Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
05/04/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-14046
|
05/04/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-14048
|
05/05/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | | 16-14087
|
05/05/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Cohen-Johnson, LLC. Check No. 4029. | | |
05/25/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-16361
|
05/25/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge and all Parties. | | 16-16436
|
05/31/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge and all Parties). | | 16-16955
|
06/10/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 12, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. | | 16-18262
|
06/13/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion To Confirm Withdrawal Of Counsel And To Be Removed From Certificate Of Service. | | 16-18335
|
06/20/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to Withdraw as Counsel. | | 16-19169
|
06/24/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 16-19890
|
07/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On June 20, 2016, attorney Mark Wray filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. However, the motion does not appear to have been served on the client as required by NRAP 46(e)(3). Accordingly, Mr. Wray shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, submit proof of service of the motion on appellant. We therefore defer ruling on the motion at this time. | | 16-20597
|
07/01/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw; Removing From Settlement Program; and Reinstating Briefing. We grant the motion to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent Ryan Tors. The clerk shall remove attorney Mark H. Gunderson, Esq., and John R. Funk, Esq., of Gunderson Law Firm from the docket of this appeal. Because Mr. Tors is proceeding on appeal in proper person, this appeal will be exempt from the settlement program. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing the opening brief. Appellant 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form; 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 16-20601
|
07/11/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Motion for Permission to Withdraw as Counsel). | | 16-21492
|
07/11/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion For Relief From NRAP 16 and For Order Allowing Mediation. | | 16-21553
|
07/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Regarding Peppermill's Motion for Relief From NRAP 16 and Stipulation to Proceed with Mediation. | | 16-23607
|
08/04/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation and Granting Motions. We suspend briefing and reassign this appeal to the settlement program. The settlement conference previously scheduled for August 12, 2016, is hereby reinstated. Fn1[Attorney Mark Wray's June 20, 2016, motion to withdraw as counsel is granted. We direct the clerk of this court to remove Mr. Wray as counsel for appellant. We note that appellant remains represented by H. Stan Johnson of the law firm of Cohen, Johnson, Parker, & Edwards]. | | 16-24194
|
08/22/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-26042
|
09/02/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-27385
|
09/20/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/04/15, 05/19/15, 06/24/15, 12/17/15, 12/22/15, 01/05/16, 01/08/16, 01/11/16, 01/12/16, 01/13/16, 01/14/16, 01/15/16, 01/19/16, 01/20/16, 01/21/16, 01/22/16, 01/25/16, 01/26/16. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. | | 16-29093
|
11/30/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel F. Polsenberg and Joel D. Henroid of the law firm of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP appearing on behalf of appellant MEI-GSR Holdings, LLC, d/b/a Grand Sierra Resort.) | | 16-37110
|
12/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (Opening Brief). | | 16-37230
|
12/19/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 3, 2017. | | 16-39316
|
12/20/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Withdrawal of Association of Counsel. | | 16-39593
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix - Volumes 1, 8, 10, 17-25. | | 17-00100
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix - Volumes 26-30. | | 17-00101
|
01/04/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Appellant's Opening Brief Appendix Volumes 2-7, 9, 11-16 Under Seal. | | 17-00105
|
01/04/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to File an Over-Length Opening Brief. | | 17-00287
|
01/10/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Appellant's Opening Brief Appendix Volumes 2-7, 9, 11-16 Under Seal. | | 17-00845
|
01/10/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Counsel. The clerk shall remove Mr. Polsenberg and Mr. Henriod as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall continue to be represented by H. Stan Johnson, of Cohen Johnson Parker Edwards and William E. Crockett of the Law Offices of William E. Crocket. | | 17-00872
|
01/19/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support ofr Appellant's Motion for Permission to file Appellant's Opening Brief Appendix Volumes 2-7, 9, 11-16 Under Seal. | | 17-02005
|
01/19/2017 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Appellant's Motion for Permission to File an Over-Length Opening Brief (in regard to no opposition being filed). | | 17-02008
|
02/02/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. | | 17-03890
|
02/10/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall reject the opening brief received on January 4, 2017. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief that complies with either the standard page limitation (not more than 30 pages) or type-volume limitation (not more than 14,000 words). The clerk shall file volumes 2-7, 9, and 11-16, received on January 11, 2017, under seal. fn1[The stipulation for an extension of time to file the answering brief is disapproved as moot.] | | 17-04789
|
02/10/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 9, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, and 16 (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 2/10/17). | | |
03/02/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-07292
|
03/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal of Order on the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Against Ryan Tors Without Prejudice. | | 17-07385
|
03/14/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of appellant and respondent Ryan Tors, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed as to respondent Ryan Tors only. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. | | 17-08474
|
03/24/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). | | 17-09946
|
03/24/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: May 3, 2017. | | 17-09964
|
05/01/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 17-14277
|
05/15/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Answering Brief. The clerk shall file the appendix received on May 9, 2017. Answering Brief due: 5 days. | | 17-16216
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 1. | | 17-16217
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 2. | | 17-16218
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 3. | | 17-16219
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 4. | | 17-16220
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 5. | | 17-16222
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 6. | | 17-16223
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 7. | | 17-16224
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 8. | | 17-16225
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 9. | | 17-16227
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 10. | | 17-16228
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 11. | | 17-16229
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 12. | | 17-16230
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 13. | | 17-16232
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 14. | | 17-16233
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 15. | | 17-16234
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 16. | | 17-16235
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 17. | | 17-16236
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 18. | | 17-16237
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 19. | | 17-16238
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 20. | | 17-16239
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 21. | | 17-16241
|
05/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief, Vol. 22. | | 17-16243
|
05/19/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent Peppermill Casinos, Inc.'s Answering Brief. | | 17-16876
|
06/21/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule (Reply Brief). | | 17-20488
|
06/26/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: July 19, 2017. | | 17-21143
|
07/20/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Over-Length Reply Brief. | | 17-24087
|
07/25/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is denied. The clerk shall reject the reply brief received on July 20, 2017. Reply Brief due: 15 days. | | 17-24633
|
07/28/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-25197
|
07/28/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
11/07/2017 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. | | |
11/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-38839
|
11/17/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 2, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. | | 17-39784
|
12/19/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-43831
|
12/20/2017 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges | | |
01/02/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
02/15/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name. | | 18-06192
|
02/15/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel. | | 18-06193
|
05/03/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 31. EN BANC | | 18-16769
|
05/21/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. | | 18-19356
|
05/29/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: June 21, 2018. If no petition for rehearing is filed by that date, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. | | 18-20314
|
06/25/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-24110
|
06/25/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
06/25/2018 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges | | |
07/09/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 26, 2018. | | 18-24110
|