Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69612
Short Caption:RURAL TELEPHONE CO. VS. PUB. UTIL. COMM'N. OF NEV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 15OC001881BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:StiglichCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Cherry for Chief Justice StiglichPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/2016 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/29/2016How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/21/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Allison MacKenzie, Ltd. Check no. 5682.
01/21/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-02073
01/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-02077
01/22/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick.16-02254
01/22/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel (Hayley Williamson to replace Roman Borisov as counsel for the Respondent).16-02286
01/29/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.16-03223
02/09/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-04317
02/22/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 16, 2016 at 9:30 a.m.16-05658
04/04/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.16-10494
04/06/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.16-10680
04/15/2016Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.16-11840
06/21/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel (Garrett Weir to Replace Carolyn Tanner as counsel for the Respondent).16-19447
06/23/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.16-19689
07/06/2016BriefFiled Appellant Rural Telephone Company's Openng Brief.16-20928
07/06/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1.16-20929
08/03/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-24092
09/02/2016BriefFiled Appellant Rural Telephone Company's Reply Brief.16-27411
09/02/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal For Decision Without Oral Argument.16-30404
05/22/2017OtherJustice Lidia Stiglich disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
08/03/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. NNP17-MC/JH/RP17-25807
08/28/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-28679
08/28/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/01/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 29, 2017.17-28679