Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/10/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
03/10/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 14-07516
|
03/10/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 14-07520
|
03/10/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 14-07548
|
03/12/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hall Jaffe & Clayton LLP. Check No. 20597. | | |
03/13/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 14-08241
|
03/17/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 14-08491
|
04/01/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Request to Consolidate Appeals in Case Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-10235
|
04/18/2014 | Motion | Filed Reporter's Request for Extension for Preparation of Transcriptsl. | | 14-12538
|
04/22/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Briefing Schedule. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-12973
|
05/12/2014 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kristy Clark stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/15/13, 7/18/13, 7/19/13, 7/22/13, 7/23/13, 7/24/13, 7/25/13, 7/26/13, and 1/23/14. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-15184
|
05/14/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motions for Extensions of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 8, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-15642
|
07/02/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Appellant's Brief and Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-21602
|
07/18/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Appellant shall therefore have until August 7, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-23353
|
08/07/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-25871
|
08/18/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 22, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-27093
|
09/22/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix - Third Request. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-31401
|
09/24/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 6, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-31711
|
10/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-33109
|
10/10/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: October 20, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-33729
|
10/13/2014 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix and Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-33806
|
10/21/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation. | | 14-34941
|
11/13/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on October 20, 2014. Answering Brief due: 30 days. We deny respondent's countermotion to dismiss this appeal. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37324
|
11/13/2014 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37325
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Table of Contents to Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37326
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume I. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37327
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume II. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37328
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume III. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37329
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume IV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37330
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume V. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37331
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume VI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37332
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume VII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37333
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume VIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37334
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume IX. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37335
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume X. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37336
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37337
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37338
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37339
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XIV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37340
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37341
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XVI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37342
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XVII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37343
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XVIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37344
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XIX. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37345
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XX. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37346
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37347
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37348
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37349
|
11/13/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXIV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-37350
|
12/11/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-40297
|
12/11/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: January 14, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 14-40366
|
01/13/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-01357
|
01/23/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 13, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-02589
|
02/13/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief In Excess of Page and Type-Volume Limitations. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-04836
|
02/13/2015 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. (EXHIBIT A, PAGES 2-26 AND EXHIBIT C, PAGES 33-41 STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 5/15/15) | | 15-04837
|
02/18/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on February 13, 2015. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-05321
|
02/18/2015 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief Respondent's Answering Brief (BRIEF STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 5/15/15) | | |
03/18/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg and Joel Henriod as counsel for the Appellant). Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-08245
|
03/20/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Appellant to File Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-08596
|
03/20/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 20, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-08600
|
04/15/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-11280
|
04/20/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-11886
|
04/24/2015 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix, Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Defer Consideration Pending Respondent's Effort to Enlarge The Record, et al. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-12508
|
05/01/2015 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-13392
|
05/15/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has moved to strike two of the three documents included in respondent's appendix. We grant appellant's motion as follows and deny respondent's counter-motion. We grant appellant's motion and strike Exhibit A, pages 2-26, and Exhibit C, pages 33-41 of respondent's appendix. In addition, rather than strike portions of the answering brief that refer to the stricken documents, we strike the entire brief and direct respondent to file an amended answering brief. Respondent: Amended Answering Brief due: 20 days. We deny respondent's request that this court take judicial notice of the stricken documents. We decline to strike portions of the opening brief as requested by respondent. Fn1[Exhibit B, pages 28-32 is file-stamped by the district court; accordingly, it is part of the district court record, and we decline to strike it.] Fn2[We deny as moot appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply.] Nos. 64702/65007/65172 | | 15-14938
|
05/27/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to file Answering Brief In Excess of Page and Type-Volume Limitations. Nos. 6470265007/65172. | | 15-16081
|
05/28/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page and Type-Volume Limitations. We direct the clerk of this court to file respondent's answering brief and appendix received on May 27, 2015. Reply Brief due: 30 days. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-16317
|
05/28/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 15-16319
|
05/28/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | | 15-16320
|
06/30/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-19879
|
06/30/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: July 29, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-19957
|
07/29/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-22916
|
07/29/2015 | Motion | Filed Amended Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-22942
|
08/14/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 28, 2015. fn1[Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is denied ass moot.] Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-24610
|
08/28/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-26213
|
09/04/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: September 11, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-26931
|
09/14/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation for Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-27700
|
09/23/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's reply brief received via E-Flex on September 11, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-28790
|
09/23/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-28791
|
09/23/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/23/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 15-39515
|
01/06/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, January 25, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 16-00307
|
01/12/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 16-00860
|
01/20/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Dan Polsenberg as counsel for Appellant). Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 16-01990
|
01/21/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument, Benjamin P. Cloward, Esq., of Cloward Hicks & Brasier. PLLC will be arguing on behalf respondent Margaret Seastrand at upcoming oral argument. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 16-02055
|
01/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 16-02216
|
01/22/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 16-02314
|
01/25/2016 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | |
01/25/2016 | Other | Chief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. Nos. 64702/65007/65172 | | |
07/28/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Pickering, J., concurring. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. EN BANC Nos. 64702/65007/65172 | | 16-23415
|
08/22/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | 16-26081
|
08/22/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. | | |
09/15/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2016. | | 16-26081
|
11/07/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632) | | |