Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/02/2017 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
02/02/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-03884
|
02/02/2017 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 99979 returned to McDonald Carano Wilson. | | |
02/02/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 17-03886
|
02/03/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-04055
|
02/10/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb. | | 17-04872
|
02/15/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries | | 17-05369
|
02/23/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 17-06254
|
02/23/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amended Certificate of Service re: Docketing Statement. | | 17-06255
|
02/24/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Docketing Statement. | | 17-06445
|
02/24/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 24, 2017 at 2:00 pm. | | 17-06581
|
02/28/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-06871
|
03/07/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-07652
|
03/07/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. | | 17-07713
|
03/27/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 17-10188
|
03/28/2017 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 17-10386
|
04/12/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/17/17. To Court Reporter: Gail Wilsey. | | 17-12151
|
04/17/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-12710
|
05/08/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gail Willsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/17/17. | | 17-15241
|
05/16/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-16439
|
06/08/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 10, 2017. | | 17-19009
|
07/11/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Brief is not double-spaced. NRAP 32(a)(4)). | | 17-22851
|
07/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volumes 1-4. | | 17-22852
|
07/11/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-23032
|
08/10/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 17-26822
|
09/05/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: September 25, 2017. | | 17-29643
|
09/26/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-32571
|
09/26/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/07/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Change of Address (Joseph F. Becker). | | 17-42252
|
12/27/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-44548
|
01/22/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 18-02819
|
02/16/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-06437
|
03/07/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
10/18/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. Stiglich, J., with whom Hardesty and Parraguirre, JJ., agree, dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 81. EN BANC | | 18-40944
|
11/06/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 18-903063
|
11/06/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Adam D. Hosmer-Henner. (SC) | | |
11/14/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Deanna Forbush and Nicholas Wieczorek in place of Joseph Becker as counsel for Respondent). (SC) | | 18-904122
|
11/16/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. (SC) | | 18-904492
|
11/29/2018 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
12/04/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents Answer To Petition For Rehearing. (SC) | | 18-906795
|
12/24/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Stiglich, J., with whom Hardesty, J., agrees, dissenting. fn1[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] (SC) | | 18-910083
|
01/22/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-03286
|
01/22/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
02/12/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 23, 2019. (SC) | | 19-03286
|