Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/20/2015 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
03/20/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 15-08649
|
03/26/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 60 days. | | 15-09277
|
04/01/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 15-09899
|
05/27/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 1. | | 15-40341
|
05/27/2015 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
11/24/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. Having considered the record and the proper person appeal statement, this court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent appellant would assist this court in reviewing this appeal. This case is hereby referred to the program established by the Pro Bono Committee to evaluate whether appellant can benefit from the program. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance or Statement from the Legal Aid Center of Nevada due: 60 days. | | 15-35985
|
12/01/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 15-36577
|
02/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. On November 24, 2015, this court entered an order referring appellant to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening for the possible appointment of pro bono counsel. In an abundance of caution, we again direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance for Appellant due: 60 days. fn1[A copy of that order is attached.] | | 16-05617
|
03/16/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Statement of Legal Aid Representation (Pursuant to NRS 12.015) (SOLA). | | 16-08346
|
03/16/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel (Kirk Lenhard as counsel for the Appellant). | | 16-08347
|
03/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Transcript Request Form due: 14 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 16-08942
|
03/30/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-09966
|
04/06/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript is Being Requested. | | 16-10699
|
06/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-19341
|
07/15/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant Michael P. Anselmo's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record on Appeal. | | 16-22142
|
07/20/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 16-22603
|
08/09/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Appellant to File Reply Brief on Appeal. | | 16-24607
|
08/09/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: September 19, 2016. | | 16-24609
|
09/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has moved to supplement the record on appeal with documentation considered by the parole board, but not considered by the district court, reflecting his progress within the prison system. The motion is unopposed. Having considered the motion, we deny it. | | 16-27186
|
09/20/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-29104
|
09/20/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
12/28/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This matter was previously submitted on the record and briefs filed herein. Upon further review, the court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 16-40345
|
12/29/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled on Thursday, March 16, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. for 30 minutes at Reed High School. | | 16-40483
|
12/29/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Notice of Disclosure. The court and parties are advised that the undersigned represented appellant before the pardons board and secured a commutation of his sentence when I was a practicing criminal defense attorney. In my present capacity as Chief Assistant Clerk of Court, I keep argument minutes and conference notes on behalf of the justices but do not vote in case deliberations. Should any of the parties object to my role as court clerk in this case, they shall notify the court within 10 days from the date of this notice. | | 16-40492
|
12/29/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel (Jeffrey Conner as counsel for the Respondent). | | 16-40551
|
01/04/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-00206
|
01/11/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant Michael P. Anselmo's Notice of Non-Objection to Notice of Disclosure. | | 17-01090
|
03/03/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-07369
|
03/09/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance - Emily Ellis as counsel for the appellant. (Emily Ellis and Kurt Lenhard will be arguing during argument). | | 17-08016
|
03/16/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. JH/RP/LS | | |
06/29/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct the clerk of this court to convert Anselmo's appeal into an original petition for a writ of mandamus. | | 17-21697
|
06/29/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to isse a writ of mandamus instructing the Board to vacate its November 17, 2014, denial of parole and conduct a new parole hearing in which NAC 213.518(2)(k) is not applied. Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 45. NNP17-JH/RP/LS | | 17-21700
|
06/29/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Daniel M. Roche to be Removed from Case). | | 17-21724
|
06/29/2017 | Writ | Issued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the Opinion mailed to Attorney Kirk Lenhard for service upon The State of Nevada Board of Parole. | | 17-21751
|
07/07/2017 | Writ | Filed Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on The State of Nevada Board of Parole on 07/05/17.. | | 17-22538
|
07/17/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Real Party in Interests' Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-23713
|
10/11/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer. Petitioner's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: 15 days. | | 17-34638
|
10/30/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petitioner's Answer to Petition for Panel Rehearing. | | 17-36945
|
11/16/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Correcting Opinion Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The clerk of this court is directed to strike the words "Division of Parole and Probation" from lines 2-3 on page 8 of the Advance Opinion, and to replace them with the words "Board of Parole Commissioners," such that the first sentence on page 8 of the Advance Opinion reads as follows: "With respect to the aggravating factor under NAC 213.518(2)(k), the internal guidelines for the Board of Parole Commissioners state?."] | | 17-39569
|
12/01/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Real Parties in Interest's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 17-41511
|
01/19/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. | | 18-02625
|
02/13/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing. | | 18-05869
|
02/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/02/2018 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document "Motion for Clarification of Court Order and Order to Enforce Order." | | 18-25122
|