Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
03/03/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-06918
|
03/03/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-06924
|
03/04/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of William Brown. Check No. 1171. | | |
03/09/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Amended Case Appeal Statement. | | 16-07540
|
03/10/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days. | | 16-07659
|
03/10/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | | 16-07738
|
03/10/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Second Amended Case Appeal Statement. | | 16-07751
|
03/18/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 16-08725
|
03/21/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 16-08876
|
03/22/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/27/15. To Court Reporter: Kristy Clark. | | 16-09116
|
03/23/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals | | 16-09132
|
03/24/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Kristy Clark stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/27/15. | | 16-09403
|
03/30/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. | | 16-09979
|
04/01/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | | 16-10183
|
04/29/2016 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 16-13493
|
04/29/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Proposed Order for Limited Remand. | | 16-13496
|
05/11/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Stipulation. Appellants shall have 45 days from the date of this order to obtain a district court order constituting a final judgment or to otherwise show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days of service of appellants' response. Briefing remains suspended pending further order of this court. | | 16-14780
|
06/27/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Amended Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals. | | 16-19956
|
06/27/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Third Amended Case Appeal Statement. | | 16-19957
|
06/28/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Obtaining Final Judgment. | | 16-20134
|
06/29/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Renewed Response to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-20341
|
07/11/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental | | 16-21375
|
07/28/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 16-23504
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 1 Part 1. | | 16-33778
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 1 Part 2. | | 16-33779
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 1 Part 3. | | 16-33780
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 2 Part 1. | | 16-33781
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 2 Part 2. | | 16-33782
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 2 Part 3. | | 16-33783
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 3 Part 1. | | 16-33785
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 3 Part 2. | | 16-33786
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 4 Part 1. | | 16-33787
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 4 Part 2. | | 16-33788
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 5 Part 1. | | 16-33789
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 5 Part 2. | | 16-33790
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 6 Part 1. | | 16-33791
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 6 Part 2. | | 16-33792
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 7. | | 16-33793
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 8. | | 16-33794
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 9 Part 1. | | 16-33795
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 9 Part 2. | | 16-33796
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 10. | | 16-33797
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 11. | | 16-33798
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 12. | | 16-33799
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 13. | | 16-33800
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 14. | | 16-33801
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 15. | | 16-33802
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 16. | | 16-33803
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 17. | | 16-33804
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 18 Part 1. | | 16-33805
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 18 Part 2. | | 16-33806
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 18 Part 3. | | 16-33807
|
10/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 19. | | 16-33808
|
10/27/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. | | 16-33809
|
11/15/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing of Respondents' Answering Brief to December 28, 2016. | | 16-35474
|
11/15/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: December 28, 2016. | | 16-35479
|
12/28/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 16-40359
|
12/28/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix Volume I Bates Numbers RA0001-RA0092. | | 16-40360
|
12/28/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix Volume II Bates Numbers RA0093-RA0191. | | 16-40361
|
01/27/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Appellant's Reply Brief to February 10, 2017. | | 17-03110
|
01/27/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's (SHAC, LLC, D. Westwood, Inc., K-Kel, Inc., Olympus Garden, Inc.) Reply Brief due: February 10, 2017. | | 17-03115
|
02/07/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorney William H. Brown shall have 7 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether the opening brief filed on October 27, 2016, correctly identifies the parties on whose behalf the brief was filed and whether the caption of this appeal correctly identifies the appellants to this appeal. Respondents may file any reply within 5 days after Mr. Brown's response is filed. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. | | 17-04297
|
02/14/2017 | Motion | Filed Notice of Clarification and Request to Correct Caption. | | 17-05341
|
03/01/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Caption and Reinstating Briefing. We direct the clerk of this court to modify the caption of this appeal consistent with the caption on this order. Reply Brief due: 15 days. | | 17-07032
|
03/17/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-08948
|
03/17/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
05/08/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address (Lambrose Brown). | | 17-15136
|
05/25/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-17581
|
08/08/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, October 2, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-26387
|
09/25/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-32374
|
09/26/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel (Joseph Tartakovsky as counsel for the Respondent). | | 17-32490
|
10/02/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc court. | | |
03/01/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Vacated and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 10. EN BANC | | 18-08123
|
03/26/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-11654
|
03/26/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
04/06/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 29, 2018. | | 18-11654
|