04/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 12-27810
|
10/03/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-31235
|
10/03/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due November 5, 2012. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-31237
|
11/05/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-34881
|
12/05/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 12-38257
|
12/17/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions for Extension of Time. Respondents shall have until January 4, 2013, to file the answering brief. | | 12-39840
|
01/04/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-00315
|
01/18/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to leave to File Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-02067
|
02/20/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions for Extension of Time and for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief provisionally received in this court on January 18, 2013. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-05303
|
02/20/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-05304
|
03/21/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-08431
|
03/21/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: 04/22/13. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 13-08443
|
04/22/2013 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-11820
|
05/10/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall have until May 22, 2013, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-13899
|
05/23/2013 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 13-15210
|
06/07/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: Reply Brief due: June 21, 2013. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 13-16790
|
06/21/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-18394
|
06/27/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant's reply brief due: July 1, 2013. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-19003
|
07/02/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation (Reply Brief). Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-19357
|
07/22/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limit. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief provisionally received in this court on July 2, 2013. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-21306
|
07/22/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-21307
|
07/22/2013 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
11/04/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on the next available calendar. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 13-33067
|
12/09/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 12, 2014, @ 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 13-37001
|
01/07/2014 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 14-00563
|
01/13/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Motion. The oral argument scheduled for February 12, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be rescheduled on the next available calendar. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 14-01196
|
03/11/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, May 20, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 14-07819
|
05/06/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 14-14574
|
05/07/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 14-14686
|
05/13/2014 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Continue Oral Argument. | | 14-15451
|
05/13/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The oral argument presently scheduled for May 20, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule these consolidate appeals for oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on Thursday, June 12, 2014, at 3:00 p.m., in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. No further continuances of the oral argument shall be granted. If the parties are unable to appear on June 12, 2014, this matter shall stand submitted on the briefs, without oral argument. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 14-15553
|
05/14/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Thursday, June 12, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 14-15640
|
05/30/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 14-17515
|
06/05/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Daniel F. Polsenberg will be arguing on behalf of Appellant at Oral Argument scheduled for 06/12/14 @ 3:00 p.m.). Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 14-18356
|
06/12/2014 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14- JH/MD/MC. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | |
03/17/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed, vacated, and remanded." Fn8[In light of this opinion, the attorney fees order is also vacated." Before: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 17. SNP14-JH/MD/MC Nos. 58504/59208/59423 | | 16-08422
|
03/31/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Bill of Costs. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 16-10166
|
04/11/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $500.00. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | 16-11222
|
04/11/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $500.00. No. 58504/59208/59423. | | 16-11233
|
04/11/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 58504/59208/59423. | | |
04/29/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 19, 2016. | | 16-11233
|