Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/22/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
07/22/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-22867
|
07/22/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-22877
|
07/22/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lee Law Firm, a Professional Corp. Check No. 38886. | | |
07/25/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Siu Yip). | | |
07/25/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellant Siu Yip) | | 16-22965
|
07/25/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Siu Yip) | | 16-22968
|
07/25/2016 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from John P. Aldrich | | |
07/26/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 16-23195
|
07/29/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle. | | 16-23728
|
07/29/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance - Lyssa S. Anderson, Ryan W. Daniels of the Law Firm of Kaempfer Crowell and Michael R. Smith and B. Warren of the law firm of King & Spalding, LLP appearing as counsel for respondents. | | 16-23730
|
08/11/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Michael Kirsch's Docketing Statement due: August 25, 2016. | | 16-24896
|
08/18/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Siu Yip's Docketing Statement due: August 29, 2016. | | 16-25658
|
08/25/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Joint Docketing Statement (Michael Kirsch and Siu Yip). | | 16-26558
|
08/25/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Joint Docketing Statement (continued). | | 16-26559
|
09/06/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondents' NRAP 14(f) Response to Docketing Statement. | | 16-27576
|
11/09/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 16-35055
|
11/30/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 16-37009
|
12/13/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant Siu Yip's Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. | | 16-38433
|
02/28/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Michael Kirsch's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 14, 2017. | | 17-06882
|
03/01/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant Siu Yip's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 14, 2017. | | 17-07031
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. | | 17-08578
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. | | 17-08579
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III part 1. | | 17-08581
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III part 2. | | 17-08580
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV part 1. | | 17-08582
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV part 2. | | 17-08583
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. | | 17-08584
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI. | | 17-08585
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII part 1. | | 17-08586
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII part 2. | | 17-08587
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII part 3. | | 17-08591
|
03/14/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VIII. | | 17-08605
|
03/14/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief (Opening Brief for Appellant Michael Kirsch.) Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 17-08595
|
03/15/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant Michael Kirsch's Opening Brief. | | 17-08621
|
03/15/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant Siu Yip's Joinder to Appellant Michael Kirsch's Opening Brief. | | 17-08632
|
03/17/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: April 28, 2017. | | 17-08979
|
04/28/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 17-14236
|
04/28/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Volume I. | | 17-14237
|
04/28/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Volume II. | | 17-14238
|
05/26/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant Michael Kirsch's Reply Brief due: June 13, 2017. | | 17-17758
|
05/30/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Siu Yip's Joinder to Michael Kirsch's Reply Brief due: June 13, 2017. | | 17-17981
|
06/13/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant Michael Kirsch's Reply Brief. | | 17-19527
|
06/13/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant Siu Yip's Joinder to Appellant Michael Kirsch's Reply Brief. | | 17-19572
|
06/13/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
07/26/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal For Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 17-24869
|
11/01/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant Michael Kirsch's Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authorities Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). (DETACHED SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 12/6/17). | | 17-37400
|
11/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authorities Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). | | 17-38972
|
11/20/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authorities Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). | | 17-40048
|
12/06/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file a notice of supplemental authorities. We direct the clerk of this court to detach the supplemental authorities from the motion and to file them separately. | | 17-41995
|
12/06/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief and Reply Brief. | | 17-41996
|
12/07/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 17-42202
|
01/29/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-03871
|
04/02/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant Michael Kirsch's Attorneys' Notice Of Change Of Firm Name (Name changing from Lee, Hernandez, Landrum & Garofalo to Lee, Hernandez, Landrum & Carlson, APC). | | 18-12456
|
04/05/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 22. SNP18-MC/RP/LS | | 18-12940
|
04/30/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-16277
|
04/30/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
05/11/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2018. | | 18-16277
|