Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71621
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (BAKER (JEFFREY))Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79328
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C303315Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/03/2017 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:William S. Boyd School of Law - UNLV
Submission Date:10/03/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/02/2016Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/02/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-34205
11/02/2016MotionFiled Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the District Court.16-34206
11/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.16-34208
12/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. Having reviewed the documents on file herein, we conclude that a stay is warranted pending our further consideration of the writ petition, and we therefore grant the motion. The proceedings against Jeffrey Lynn Baker in District Court Case No. C-14-303315-1 are stayed pending further order of this court.16-37187
12/16/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplement to the Appendix and Directing Answer. Supplemental Appendix due: 30 days. Answer due: 20 days from the filing of the supplemental appendix.16-39103
12/20/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/05/15. To Court Reporter: Yvette Sison.16-39586
12/20/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/20/15. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt.16-39589
01/06/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/20/15.17-00473
01/10/2017AppendixFiled Appendix Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix17-00774
01/30/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-03191
02/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: March 1, 2017.17-03770
03/01/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest on Behalf of Respondent's Motion for Extension to File Answer to petition.17-07017
03/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: April 5, 2017.17-07844
04/05/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative Mandamus.17-11393
06/26/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-21037
08/08/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, October 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes at Boyd School of Law.17-26390
09/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-32377
09/28/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Authority.17-33089
09/29/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Request from the Las Vegas Review-Journal to Shoot Still Photography and Video of the Oral Argument Scheduled for October 3, 2017.17-33253
10/02/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A timely request has been made by Colton Lochhead of the Las Vegas Review-Journal seeking access to the Supreme Court of Nevada for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held October 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., in the above-entitled matter; and counsel for the parties having been advised of the request, SCR 230; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted to Colton Lochhead of the Las Vegas Review-Journal for photographic or electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matters, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation.17-33295
10/02/2017MotionFiled Request of the State Bar of Nevada to Take Photos and Video of Oral Arguments.17-33313
10/02/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A timely request has been made by Jim Shilander of the State Bar of Nevada seeking access to the Supreme Court of Nevada for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held October 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., in the above-entitled matter; and counsel for the parties having been advised of the request, SCR 230; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted to Jim Shilander of the State Bar of Nevada for photographic or electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matters, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation.17-33373
10/03/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
03/01/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate its order denying the State's motion to admit C.J.'s testimony and enter and order consistent with this opinion. Fn1{ having resolved this writ petition, we lift the stay entered on December 1, 2016.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 13. EN BANC18-08130
03/01/2018WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Deputy District Attorney Ryan J. MacDonald for service upon Judge Jennifer P. Togliatti.18-08236
03/09/2018WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Jennifer Togliatti on March 6, 2018.18-09395
03/26/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-11603
03/26/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.