Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/15/2013 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
11/15/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 13-34420
|
11/19/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED - District Court Minutes. | | |
12/02/2013 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 13-36107
|
12/06/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/18/11, 11/30/11, 02/01/12, 02/08/12, 04/11/12, 10/17/12, 04/29/13, 05/13/13, 05/14/13, 05/15/13, 05/16/13, 05/17/13, 05/20/13, 05/21/13, 05/22/13, 05/23/13, 05/24/13, 05/28/13, 05/29/13, 05/30/13, 05/31/13, and 10/23/13. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent & Victoria Boyd. | | 13-36700
|
01/06/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/18/11. | | 14-00329
|
01/21/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to Prepare and File Transcripts. | | 14-01871
|
01/22/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Victoria Boyd's certificate due: March 13, 2014. Appellant shall have until May 2, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 14-02188
|
03/31/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Recorder. Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts not specified. | | 14-10145
|
05/01/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulaton to File Opening Brief. | | 14-14035
|
05/01/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/8/11, 5/11/11, 8/17/11, 8/24/11, 8/31/11, 9/28/11, 11/7/11, 11/30/11. To Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt and Victoria Boyd. | | 14-14134
|
05/06/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant shall have until June 2, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 14-14517
|
05/12/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/8/11. | | 14-15215
|
06/02/2014 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcripts (Opening Brief - 90 days). | | 14-17881
|
06/06/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 2, 2014. | | 14-18468
|
06/10/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Transcripts. Court recorder Victoria Boyd's certificate due: 20 days. If Ms. Boyd believes that she is not responsible for producing the requested transcripts, she shall inform this court in writing immediately. Fn1[Copies of the transcript request forms are attached.] | | 14-18871
|
07/01/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcripts. | | 14-21545
|
07/02/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/1/12, 5/13/13, 5/14/13, 5/15/13, 5/16/13, 5/17/13, 5/20/13, 5/21/13, 5/22/13, 5/23/13, 5/24/13, 5/28/13, 5/29/13, 5/30/13, and 5/31/13. | | 14-21601
|
07/16/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Victoria Boyd's certificate due: September 8, 2014. Appellant shall have until October 28, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 14-23069
|
08/28/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: Not listed. | | 14-28453
|
10/28/2014 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief - 90 days). | | 14-35902
|
11/07/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix du: January 26, 2015. | | 14-36848
|
01/27/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Portions of The Trial of Record. | | 15-02855
|
01/30/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 9, 2015. | | 15-03318
|
03/09/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Portions of The Trial Record. | | 15-07291
|
03/16/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 8, 2015. | | 15-08010
|
05/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Portions of the Trial Record (Opening Brief and Appendix). | | 15-14239
|
05/26/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 7, 2015. | | 15-15888
|
07/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). | | 15-20672
|
07/10/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 10, 2015. | | 15-20998
|
08/11/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time. (Opening Brief) | | 15-24128
|
08/21/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 31, 2015. | | 15-25342
|
08/31/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time. | | 15-26418
|
09/11/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Three Business Day Extension. | | 15-27507
|
09/16/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. | | 15-28031
|
09/22/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 15-28649
|
09/24/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time. (1day) | | 15-28876
|
09/25/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for One Day Extension Due to Uploading Problems (Opening Brief). | | 15-29019
|
09/29/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). | | 15-29528
|
10/02/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We direct the clerk to file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on September 25, 2015. District Court Exhibit G, filed in case no. C-11-277-666-1, due: 30 days. fn1[We deny as moot appellant's motions filed August 31, 2015, September 11, 2015, September 16, 2015, September 22, 2015, and September 25, 2015.] | | 15-29926
|
10/02/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-29929
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. I. | | 15-29930
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. II. | | 15-29931
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. III. | | 15-29932
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. IV. | | 15-29933
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. V. | | 15-29934
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. VI. | | 15-29935
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. VII. | | 15-29936
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. VIII. | | 15-29937
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. IX. | | 15-29938
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. X. | | 15-29939
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XI. | | 15-29940
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XII. | | 15-29941
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol XIII. | | 15-29942
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XIV. | | 15-29943
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XV. | | 15-29944
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XVI. | | 15-29945
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XVII. | | 15-29946
|
10/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XVIII. | | 15-29947
|
10/14/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Opening Brief. | | 15-31265
|
11/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 15-33192
|
11/02/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amended opening brief received on October 14, 2015. Answering Brief due: December 17, 2015. | | 15-33236
|
11/02/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. | | 15-33239
|
12/17/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time Second Request (Answering Brief). | | 15-38578
|
12/31/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: January 4, 2016. | | 15-40163
|
12/31/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 15-40218
|
02/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Reply Brief. | | 16-03295
|
02/01/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: March 1, 2016. | | 16-03300
|
03/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Reply Brief). | | 16-06661
|
03/07/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: March 11, 2016. | | 16-07223
|
03/14/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Type Volume Limitations. | | 16-07957
|
03/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received March 14, 2016. | | 16-08956
|
03/22/2016 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 16-08957
|
03/22/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
07/11/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 16-21536
|
07/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Errata to Amended Opening Brief. | | 16-22078
|
07/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Errata to Reply Brief. | | 16-22079
|
08/12/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Saitta. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 60. SNP16-JH/NS/KP | | 16-24996
|
08/30/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 16-26949
|
09/16/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] | | 16-28863
|
09/27/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 16-29938
|
11/23/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | | 16-36501
|
12/02/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay Remittitur. | | 16-37306
|
12/14/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until April 18, 2017. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by April 18, 2017, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by April 18, 2017, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. | | 16-38811
|
02/28/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed February 21, 2017 and placed on the docket as Case No. 16-8077. | | 17-06895
|
04/24/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | | 17-13485
|
04/24/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned District Court Exhibit G, filed in case no. C-11-277-666-1. | | 17-13498
|
04/24/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
05/05/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 27, 2017. | | 17-13498
|