Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/20/2013 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
02/20/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) | | 13-05389
|
03/04/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Court recorder Sarah Richardson's certificate due: March 25, 2013. | | 13-06475
|
03/19/2013 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/15/11, 5/12/11, 5/26/11, 6/2/11, 6/14/11, 8/4/11,8/25/11, 10/25/11, 12/8/11, 12/22/11, 1/3/12, 1/10/12, 9/20/12, 10/2/12, 10/4/12, 10/9/12, 10/10/12, 10/11/12, 12/13/12, 1/10/13. | | 13-08208
|
03/25/2013 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/28/10, 11/04/10, and 11/18/10. | | 13-08692
|
04/01/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. | | 13-09562
|
04/03/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 22, 2013. | | 13-09734
|
04/22/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Fast Track Statement, | | 13-11779
|
04/24/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 26, 2013. | | 13-12012
|
05/01/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/27/10 To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | | 13-12776
|
06/14/2013 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Darryl Thomas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/27/10. | | 13-17665
|
06/26/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time To File FTS. | | 13-18803
|
07/05/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 26, 2013, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | | 13-19669
|
07/26/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time. | | 13-22176
|
08/05/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time Pending Decision on Motion for Full Briefing. | | 13-22849
|
08/05/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Full Briefing. | | 13-22850
|
08/07/2013 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit (original). Exhibit B. to Motion for Full Briefing (SEALED). | | |
08/09/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for the full briefing of this appeal is granted. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. In light of this order, appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the fast track statement and appendix are moot and we take no action on them. | | 13-23433
|
09/09/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for One Day Extension to File OB. | | 13-26610
|
09/11/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for One Day Extension to File OB. | | 13-26781
|
09/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Vol I. | | 13-26783
|
09/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Vol II. | | 13-26785
|
09/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Vol III. | | 13-26786
|
09/11/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: September 11, 2013. | | 13-26807
|
09/11/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 13-26832
|
09/17/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Juvenile Court Documents Under Seal In The Appendix. | | 13-27577
|
09/17/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Vol IV - Pages 711-721 Unsealed. | | 13-27578
|
09/20/2013 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to File Juvenile Court Documents Under Seal in the Appendix. | | 13-28101
|
09/23/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike Portions of Appellate's Brief for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Holding Briefing in Abeyance. | | 13-28264
|
09/24/2013 | Motion | Filed Reply to State's Opposition to Motion to File Juvenile Court Documents Under Seal in the Appendix. | | 13-28465
|
10/01/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to State's Motion to Strike Issues Within Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 13-29301
|
10/02/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike the Exhibit Attached to the State's Motion to Strike Issue I and Issue II in Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 13-29362
|
10/03/2013 | Motion | Filed Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Brief. | | 13-29490
|
10/03/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike. | | 13-29588
|
10/03/2013 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike Exhibit Attached to State's Motion. | | 13-29591
|
10/04/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to State's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike and Motion to Strike Exhibits Attached to State's Opposition. | | 13-29765
|
10/11/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Hold Briefing in Abeyance and Motion to Extend Time. | | 13-30383
|
10/14/2013 | Motion | Filed Opposition to State's (Second) Motion to Hold Briefing in Abeyance and response to State's First Motion to Extend Time. | | 13-30518
|
10/29/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We therefore deny the motion to file the juvenile court documents under seal. The clerk of this court shall remove the appendix received on September 13, 2013, from the envelope marked "sealed," redact the two references to appellant's driver's license number on page 673, and file the appendix volume IV, pages 652-710. The motion to strike portions of appellant's opening brief for lack of jurisdiction is denied, as are the State's related motions to hold briefing in abeyance pending resolution of the motion to strike. The motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. Respondent: Answering Brief due: 30 days. Fn1[We also deny the motion to strike the exhibit attached to the State's motion to strike issues from appellant's opening brief (filed on October 2, 2013) and the motion to strike exhibits attached to the State's opposition to that motion (filed October 4, 2013).] Fn3[We grant appellant's motion for leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of the opposition to the motion to strike portions of the opening brief. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental points and authorities received via E-Flex on October 4, 2013.] | | 13-32416
|
10/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV. (SEALED PAGES 652-95 AND 700-10 PER ORDER FILED 1/23/14) | | 13-32419
|
10/29/2013 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Points and Authorities In Support of Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike Issues I and II of Opening Brief. | | 13-32423
|
10/30/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Reconsider the Denial of His Motoin to File Juvenile Court Documents Under Seal in the Appendix. | | 13-32542
|
10/30/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Denial of Motion to File Juvenile Court Documents Under Seal in the Appendix. | | 13-32652
|
10/31/2013 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion Opposition to State's Motion to Strike Portions of Appellan's Motion to Reconsider | | 13-32719
|
10/31/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Amended Motion to Reconsider Alternatively Second Motion. | | 13-32721
|
10/31/2013 | Motion | Filed Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Portion of Appellant's Motion to Reconsider. | | 13-32829
|
11/12/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. In this order, we address the motion to strike, the opposition to that motion, and the reply. Citation to the case is inappropriate, and we will not consider it in resolving the motion to reconsider. Respondent: Response to motion due: November 15, 2013. | | 13-33667
|
11/26/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 13-35742
|
12/03/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion Supplementing The Authority Presented in his Motion to Reconsider Denial of Motion to File Juvenile Court Documents Under Seal. | | 13-36144
|
12/04/2013 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Appellant's Motion Supplementing the Authority in his Motion to Reconsider | | 13-36467
|
12/10/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Reply to State's Response to Barber's Motion to Supplement in Excess of Five Pages. | | 13-37246
|
12/13/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Reply Brief. | | 13-37874
|
12/13/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file reply brief is approved. Due date: January 24, 2014. | | 13-37918
|
01/23/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting in Part Motion for Reconsideration. We direct the clerk of the court to seal pages 652-95, 700-10 of volume IV of appellant's appendix. Fn1[We grant appellant's motions filed on December 3, 2013 and December 10, 2013. The clerk of this court is directed to file appellant's reply to the State's response to appellant's motion to supplement received on December 10, 2013.] | | 14-02406
|
01/23/2014 | Motion | Filed Reply to State's Response to Barber's Motion to Supplement. | | 14-02413
|
01/24/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. | | 14-02616
|
01/29/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for One Day Extension to File Reply Brief. | | 14-02996
|
01/30/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Type Volume Limitations. | | 14-03173
|
02/19/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation and Granting Motions for Extension of Time In Part. The clerk of this court shall reject the reply brief received via E-Flex on January 30, 2014. The clerk of this court shall file the reply appendix received via E-Flex on January31, 2014. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief that complies with either the standard page limitation (not more than 15 pages) or type-volume limitation (not more than 7000 words). | | 14-05381
|
02/19/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief -Appellant's Appendix Vol IV Pages 722-751. | | 14-05386
|
02/26/2014 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Order of 02-19-14 and Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. | | 14-06387
|
03/14/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on February 26, 2014. Because we grant the motion to exceed the type-volume limitation, the motion for reconsideration is denied as moot. | | 14-08393
|
03/14/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 14-08394
|
12/04/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 14-39424
|
01/07/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, February 12, 2015, @ 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 15-00717
|
01/28/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 15-03060
|
02/12/2015 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP15-RP/MD/MC. | | |
12/31/2015 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 103. EN BANC | | 15-40143
|
01/25/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 16-02412
|
01/25/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
02/11/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 28, 2016. | | 16-02412
|
03/24/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers dated March 21, 2016, with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65390/62357/66410/66474/62931/64946/67331/65143/62649. (Letter entered in 65390 as document no. 16-09339) | | |