Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/29/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Daniel Marks. Check no. 17914. | | |
08/29/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED). | | |
08/29/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-26832
|
08/30/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | | 16-27026
|
09/06/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed The Exhibit List(s) from the Non-Jury Trial, Held February 23, 2016 through February 26, 2016 (SEALED). | | |
09/12/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-28101
|
09/23/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 6, 2016 at 10:00 am. | | 16-29672
|
09/29/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. | | |
09/29/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SEALED). | | |
09/29/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (CROSS-APPEAL) | | 16-30374
|
09/29/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Amended Cross-Appeal) (SEALED). | | |
10/05/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Radford J. Smith, Chartered. Check No. 13582. | | |
10/11/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: Wed., October 19, 2016, at 4:00 pm by conference call to be initiated by the settlement judge. | | 16-31685
|
10/20/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-32817
|
10/25/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal. | | 16-33475
|
10/31/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-33911
|
11/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal. | | 16-34641
|
11/08/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-34909
|
11/15/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal. | | 16-35602
|
11/23/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/14/15; 02/17/16; 4/6/16; 5/4/16; 7/13/16; 9/21/16; and 10/18/16. To Court Reporter: Lawanda Brown. | | 16-36628
|
11/30/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice - NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. | | 16-37099
|
12/01/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/01/15, 06/01/15, 06/26/15, 07/21/15, 09/09/15, 11/18/15, 02/23/16, 02/24/16, 02/25/16. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Service. | | 16-37172
|
01/06/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/14/15, 01/15/16, 02/17/16, 04/06/16, 05/04/16, 07/13/16, 09/21/16, 10/18/16. | | 17-00614
|
01/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-01521
|
01/18/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/09/15, 11/18/15. | | 17-01956
|
01/18/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 17-01972
|
01/23/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. The clerk shall file the docketing statement and certificate of no transcript request received on January 19, 2017. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's single Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 7, 2017. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-02431
|
01/23/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-02433
|
01/23/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-02434
|
01/25/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Radford J. Smith. Check no. 13660. (CROSS-APPEAL) | | |
01/26/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Stay with Alternative Security. In order to stay the portions of the district court order awarding spousal support and imposing sanctions against appellant/cross-respondent, appellant/cross-respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to place a lien on his property, located at 9716 Oak Pass Road, Beverly Hills, California, in favor of respondent/cross-appellant in the amount of $1,649,792. Appellant/cross-respondent shall not further encumber the property in any manner or transfer the property during the pendency of this appeal. Regarding the portion of the district court order making an unequal division of property, we conclude that placement of assets in the amount of $2,043,931.50 into a blocked, interest-bearing account will adequately protect respondent/cross-appellant from prejudice arising from a stay. However, the district court is in the best position to determine which assets should be placed into such an account. See generally Zugel v. Miller, 99 Nev. 100, 101, 659 P.2d 296, 297 (1983) ("This court is not a fact-finding tribunal."). Accordingly, the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to enter a written order determining which assets, valued at $2,043,931.50, to place into a blocked, interest-bearing account at UBS. The assets shall be placed into the account as soon as possible, and in any event not later than 60 days from the date the district court's order is entered, and shall remain in the account pending the final resolution of this appeal. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-02969
|
02/09/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-04761
|
02/24/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachel Chaisson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/01/15, 05/19/15, 06/01/15, 06/15/15, 06/26/15, 07/09/15, 02/23/16, 02/24/16, 02/25/16, 04/25/16, 07/21/15. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-06518
|
02/24/2017 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Re: Supreme Court Order Granting Motion for Stay with Alternative Security. Filed in District Court on 2/24/17. | | |
03/02/2017 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/27/17. Re: Supreme Court Order Granting Motion for Stay with Alternative Security (SEALED). Nos. 71147/71994. | | |
03/15/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/21/15. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-08651
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 1-5. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11536
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 6-10. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11537
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volume 11-16. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11538
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 17-21. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11539
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 22-24. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11540
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 25-29. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11541
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 30-34. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11544
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 35-37. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11545
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 38-43. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11546
|
04/06/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix- Volumes 44-47. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11547
|
04/07/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Receipt of Copy (Appendix Volumes 1-47). | | 17-11680
|
04/07/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-11681
|
05/05/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Deadline to File the Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-14949
|
05/05/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief due: June 7, 2017. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-14952
|
06/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal and the Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-18836
|
06/14/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal and the Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix and Countermotion to Strike. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-19783
|
06/28/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion To Strike and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent-cross-appellant shall have until August 7, 2017, to file and serve the answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal and appendix. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-21439
