Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/06/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
08/06/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 14-25706
|
08/06/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 14-25709
|
08/08/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk - Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. | | |
08/12/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jeffrey Burr Ltd. - check no. 42847. | | |
08/12/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 14-26350
|
08/14/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin. | | 14-26772
|
08/29/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 14-28620
|
09/05/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9:00 am on October 15, 2014. | | 14-29512
|
10/29/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | | 14-35935
|
11/03/2014 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 21 days. | | 14-36230
|
11/04/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorney (David L. Mann, Esq. as counsel for Appellant, Eleanor Connell Hartman Ahern in place and stead of John R. Mugan, Esq., Michael D. Lum, Esq., and Jeffrey Burr, Esq.). | | 14-36464
|
11/05/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Revised Interim Settlement Program Report. The final Settlement Report is amended or withdrawn. After filing of that report appellant replaced counsel. New counsel asserts that no global settlement was reached, a view disputed by respondent counsel. Discussions reopened to see if the new issues can be resolved. | | 14-36581
|
11/07/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Appellant's Response to Settlement Judge's Report. | | 14-36804
|
11/24/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Eleanor Ahern. | | 14-38593
|
11/26/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys, Dale A. Hayes, Esq., Liane K. Wakayama, Esq., and Candice E. Renka, Esq., of the law firm of Marquis Aurbach Coffing, for Eleanor Ahern. | | 14-38987
|
12/22/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 14-41782
|
02/27/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Fn1[In light of the substitution of attorneys filed on November 26, 2014, the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Eleanor Ahern filed by David L. Mann, is denied as moot.] | | 15-06252
|
03/13/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 15-07835
|
04/23/2015 | Motion | Filed Marquis Aurbach Coffing's NRAP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Eleanor Connell Hartman Ahern. | | 15-12319
|
04/24/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove Dale A. Hayes, Liane K. Wakayama, Candice E. Renka, and the law firm of Marquis Aurbach Coffing from the docket of this appeal. Appellant: Notice of Appearance due: 30 days. Briefing suspended. | | 15-12585
|
05/26/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance as Counsel on Appeal (Kirk B. Lenhard, Tamara Beatty Peterson and Benjamin K. Reitz of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP as counsel for the Appellant). | | 15-15929
|
06/01/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Appeal, Whitney B. Warnick, Esq. of Albright, Stodard, Warnick & Albright for the Respondent. | | 15-16543
|
06/03/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 15-16910
|
06/18/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/14/15, 04/22/15, 05/13/15 (Esparza), 12/19/14, 02/18/15 (Haak). To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza and Francesca Haak. | | 15-18723
|
07/14/2015 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/14/15. | | 15-21310
|
08/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals. | | 15-23844
|
08/26/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Request for Notices. | | 15-25904
|
08/26/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). | | 15-25926
|
08/26/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 1, 2015. | | 15-25934
|
08/31/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We hereby consolidate these appeals. Appellant shall file a single opening brief and appendix on or before October 21, 2015. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Michael K. Wall for notice only on the docket of these consolidated appeals. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-26344
|
10/19/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time. (Opening Brief) Nos.66231/67782/68046. | | 15-31705
|
10/23/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 20, 2015. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-32420
|
11/20/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35643
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35644
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35645
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35646
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35647
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35650
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35651
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35652
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35653
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 9 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35654
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 10 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35655
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 11 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35656
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 12 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35657
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35658
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35659
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35660
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 16 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35661
|
11/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 17 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-35662
|
11/25/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to File Portions of Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-36164
|
12/04/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. | | 15-37023
|
12/21/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Approving Stipulation. The clerk of this court shall file the portions of the appendix received on November 25, 2015, under seal. Answering Brief due: January 20, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 15-39035
|
12/21/2015 | Appendix | Filed Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15). | | |
12/21/2015 | Appendix | Filed Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15). | | |
12/21/2015 | Appendix | Filed Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15). | | |
01/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time (Answering Brief). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-00545
|
01/12/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/14/15, 10/14/15. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-00924
|
01/27/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 19, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-02798
|
02/19/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-05446
|
02/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-05447
|
03/17/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Frederick Brown, a nonparty to these consolidated appeals, has submitted a request that this court take judicial notice of certain documents. Mr. Brown has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents as an amicus curiae. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the document received on February 18, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-08467
|
03/21/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-08878
|
03/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Reply Brief due: April 4, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-09772
|
04/05/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-10610
|
04/05/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
05/02/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-13593
|
08/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-24756
|
08/24/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant, Tamara Beatty Peterson, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove Tamara Beatty Peterson as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall continue to be represented by Kirk B. Lenhard and Benjamin K. Reitz of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP. Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 16-26343
|
01/26/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 66231) And Order of Affirmance (Docket Nos. 67782 and 68046). "ORDER the judgments of the district court in Docket Nos. 67782 and 68046 AFFIRMED and the appeal in Docket No. 66231 DISMISSED." Nos. 66231/67782/68046. SNP17-MD/MG/KP. | | 17-02927
|
02/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent Jacqueline M. Montoyas' Motion to Reissue Order as Published Opinion Pursuant to NRAP 36(F). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 17-04902
|
05/04/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part and dismissed in part." Fn1[We grant respondent Montoya's motion to reissue the order as an opinion, and issue this opinion in place of our prior order.] Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. SNP17-MD/MG/KP Nos. 66231/67782/68046 | | 17-14811
|
06/01/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | | 17-18276
|
09/29/2017 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document "Petition for Rehearing." Nos. 66231/67782/68046. | | 17-33264
|
10/24/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 68046/66231/67782 | | 17-36559
|
10/24/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 68046/66231/67782 | | |
11/13/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2017. | | 17-36559
|