Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/24/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
10/24/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 12-33694
|
10/24/2012 | Other | Justice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties | | |
10/30/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 12-34186
|
10/30/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Entry of Written Order. District court order due: 30 days. | | 12-34241
|
10/31/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 19, 2012. To Court Reporter: Lara Corcoran. | | 12-34424
|
11/19/2012 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of Finding of Facts, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court 11/16/12. | | 12-36673
|
02/21/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 13-05496
|
02/25/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 22, 2013. | | 13-05852
|
05/22/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 13-15169
|
06/03/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 20, 2013. | | 13-16132
|
08/20/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 13-24591
|
08/23/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 4, 2013, to file the opening brief and appendix. | | 13-25003
|
10/04/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to extend the time for filing the opening brief. | | 13-29732
|
10/11/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 18, 2013. | | 13-30445
|
11/18/2013 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 12/6/13) | | |
11/18/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Page Limitation on Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 13-34654
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume One. | | 13-34655
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Two. | | 13-34659
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Three. | | 13-34660
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Four. | | 13-34661
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Five. | | 13-34662
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Six. | | 13-34663
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Seven. | | 13-34668
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Eight. | | 13-34669
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Nine. | | 13-34670
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Ten. | | 13-34671
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Eleven. | | 13-34672
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Twelve. | | 13-34673
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Thirteen. | | 13-34674
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Fourteen. | | 13-34675
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Fifteen. | | 13-34676
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Sixteen. | | 13-34677
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Seventeen. | | 13-34678
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Eighteen. | | 13-34679
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Nineteen. | | 13-34680
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Twenty. | | 13-34681
|
11/18/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume Twenty One. | | 13-34682
|
12/06/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief that was inadvertently filed on November 18, 2013. Appellant: Opening Brief due: 30 days. | | 13-36732
|
01/08/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 14-00607
|
02/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief- First Request. | | 14-04007
|
02/10/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering brief due: April 8, 2014. | | 14-04286
|
04/08/2014 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 14-11143
|
04/08/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief -Respondent's Appendix. | | 14-11144
|
05/08/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time To File Reply Brief (90 days). | | 14-14929
|
05/19/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Reply Brief due: August 15, 2014. | | 14-16136
|
08/15/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 14-26910
|
08/21/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant shall have until September 15, 2014, to file and serve the reply brief. | | 14-27643
|
09/15/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 14-30525
|
09/15/2014 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
01/28/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 15-02982
|
01/28/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, March 3, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 15-03073
|
02/18/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 15-05217
|
03/03/2015 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
06/18/2015 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[The Honorable Michael Douglas, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC | | 15-18713
|
07/06/2015 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 15-20426
|
07/06/2015 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. | | |
09/17/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. | | 15-28230
|
10/01/2015 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 15-29784
|
10/22/2015 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The Honorable Michael Douglas, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] | | 15-32263
|
11/17/2015 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 15-35046
|
11/17/2015 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
12/04/2015 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 20, 2015. | | 15-35046
|