Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
04/22/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 15-12220
|
04/22/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 15-12222
|
04/23/2015 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 15-12402
|
04/24/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer LLP. Check No. 15757. | | |
04/30/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Attorney David Frederick appearing as additional counsel for respondent. | | 15-13215
|
04/30/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Attorney A. William Maupin appearing as additional counsel for respondent. | | 15-13216
|
05/08/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 2, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. | | 15-14184
|
05/12/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 15-14535
|
05/12/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). | | 15-14537
|
06/08/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 15-17393
|
06/09/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 15-17609
|
06/19/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 15-18829
|
07/30/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-23048
|
07/30/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 8, 2015. | | 15-23052
|
09/29/2015 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion for 30-Day Extension of Time For Filing Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-29512
|
10/16/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 9, 2015. | | 15-31522
|
11/10/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-34208
|
11/10/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volumes 1-19. | | 15-34254
|
11/19/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Bailey Kennedy as counsel for the Amici Curiae). | | 15-35461
|
11/19/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of the National Association of Manufacturers and Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers, Inc. in Support of Appellant. | | 15-35462
|
12/01/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Admit Victor E. Schwartz Pro Hac Vice. | | 15-36526
|
12/04/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Respondent's Answering Brief (First Request). | | 15-37059
|
12/04/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: January 11, 2016. | | 15-37063
|
12/14/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Motion to Associate Pro Hac Vice Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to file the amicus curiae brief provisionally received on November 19, 2015. Pro Hac Vice Attorney Victor E. Schwartz shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amici in this matter. Nevada attorney Dennis L. Kennedy of Bailey Kennedy shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Schwartz in this appeal. | | 15-37997
|
12/14/2015 | Brief | Filed Amici Curiae Brief of the National Association of Manufacturers and Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers, Inc. in Support of Appellant. | | 15-37998
|
12/15/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance Victor E. Schwartz of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP, for Amici Curiae. | | 15-38196
|
12/16/2015 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms-Maupin Naylor Braster. | | |
01/05/2016 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-00196
|
01/08/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: January 25, 2016. | | 16-00582
|
01/26/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-02563
|
02/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of The Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondent. (DETACHD AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 3/1/16). | | 16-03343
|
02/11/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-04535
|
02/11/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: March 28, 2016. | | 16-04537
|
02/22/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Attorney Association (A. William Maupin to associate with David Fredrick as counsel for the Respondent). | | 16-05621
|
03/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. We direct the clerk of this court to detach the brief from the motion filed on February 1, 2016, and file it separately in this appeal. Appellant may file any response to the amicus brief within 30 days from the date of this order. | | 16-06514
|
03/01/2016 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae of The Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondent. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON 2/1/16 AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED ON 3/1/16). | | 16-06515
|
03/24/2016 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion for 14-Day Extension of Time for Filing Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-09278
|
03/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: April 11, 2016. | | 16-09735
|
04/11/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-11226
|
04/11/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
07/01/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 16-20676
|
07/13/2016 | Brief | Filed Response to Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 16-21751
|
08/03/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 16-24048
|
08/03/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address for the law firm of Horvitz & Levy, LLP. | | 16-24053
|
08/09/2016 | Motion | Filed Request Regarding Scheduling of Oral Argument. | | 16-24689
|
08/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Response to Request Regarding Scheduling Oral Argument. | | 16-25330
|
08/23/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled before the en banc court on December 5, 2016, at the hour of 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 16-26144
|
11/03/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Monday, December 5, 2016, @ 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. | | 16-34309
|
11/21/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 16-36210
|
12/05/2016 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
03/21/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Status and Change of Firm Name and Address. (Respondent counsel, A. William Maupin is no longer with the firm Naylor & Braster f/k/a Maupin Naylor Braster) | | 17-09370
|
07/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities and Change of Attorney. | | 17-24220
|
08/01/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellant's Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 17-25538
|
08/11/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply to Supplemental Authorities; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. | | 17-26836
|
08/14/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Having considered the motion to strike the response to appellant's notice of supplemental authorities, we deny the motion to strike. Appellant shall have five days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply of no more than seven pages. | | 17-27095
|
08/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Supplemental Authorities. | | 17-27901
|
09/27/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, Justice. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Hardesty. Pickering, J., dissenting. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. EN BANC | | 17-32844
|
10/23/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-36237
|
10/23/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/03/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by the District Court Clerk on October 26, 2017. | | 17-36237
|