Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/02/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
06/02/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-17177
|
06/02/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 16-17179
|
06/02/2016 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert | | |
06/07/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 16-17611
|
06/07/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 16-17751
|
06/20/2016 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeals and to Apply the Briefing schedule for Case No. 70478 to the Consolidated Appeal. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-19105
|
06/21/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 16-19299
|
06/27/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. The Frederic and Barbara Rosenberg Living Trust shall have until October 5, 2016, to file and serve a single appendix and opening brief addressing all issues in these appeals. Nos. 69399/70478 | | 16-20071
|
06/27/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant Fredric and Barbara Rosenberg Living Trust's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (70478). Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-20089
|
07/11/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response in Docket No. 70478 due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days of service of appellant's response. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-21454
|
08/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-24779
|
09/12/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. It appears that a final judgment has been entered and the appeal in Docket No. 70478 may proceed. Pursuant to our June 27, 2016, order, the opening brief and appendix in these consolidated appeals remains due on October 5, 2016. Failure to timely file the opening brief and appendix may result in the imposition of sanctions. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-28303
|
09/30/2016 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request - First on Consolidation). | | 16-30500
|
10/04/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel (James Shapiro to Replace Preston Rezaee as counsel for Respondent (70478)). Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-30789
|
10/05/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 12, 2016. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-30992
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 1. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31798
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 2. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31799
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 3. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31802
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 4. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31803
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 5. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31804
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 6. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31815
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 7. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31816
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 8. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31817
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 9. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31818
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 10. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31819
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 11. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31820
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 12. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31821
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 13. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31822
|
10/12/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 14. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31823
|
10/13/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-31982
|
11/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondents' Briefs. | | 16-34746
|
11/07/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Briefs due: December 14, 2016. | | 16-34751
|
12/15/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent Shahin Malek's Answering Brief (70478). Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-38906
|
12/15/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Shahin Malek's Appendix (70478). Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-38907
|
12/15/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (69399). Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-38908
|
12/15/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Supplemental Appendix (69399). Nos. 69399/70478. | | 16-38911
|
01/12/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request).(69399). Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-01212
|
01/12/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: February 16, 2017. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-01215
|
02/15/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-05455
|
02/21/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Combined Reply on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: March 20, 2017. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-05944
|
03/20/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-09243
|
03/29/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-10472
|
03/29/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 69399/70478. | | |
06/26/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-21028
|
07/19/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 7, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 17-23911
|
08/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Additional Oral Argument Time. | | 17-25891
|
08/08/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The oral argument currently scheduled for September 7, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. is vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule oral argument in this matter for September 6, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., in Carson City. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-26373
|
08/22/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 17-28119
|
09/06/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. "Before the En Banc Court." | | |
09/13/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 69. EN BANC Nos. 69399/70478 | | 18-35743
|
10/09/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 69399/70478. | | 18-39486
|
10/09/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 69399/70478. | | |
11/02/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 16, 2018. Nos. 69399/70478 | | 18-39486
|