Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
03/04/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-07046
|
03/04/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 16-07048
|
03/04/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 16-07051
|
03/11/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 (Cash) from David Dezzani. | | |
03/11/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. | | 16-07844
|
03/24/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. | | 16-09302
|
03/31/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. | | 16-10164
|
04/01/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 1. | | 16-10230
|
04/01/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 2. | | 16-10231
|
04/01/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 3. | | 16-10232
|
04/01/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 4. | | 16-10233
|
04/04/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 16-10358
|
07/13/2016 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief (Opening Brief). | | 16-21757
|
08/15/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 16-25240
|
08/15/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix. | | 16-25241
|
08/15/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
09/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellants' in Pro Per Request for Leave to File Reply to Answering Brief. | | 16-27698
|
09/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Filed Proper Person Appellants' in Pro Per Request for Leave to File Reply to Answering Brief. | | 16-27698
|
09/08/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. | | 16-27857
|
09/08/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
09/08/2016 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
09/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motion to File Reply Brief. Reply Brief (No. 69896) due: 20 days. fn1[We defer ruling on all other requests for relief currently pending in these appeals.] | | |
10/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Request for 10 Days Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 69410/69896. | | |
10/12/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. -Reply Brief due: October 24, 2016. fn1[Because the addition of ten days would cause appellants' reply to be due on a non-judical day, we extend the reply period to the end of the next judicial day.] fn2[We defer ruling on appellants' September 7, 2016, request for oral argument.] Nos. 69410/69896. | | |
10/26/2016 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief. - Reply Brief in Docket No. 69896. Nos. 69410/69896 (16-901296). | | |
11/16/2016 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "We affirm the district court's dismissal of appellants' complaint. We reverse the award of fees and costs." Fn5[We also deny appellants' September 7, 2016, motion requesting oral argument in this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS Nos. 69410/69896 | | |
11/16/2016 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Order Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "We affirm the district court's dismissal of appellants' complaint. We reverse the award of fees and costs." Fn5[We also deny appellants' September 7, 2016, motion requesting oral argument in this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS Nos. 69410/69896 | | 16-901358
|
12/05/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 69410/69896. | | |
12/05/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Petition for Review due: December 19, 2016. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 16-37523
|
12/05/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Debbie Leonard of McDonald Carano Wilson LLP appearing on behalf of Respondents Kern & Associates, Ltd., and Gayle A. Kern.) Nos. 69410/69896. | | 16-37645
|
12/05/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
12/05/2016 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
12/06/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's' Bill of Costs in Docket 69896. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 16-37661
|
12/06/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Objection to Bill of Costs. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 16-37698
|
12/19/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Amicus Curiae, State Bar of Nevada, and Notice of Intent to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Micah Echols and Adele Karoum). Nos. 69410/69896. | | 16-39308
|
12/19/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Review. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 16-39400
|
12/29/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File State Bar of Nevada's Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Petition for Reivew (First Request). Nos. 69410/69896. | | 16-40461
|
01/04/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The State Bar of Nevada shall have until January 13, 2017, to file and serve an amicus brief in support of respondents' petition for review. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 17-00162
|
01/13/2017 | Brief | Filed State Bar of Nevada's Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Petition for Review. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 17-01352
|
02/24/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 15 days. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 17-06509
|
03/16/2017 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Answer to Respondents' Petition for Review and Response to Amicus Curiae Brief. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 17-08867
|
04/21/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Nos. 69410/69896. | | 17-13280
|
04/21/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge, who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 17-13398
|
03/01/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in Docket No. 69410; affirmed in part and reversed in part on Docket No. 69896." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Pickering, J., dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. EN BANC Nos. 69410/69896 | | 18-08121
|
03/19/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 18-10643
|
03/22/2018 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from David J. Dezzani. Check No. 5638. Nos. 69410/69896. | | |
03/22/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 69410/69896. | | 18-11283
|
04/27/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 69410/69896. | | 18-16100
|
05/23/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Costs. The clerk shall not insert costs in favor of any party in the remittitur. Nos. 69410/69896 | | 18-19698
|
05/23/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 69410/69896 | | 18-19731
|
05/23/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 69410/69896 | | |
06/06/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 24, 2018. Nos. 69410/69896 | | 18-19731
|