Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/16/2016 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
06/16/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-18920
|
06/16/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-18922
|
06/20/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 16-19144
|
06/23/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/20/16. To Court Reporter: Dept. 1., 8th JDC. | | 16-19745
|
06/24/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Amended Case Appeal Statement. | | 16-19857
|
06/28/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 16-20140
|
06/29/2016 | Motion | Filed International Brotherhood Of Teamsters Local 14's Motion For Leave To File Opening And Reply Briefs. | | 16-20369
|
07/06/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-20996
|
07/08/2016 | Motion | Filed Opposition to International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 14's Motion for Leave to File Opening and Reply Briefs. | | 16-21238
|
07/08/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Objection to Modification of Caption. | | 16-21241
|
07/08/2016 | Motion | Filed Amended Opposition to International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 14's Motion for Leave to File Opening and Reply Briefs. | | 16-21262
|
07/15/2016 | Motion | Filed Local 14's Reply In Support Of Motion For Leave To File Opening And Reply Briefs; And Response To Esea's Objection To The Caption. | | 16-22105
|
07/15/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to State of Nevada Local Government Employee-Management Relations Board's Docketing Statement. | | 16-22175
|
07/27/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Because Local 14 is not an appellant in this appeal, it may not file opening and reply briefs. Local 14 was a party to the district court proceedings and thus appears to be appropriately listed in this court's caption as a respondent. We thus decline to remove Local 14 from the caption of this appeal. Local 14 may file an answering brief conceding district court error, but may not seek to alter the judgment. | | 16-23333
|
08/24/2016 | Motion | Filed State of Nevada's Motion for Appeal to be Expedited and for En Banc Review in the First Instance. | | 16-26430
|
09/02/2016 | Motion | Filed Opposition to State of Nevada, Local Government Employee-Management Relations Board's Motion for Appeal to be Expedited and for En Banc Review in the First Instance. | | 16-27418
|
09/09/2016 | Motion | Filed State of Nevada's Reply in Support of Motion for Appeal to be Expedited and for En Banc Review in the First Instance. | | 16-28056
|
09/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant the motion to expedite this appeal to the following extent. The opening brief and appendix remain due to be filed on or before October 18, 2016. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Upon the completion of briefing, we will expedite our resolution of this appeal as permitted by our docket. Any determination regarding whether this appeal will be heard by the en banc court will be made after the completion of briefing. Accordingly, we deny the motion for en banc review in the first instance at this time. | | 16-29551
|
10/18/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume I. | | 16-32645
|
10/18/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume II. | | 16-32646
|
10/19/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-32774
|
11/02/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days of service of appellants' response. Briefing is suspended. | | 16-34117
|
11/30/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 16-37098
|
12/13/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondent Education Support Employees Association's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 16-38435
|
05/24/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Respondents' Answering Briefs due: 30 days. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of the last-filed answering brief to file and serve any reply. | | 17-17397
|
06/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent Education Support Employees Association's Motion to Extend Time for Briefing (First Request). | | 17-18680
|
06/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Education Support Employees Association's Answering Brief due: July 21, 2017. | | 17-19601
|
06/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent International Brotherhood Of Teamsters Local 14's Opposition to Motion to Extend Time for Briefing. | | 17-19610
|
06/20/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice that CCSD will not file answering brief. | | 17-20305
|
06/20/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 14s Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 9/13/17). | | |
06/20/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent International Brotherhood Of Teamsters Local 14s Request for Judicial Notice. | | 17-20392
|
06/21/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent Education Support Employees Association's Motion to Strike International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 14's Answering Brief. | | 17-20676
|
06/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent International Brotherhood of Teamsters local 14s Opposition to ESEAs Motion to Strike its Answering Brief. | | 17-21144
|
06/30/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent Education Support Employees Association's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 14's Answering Brief. | | 17-21931
|
07/24/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent Education Support Employees Association's Answering Brief. | | 17-24325
|
08/15/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-27288
|
08/15/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
09/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Strike Answering Brief and Granting Motion for Judicial Notice. The clerk shall strike the answering brief received on June 20, 2017. Local 14 may file an amended answering brief within 11 days of the date of this order, if deemed warranted. | | 17-30737
|
09/15/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 14s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Striking Brief or in the Alternative for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (Proposed brief attached) (DETACHED PROPOSED BRIEF AND RETURNED UNFILED PER 11/08/17 ORDER.) | | 17-31272
|
09/22/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 14s Answering Brief. | | 17-32091
|
09/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent Education Support Employees Association's Opposition to Respondent International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 14's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Striking Brief or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Amicus Brief. | | 17-32498
|
09/27/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent International Brotherhood Of Teamsters Local 14s Reply In Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Order Striking Brief or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. | | 17-32881
|
11/08/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We decline to reconsider our previous order. Local 14's motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae is also denied. The clerk shall detach the proposed brief of amicus curiae from the motion filed on September 15, 2017, and return it unfiled. | | 17-38437
|
02/26/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 18-07422
|
02/28/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, April 11, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-07810
|
03/05/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent Education Support Employees Association's Motion to Postpone Oral Argument. | | 18-08441
|
03/06/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent Education Support Employees Association's motion to continue the oral argument of this matter is granted. Accordingly, the oral argument scheduled for April 11, 2018, at 10:30 a.m., is vacated, and the clerk of this court is directed to schedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 18-08696
|
03/06/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Postpone Oral Argument. | | 18-08708
|
05/02/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, June 13, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-16577
|
05/30/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-20452
|
06/08/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Authorities Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). | | 18-21904
|
06/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. | | |
11/08/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Paraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 86. SNP18-MC/RP/LS | | 18-903377
|
12/03/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 18-906619
|
12/03/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
12/18/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 10, 2018. (SC) | | 18-906619
|