Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/18/2013 | Filing Fee | Filing fee waived: Criminal. | | |
10/18/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 13-31431
|
11/14/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 13-34261
|
12/13/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Statement Late. | | 13-37881
|
12/20/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file an untimely fast track statement. The motion is denied. Attorney David R. Houston therefore remains counsel of record before this court and is obligated to comply with this court's rules and orders unless he is relieved by this court. Counsel: 15 days to file a docketing statement and a transcript request form. | | 13-38781
|
01/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to be Relieved as Appointed Counsel and to Appoint the Washoe County Public Defender. | | 14-00237
|
01/06/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 14-00347
|
01/07/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/22/13, 7/23/13, 7/24/13, 7/25/13, 7/29/13, 7/30/13, 7/31/13, 8/1/13, 8/2/13, 8/5/13, 8/6/13 & 8/7/13. To Court Reporter: Captions Unlimited. | | 14-00447
|
01/13/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Remanding for Appointment of Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Houston as counsel of record for appellant. We remand this appeal for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District Court: written or minute order due: 35 days. Briefing suspended. | | 14-01104
|
01/27/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (John Reese Petty as appellate counsel for Appellant, Ernesto Manuel Gonzalez) | | 14-02734
|
02/04/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. Fn1[Appellant's former counsel filed a docketing statement on January 6, 2014, and a transcript request form on January 7, 2014. | | 14-03535
|
02/10/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice: Regarding Transcripts. | | 14-04236
|
02/10/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/22/13, 7/23/13, 7/24/13, 7/25/13, 7/29/13, 7/30/13, 7/31/13, 8/1/13, 8/2/13, 8/5/13, 8/6/13, 8/7/13 & 8/8/13 To Court Reporter: Captions Unlimited of Nevada and M. Ferrell, B. Van Auken, S. Culp, Phipps, and S. Loder. | | 14-04240
|
02/24/2014 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order appointing Washoe County Public Defenders Office to Represent Appellant filed in district court on 1/24/14. | | 14-06010
|
05/16/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Stephani L. Loder stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/15/13, 7/18/13, 7/19/13, 7/22/13 - 7/25/13, 7/29/13 - 8/02/13, 8/5/13 - 8/08/13. | | 14-16022
|
05/27/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for extension of time to File Opening Brief. | | 14-17084
|
05/27/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: July 7, 2014. | | 14-17154
|
06/03/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys - Richard F. Cornell, Esq. as counsel for appellant in place and stead of Washoe County Public Defender's Office. | | 14-17949
|
06/03/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). | | 14-18017
|
06/06/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 6, 2014. | | 14-18484
|
10/01/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time (Second Request by Current Counsel). | | 14-32712
|
10/03/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 5, 2014. | | 14-32914
|
11/03/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Third Request). | | 14-36144
|
11/07/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 17, 2014. | | 14-36850
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume I. | | 14-37438
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume II. | | 14-37439
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume III. | | 14-37440
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume IV. | | 14-37441
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume V. | | 14-37443
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume VI. | | 14-37444
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume VII. | | 14-37445
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volum VIII. | | 14-37490
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume IX. | | 14-37489
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume X. | | 14-37491
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XI. | | 14-37493
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XII. | | 14-37505
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XIII | | 14-37506
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XIV | | 14-37508
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XV | | 14-37511
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volum XVI. | | 14-37512
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XVII | | 14-37514
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XVIII | | 14-37515
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XIX | | 14-37523
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XX. | | 14-37524
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XXI | | 14-37525
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XXII | | 14-37531
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Volume XXIII | | 14-37532
|
11/13/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Order Permitting Filing of Oversized Brief. | | 14-37533
|
11/14/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received via E-Flex on November 13, 2014. Respondent: 30 days to file the answering brief. | | 14-37666
|
11/14/2014 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 14-37667
|
12/15/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time File Answering Brief. | | 14-40743
|
12/15/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: January 14, 2015. | | 14-40755
|
01/15/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time. | | 15-01642
|
01/23/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 13, 2015. | | 15-02598
|
02/12/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 15-04814
|
03/03/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-06564
|
03/03/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 13, 2015. | | 15-06566
|
04/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Reply Brief (Second Request). | | 15-10511
|
04/10/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: May 13, 2015. | | 15-10852
|
04/21/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Order for Filing of Oversized Reply Brief. | | 15-12091
|
04/24/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's counsel has filed a motion for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall reject the reply brief received via E-Flex on April 21, 2015. Reply Brief due: 15 days. | | 15-12594
|
04/30/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-13124
|
04/30/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
07/28/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 15-22778
|
07/30/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, September 2, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 15-23087
|
08/05/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Direct the District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Exhibits. | | 15-23619
|
08/13/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Changing Start Time For Oral Argument. This matter is currently Scheduled for oral argument at 10:00 a.m. on September 2, 2015. Cause appearing, the start time for the argument is hereby changed although the date remains the same. Oral argument will now be held at 11:00 a.m. on September 2, 2015, in Carson City. | | 15-24416
|
08/14/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting in Part Motion to Transmit Original Exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall have until August 21, 2015, to transmit to the clerk of this court the original exhibit 151, admitted on July 24, 2013, and described on the district court exhibit list as "Thumb Drive." Because appellant fails to demonstrate that exhibits 1, 1A, and 130 are incapable of being reproduced in an appendix we deny the motion to transmit those exhibits. | | 15-24625
|
08/18/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 15-24952
|
09/02/2015 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision before the En Banc Court. | | |
12/31/2015 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 99. EN BANC | | 15-40132
|
01/19/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 16-01771
|
01/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant: Answer due: 15 days. | | 16-02308
|
02/04/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 16-03765
|
03/25/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 16-09459
|
04/19/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Original Exhibit 151 "Thumb Drive" to District Court Clerk. | | 16-12144
|
04/19/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
04/29/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 21, 2016. | | 16-12144
|