Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/15/2013 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer. Check no. 1083. | | |
07/15/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 13-20577
|
07/15/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 13-20579
|
07/16/2013 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 13-20733
|
07/26/2013 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
07/26/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel N. Azevedo for appellants he represents.) | | 13-22131
|
07/29/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. | | 13-22311
|
07/31/2013 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Norman Azevedo. Check No. 6127. | | |
08/06/2013 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 13-22978
|
08/15/2013 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 13-24122
|
09/11/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay of July 1, 2013 Order and Reinstatement of Partial Stay of February 8, 2013 State Board of Equalization Decision Pending Resolution of this Appeal; Supporting Points and Authorities. | | 13-26842
|
09/12/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Responsible Attorney (Herbert B. Kaplan, Deputy District Attorney in place and stead of David Creekman, Chief Deputy District Attorney). | | 13-26949
|
09/12/2013 | Motion | Filed Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Stay of July 1, 2013 Order. | | 13-26971
|
09/12/2013 | Motion | Filed Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Stay of July 1, 2013 Order and Reinstatement of Partial Stay of February 8, 2013 State Board of Equalization Decision Pending Resolution of This Appeal. | | 13-27027
|
10/01/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Stay. We grant the motion and stay the July 1, 2013, order entered in District Court Case No. CV03-06922 pending resolution of this appeal. | | 13-29184
|
11/12/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 13-33640
|
11/12/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: November 25, 2013. Appellants represented by Sullen Fulstone. | | 13-33845
|
11/25/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief (cd Included). | | 13-35545
|
11/25/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief (Appellants Ellen Bakst, Jane Barnhart, Carol Buck, Daniel Schwartz, Larry Watkins, Don Wilson, Patricia Wilson & Agnieszka Winkler). | | 13-35548
|
11/25/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion of Village League Appellants for an Extension of Time for Filing Opening Brief - Second Request. | | 13-35647
|
11/25/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Village League's Opening Brief Due Date: December 9, 2013. | | 13-35649
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 1. | | 13-35983
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 2. | | 13-35984
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 3. | | 13-35986
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 4. | | 13-35987
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 5. | | 13-35988
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 6. | | 13-35989
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 7. | | 13-35990
|
11/27/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 8. | | 13-35991
|
12/10/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (Appellants Andrew Whyman, Dean R. Ingemanson, Dean R. Ingemanson Trust, J. Robert Anderson, Kathy Nelson, Kathy Nelson Trust, Larry D. & Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust, Les Barta, Maryanne Ingemanson, Village League to Save Incline Assets, Inc). | | 13-37150
|
12/10/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. | | 13-37161
|
12/18/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Substitution of Dean Ingemanson in the Place of the Deceased Maryanne Ingemanson as Trustee of the Appellant Larry D. and Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust; Supporting Points and Authorities. | | 13-38511
|
12/26/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief. (Appellants Ellen Bakst, Jane Barnhart, Carol Buck, Daniel Schwartz, Larry Watkins, Don Wilson, Patricia Wilson & Agnieszka Winkler-Opening Brief). | | 13-39247
|
01/09/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Non-Participation (Respondent Norma Green, hereby gives this Court notice that Churchill County and the Churchill County Assessor Norma Green does not intend to participate in this appeal, nor file a brief herein). | | 14-00899
|
01/13/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. State, Bd. of Equalization Answering Brief due: January 16, 2014. | | 14-01179
|
01/13/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Washoe Co., Washoe Co. Treasurer, and Washoe Co. Assessor Answering Brief due: January 16, 2014. | | 14-01182
|
01/13/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Celeste Hamilton as a Party to This Appeal or Extend the Time to File an Answering Brief. | | 14-01253
|
01/14/2014 | Motion | Filed Respondent State Board of Equalization's Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Celeste Hamilton as a Party To this Appeal or Extend Time to File an Answering Brief. | | 14-01434
|
01/15/2014 | Brief | Filed Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief. | | 14-01540
|
01/15/2014 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Vol I, Part I. | | 14-01603
|
01/15/2014 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume II, Part I. | | 14-01611
|
01/15/2014 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume III, Part I. | | 14-01612
|
01/16/2014 | Motion | Filed Notice of Washoe County Respondents' Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Celeste Hamilton as a Party to this Appeal or Extend the Time to File an Answering Brief. | | 14-01693
|
01/17/2014 | Brief | Filed Washoe County Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 14-01810
|
01/17/2014 | Motion | Filed Response of Village League Taxpayers to Pershing County Assessor Motion to Dismiss or Extend Time to File Answering Brief. | | 14-01842
|
01/21/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder to Village League's Response to Pershing County's Motion to Dismiss. | | 14-02052
|
01/23/2014 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Celeste Hamilton's Motion to Dismiss. | | 14-02303
|
01/24/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief (Bakst Appellant's). | | 14-02487
|
01/24/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: February 24, 2014. | | 14-02588
|
01/24/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Substitute Personal Representative and Dismiss Respondents Celeste Hamilton and Norma Green. Counsel for appellant Maryanne Ingemanson, Trustee of the Larry D. and Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust, has filed a notice informing this court of Maryanne's death and a motion to substitute Dean Ingemanson in the place of Maryanne as Trustee of the Larry D. and Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust, pointing out that Dean is named as Maryanne's successor trustee. The motion is granted. The motion to dismiss Hamilton from this appeal is granted. We conclude that Green should likewise be dismissed from this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption in accordance with this order. Fn1[We deny as moot Hamilton's alternative request to extend the time for filing an answering brief.] | | 14-02622
|
02/12/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Village League & Bakst Appellant's). | | 14-04529
|
02/12/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: March 17, 2014. | | 14-04579
|
03/11/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request) | | 14-07892
|
03/17/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellants' Reply Briefs due: March 26, 2014. | | 14-08555
|
03/26/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Third Request). (Village League Appellants) | | 14-09641
|
03/27/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (Bakst Appellants) | | 14-09682
|
04/02/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Fourth Request - Village League Appellants). | | 14-10519
|
04/07/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation. | | 14-10884
|
04/07/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Correction to Opening Brief. | | 14-10921
|
04/25/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions for Extension of Time and for Leave to File Oversized Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the Viallage League appellants' reply brief and second supplement appendix, both of which were received on April 7, 2014. | | 14-13371
|
04/25/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief with addendum - Village League. | | 14-13372
|
04/25/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Second Supplemental Appendix - Village League. | | 14-13373
|
04/25/2014 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
08/04/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 14-25392
|
08/20/2014 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authorities to Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief to Appellants' (Intervenors') Opening Brief. | | 14-27401
|
09/09/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata (Answering Brief) | | 14-29775
|
09/09/2014 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authorities to Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief to Appellants' Opening Brief. | | 14-29776
|
09/24/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, November 3, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 14-31745
|
10/17/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata (to State Board's Answering Brief) . | | 14-34702
|
10/22/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 14-35263
|
11/03/2014 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
11/03/2014 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
11/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Filed Notice of Change of Address (Norman Azevedo). | | 16-35496
|
01/26/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Fn1[The honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1. | | 17-02861
|
02/21/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-05951
|
02/21/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/02/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2017. | | 17-05951
|