|
08/07/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-26053
|
08/08/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-26259
|
08/09/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Extension of time to File the Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal; and Countermotion for Sanctions. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-26659
|
08/23/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Because respondent/cross-appellant request only a short extension and the brief has been submitted, we grant the motion. The clerk shall file the amended combined answering brief and opening brief received on August 17, 2017. We decline to sanction respondent/cross-appellant but caution that future failure to comply with this court's rules and orders may result in the imposition of sanctions. Appellant/cross-respondent combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: 30 days. Fn1[The clerk shall reject the combined answering brief and opening brief received on August 17, 2017.] Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-28322
|
08/23/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Amended Answering Brief and Amended Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 17-28323
|
09/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Appellant's Combined Reply and Answering Brief. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-29797
|
09/06/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief due: October 23, 2017. | | 17-29810
|
10/09/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Combined Reply and Answering Brief. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-34095
|
10/09/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Alternative Security to Enable Appellant to Sell House and Replace Security. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-34096
|
10/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Appellant/Cross Respondent's Motion for Alternative Security to Enable Appellant to Sell House and Replace Security. | | 17-35412
|
10/23/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: December 15, 2017. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-36264
|
10/24/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion for Alternative Security to Enable Appellant to Sell House and Replace Security. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-36513
|
12/15/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Certificate of compliance does not comply with NRAP 32(a)(9)). Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-43473
|
12/15/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-43481
|
12/22/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's Motion to Stay is Denied. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 17-44227
|
01/11/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. Nos. 71147/71994 | | |
01/16/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File (Reply Brief on Cross Appeal). Nos. 71147/71994. | | 18-02090
|
01/25/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: 11 days. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 18-03534
|
02/06/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 18-05050
|
02/06/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/23/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument. Nos. 71147/71994. | | 18-15446
|
04/25/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 5, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-15830
|
05/21/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-19308
|
06/05/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
01/28/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Assignment. The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Senior Justice, having previously participated in the above entitled matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the determination of this matter. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC) | | 19-04223
|
04/25/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded with instructions." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Douglas. Hardesty, J., with whom Stiglich, J., agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. EN BANC Nos. 71147/71994 (SC) | | 19-18121
|
04/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Verified Bill of Costs. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC) | | 19-18991
|
05/14/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent in Docket No. 71147 and Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 71994 shall have until May 28, 2019, to file and serve the petition for rehearing. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | 19-20985
|
05/28/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 71147/71994. (RETURNED REHEARING PER NOTICE 5/29/19). (SC) | | |
05/29/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Returning Unfiled Rehearing Petition. Filing fee was not submitted with petition. (SC) | | 19-23234
|
05/29/2019 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Radford J. Smith. (SC) | | |
05/29/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC) | | 19-23284
|
05/29/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Radford J. Smith. Nos. 7114/71994. (SC) | | |
07/05/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Hardesty, J., dissenting. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | 19-28717
|
07/31/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to serve respondent/cross-appellant with an invoice detailing the costs involved in the preparation of the appendix and file a copy in this court. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days from receipt of the invoice to remit one-half of the cost to appellant/cross-respondent and provide this court with written proof of payment. Should respondent/cross-appellant object to any costs in the invoice, she shall serve and file an objection, in this court, within 15 days of service of the invoice. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 11 days from service of the objection to file any response. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | 19-32277
|
07/31/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Verified Bill of Costs to Prepare Appendix. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC) | | 19-32336
|
08/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross- Appellant's Request for an Extension to File an Objection to Verified Bill of Costs to Prepare Appendix and Objection to Verified Bill of Costs to Prepare Appendix. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | 19-34695
|
08/19/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's motion for an extension of time until August 19, 2019, to file an objection to appellant/cross-respondent's verified bill of costs is granted. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | 19-34745
|
08/21/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Objection. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC) | | 19-35132
|
08/26/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On April 30, 2019, appellant/cross-respondent filed a motion pursuant to NRAP 30(h) seeking costs in the amount of $2,251.60. Having considered the parties' pleadings in this case, we tax costs against respondent/cross-appellant in the sum of $2,251.60 in favor of appellant/cross-respondent. We direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur in this appeal forthwith. fn1 [To the extent appellant/cross-respondent seeks $6,412.66, as requested in the second motion for costs filed on July 3, 2019, that request is denied.] Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | 19-35620
|
08/26/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | 19-35624
|
08/26/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 71147/71994. (SC). | | |
09/06/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2019. (SC) | | 19-35624
|