Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/22/2015 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis. | | |
07/22/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | | 15-22263
|
07/27/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form (03/25/14). | | 15-22672
|
07/27/2015 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | | 15-22674
|
07/27/2015 | Appendix | Filed Exhibits to the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | | 15-22676
|
07/30/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance as Co-Counsel (Brandon Price as counsel for the Respondent). | | 15-23036
|
08/05/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. | | 15-23638
|
08/07/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 15-23962
|
09/03/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 1. | | |
09/03/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 2. | | |
09/03/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 3. | | |
09/03/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 4. | | |
09/03/2015 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
09/21/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. | | 15-28510
|
09/21/2015 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
09/29/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 15-901175
|
11/05/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. Respondent:Response: due 30 days. Response may cite to either the record on appeal or any appendix filed with the response. | | 15-901349
|
12/03/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent: Answering Brief: due December 21, 2015. | | 15-901487
|
12/21/2015 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 15-901631
|
12/21/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. (TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT PER ORDER ENTERED IN SUPREME COURT ON 12/18/17). | | 15-901632
|
02/04/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screeing. Appellant's Notice of Appearance or LACSN's notice due: 60 days. Supplemental briefing and oral argument will be scheduled thereafter. If a volunteer attorney cannot be located, then oral argument will not be held, and this matter will stand submitted for decision on the record currently before the court." | | 16-900133
|
04/05/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. - Attorney Daniel J. Licciardi's Notice of Appearance for Appellant due: April 18, 2016. | | 16-900394
|
04/25/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. | | 16-900499
|
05/10/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Setting Supplemental Briefing Schedule. Supplemental Opening Brief due: 60 days. Attorney Daniel J. Licciardi shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Thereafter, respondent shall have 30 days from date of service of the opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Finally, appellant shall have 30 days from the date of service of respondent’s supplemental answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. | | 16-900551
|
05/17/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-900577
|
06/28/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Malani L. Kotchka, of the law firm of Hejmanowshi & McCrea LLC, in place and stead of Daniel J. Liccaiardi. (Counsel for the appellant) | | 16-900777
|
07/14/2016 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. | | 16-900816
|
07/14/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix to Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. (TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT PER ORDER ENTERED IN SUPREME COURT ON 12/18/17). | | 16-900817
|
08/08/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. to Extend Time to File Respondent State of Nevada Department of Motor Vehicle's Supplemental Answering Brief. | | 16-900912
|
08/08/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Supplemental Answering Brief due: August 24, 2016. | | 16-900913
|
08/23/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondent State of Nevada Department of Motor Vehicle's Supplemental Answering Brief. | | 16-901006
|
08/31/2016 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 9/13/16). | | |
09/13/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. . The supplemental answering brief provisionally received on August 31, 2016, will be filed. Supplemental Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 16-901064
|
09/13/2016 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. - Supplemental Answering Brief. | | 16-901065
|
10/04/2016 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 16-901161
|
10/04/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/07/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, the clerk shall schedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 16-901452
|
12/12/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. | | |
12/12/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument has been scheduled for this matter on Tuesday, January 24, 2017 at 1:30 p.m., in Carson City, NV. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 16-901470
|
01/09/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, January 24, 2017 in Carson City. | | 17-900035
|
01/19/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Jordan Smith will be arguing on behalf of the Respondent. | | 17-900111
|
01/24/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. AS/JT/MG | | |
01/24/2017 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
01/30/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG | | |
01/30/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG | | 17-900170
|
02/21/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
02/21/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. | | 17-05897
|
02/21/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
02/21/2017 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
04/20/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 15 days. | | 17-13083
|
05/02/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Petition for Review due: May 19, 2017. | | 17-14543
|
05/22/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellant's Petition for Review. | | 17-16955
|
06/27/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review and Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 30 days. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief due: 30 days after appellant's brief is served. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief due: 15 days after respondent's brief is served. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC | | 17-21288
|
06/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. | | 17-21425
|
07/18/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Supplemental Brief due: August 10, 2017. | | 17-23787
|
08/11/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. | | 17-26832
|
09/08/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: September 25, 2017. | | 17-30135
|
09/25/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. | | 17-32481
|
10/06/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Supplemental Reply Brief due: October 24, 2017. | | 17-34078
|
10/23/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order Extending Appellant's Time to Submit Supplemental Reply Brief Pursuant to NRAP Rule 31(b)(2). | | 17-36340
|
10/30/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Supplemental Reply Brief due: November 3, 2017. | | 17-37151
|
11/03/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief. | | 17-37789
|
11/03/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/18/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct the clerk of this court to transfer the appendices, filed in the court of appeals on December 21, 2015, and July 14, 2016, to the supreme court's docket in this appeal. | | 17-43645
|
12/18/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. (TRANSFERRED FROM COURT OF APPEALS PER ORDER ENTERED IN SUPREME COURT ON 12/18/17). | | 17-43648
|
12/18/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (TRANSFERRED FROM COURT OF APPEALS PER ORDER ENTERED IN SUPREME COURT ON 12/18/17). | | 17-43651
|
01/22/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 18-02885
|
02/12/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument in this matter is hereby scheduled for March 5, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 18-05708
|
02/16/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-06430
|
03/05/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
12/06/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., concurring. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 92. EN BANC (SC) | | 18-907296
|
12/24/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 18-910114
|
01/07/2019 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC) | | |
03/06/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [Justice Abbi Silver voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] (SC). | | 19-10012
|
04/01/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-14074
|
04/01/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
04/18/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 2, 2019. (SC) | | 19-14074
|