Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71846
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF NELSON COHENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/08/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. Bar Matter.
12/08/2016Petition/BarFiled Petition/Temporary Suspension.16-38011
12/13/2016Petition/BarFiled Opposition to petition for Temporary Suspension pursuant to SCR 102(4).16-38479
01/20/2017Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Granting Petition for Temporary Suspension. "Attorney Nelson Cohen is temporarily suspended from the practice of law, pending resolution of formal disciplinary proceedings against him." Fn2[This matter was originally docketed as confidential. because formal disciplinary proceedings have been initiated and are currently pending, and because we are granting this petition, this matter is now open to the public.]EN BANC17-02286
01/23/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order Granting Petition for Temporary Suspension.17-02424
02/14/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-05305