Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71052
Short Caption:COLEMAN (SOLOMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C294579Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/13/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:12/13/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/18/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)16-25665
08/18/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-25667
08/19/2016Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 08/15/16 (Response to Supreme Court Email dated 08/19/2016 - C294579).16-25904
08/26/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.16-26739
08/29/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/04/14, 02/17/16, 02/29/16, 03/01/16, 03/02/16, 03/03/16, 03/04/16 and 03/05/16. To Court Reporter: Loree Murphy, Gina Shrader and Lisa Lizotte.16-26817
09/01/2016Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 08/26/16. Judgment of Conviction (Response to Supreme Court Email dated 09/01/2016 - C294579).16-27306
09/08/2016Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Court Reporter in Regards to Transcripts.16-27837
09/08/2016MotionFiled Motion for Full Briefing Pursuant to NRAP 3C(K)(2).16-27948
09/27/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Shrader stating that the deposit has been received and transcripts are being prepared.16-30046
09/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed an unopposed motion for full briefing. We conclude that full briefing is warranted. Accordingly, counsel for the parties shall fully brief the issues as provided in NRAP 28, 28.2, 30, 31 and 32. Opening brief due: 90 days. fn1[Counsel need not file certified transcripts in this appeal as ordinarily required by NRAP 9.]16-30300
10/18/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Loree Murray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/04/16.16-32522
12/20/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief due: January 11, 2016.16-39566
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.17-01136
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.17-01137
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III.17-01138
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV.17-01139
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume V.17-01141
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VI.17-01142
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VII.17-01143
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VIII.17-01144
01/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Master Appendix.17-01145
01/13/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-01397
02/13/2017MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief).17-05108
02/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: March 15, 2017.17-05111
03/15/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-08617
04/13/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: April 28, 2017.17-12283
04/28/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Reply Appendix.17-14207
04/28/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-14230
04/28/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/02/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-33306
10/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, December 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-36778
11/29/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-41053
12/11/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Travis Akin as counsel for the Appellant, and also Notice to Appear for Oral Argument).17-42443
12/13/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. MD/MG/KP
05/03/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Douglas/Gibbons. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. SNP17-MD/MG/KP18-16759
05/30/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-20481
05/30/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/13/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2018.18-20481