Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/05/2016 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
01/05/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-00177
|
02/04/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-26. | | 16-03796
|
02/08/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Sealed portions of the Record on Appeal; pages 610 - 612, 2998-3013 (PSI Report). | | |
04/14/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (1st Request). | | 16-11784
|
04/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: June 13, 2016. | | 16-13434
|
06/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Second Request) | | 16-18191
|
06/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: August 12, 2016. | | 16-19506
|
08/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Remand this Matter to the District Court for Entry of an Appropriate Order. | | 16-24830
|
08/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). | | 16-24831
|
10/12/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Remand and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant has filed a motion for a remand to the district court. We deny the motion. Opening Brief due: 20 days. | | 16-31742
|
11/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). | | 16-34105
|
11/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fifth Request). | | 16-35170
|
11/30/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Opening Brief due: 5 days. | | 16-37125
|
12/06/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Sixth Request). | | 16-37767
|
12/14/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: December 21, 2016. | | 16-38802
|
12/22/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-39849
|
02/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief-60 days). | | 17-05793
|
02/28/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 24, 2017. | | 17-06713
|
04/24/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 17-13593
|
05/03/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the answering brief. The motion is denied. Respondent: Answering brief due: 30 days. | | 17-14686
|
06/02/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time Third Request (Answering Brief). | | 17-18480
|
06/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 17-18783
|
06/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 3, 2017. | | 17-19600
|
07/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 17-22052
|
07/18/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Fifth Request) - Answering Brief. | | 17-23855
|
07/19/2017 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Letter in Regards to Representing Self. | | 17-24039
|
07/26/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Answering Brief due: August 17, 2017. Appellant has filed, in pro se, a letter requesting that his counsel raise a certain issue in this appeal. Alternatively, appellant asks that he be allowed to proceed in pro se. We cannot grant appellant's request. | | 17-24736
|
08/17/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 17-27548
|
10/02/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Reply Brief. | | 17-33333
|
10/09/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: November 1, 2017. | | 17-34179
|
11/01/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). | | 17-37378
|
11/07/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: December 1, 2017. | | 17-38119
|
12/01/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-41505
|
12/01/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/25/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Exhibits. Within 15 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the following exhibits: Exhibits 62-77 (photographs), and Exhibit 208 (videotape). | | 18-15703
|
07/19/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument. | | 18-27564
|
08/21/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, October 1, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-32339
|
09/14/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-36064
|
10/01/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
10/04/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-38956
|
12/27/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Cherry, J., with whom Gibbons, J., agrees dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 107. EN BANC (SC) | | 18-910525
|
01/18/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay the Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-02911
|
01/23/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Original State's Exhibit(s) 208 and Original State's Exhibit(s) 62-77 this day. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER ORDER 1/29/19). (SC) | | 19-03519
|
01/23/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/24/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. (VACATED PER ORDER 1/29/19). | | 19-03718
|
01/29/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall recall the remittitur inadvertently issued on January 23, 2019, and vacate the order entered on January 24, 2019. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until April 26, 2019. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by April 26, 2019, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by April 26, 2019, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. (SC) | | 19-04366
|
02/12/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 29, 2019. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER ORDER 1/29/19). (SC) | | 19-03519
|
04/05/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed March 27, 2019 and placed on the docket as Case No. 18-8652. (SC) | | 19-14941
|
06/07/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SC). | | 19-24863
|
06/07/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-24864
|
06/07/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
07/01/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 12, 2019. (SC) | | 19-24864
|