Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/10/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
04/10/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 17-11837
|
04/10/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 17-11842
|
04/25/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Anat Levy & Associates. Check no. 2446. | | |
04/25/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 17-13692
|
04/27/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 17-13971
|
05/08/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 17-15223
|
05/09/2017 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 17-15468
|
05/15/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-16045
|
05/30/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 17-17923
|
08/02/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 21, 2017. | | 17-25750
|
08/21/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Certificate of compliance does not comply with NRAP 32(a)(9)). | | 17-27915
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. I. | | 17-27917
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. II. | | 17-27920
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. III. | | 17-27925
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. IV. | | 17-27926
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. V. | | 17-27928
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. VI. | | 17-27956
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. VII. | | 17-27958
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. VIII. | | 17-27959
|
08/21/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix, Vol. IX. | | 17-27960
|
08/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. | | 17-27990
|
09/19/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Answering Brief by 30 Days (First Request) Response Requested by September 19, 2017. | | 17-31577
|
09/19/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: October 20, 2017. | | 17-31597
|
09/29/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 72778/72819/73838. | | 17-33125
|
10/11/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Enlarge by One Week the Deadline to File a Response to Non-Party's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. | | 17-34571
|
10/12/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Deadline for Answering Brief. | | 17-34725
|
10/19/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Answering and Reply Briefs (Second Request) Response Requested by October 19, 2017. | | 17-35872
|
10/20/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Respondent's Motion to Extend Deadline for Answering Brief. | | 17-35957
|
10/23/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. The clerk shall file the opposition to motion to consolidate received on October 17, 2017. Brandon Paul Saiter shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply. | | 17-36167
|
10/23/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition (In Part) to Non-Party's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. | | 17-36169
|
11/01/2017 | Motion | Filed Reply to Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Appeals. | | 17-37336
|
11/08/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents in Docket No. 72778 shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve either the answering brief or a properly supported motion for an extension of time. Appellant in Docket No. 72819 has filed motions to consolidate these three appeals. We deny the motion at this time. fn1[Given this order, we take no action on the motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief filed on October 12, 2017.] fn2[The stipulation for an extension of time in Docket No. 73838 is approved. The clerk shall file the partial opposition to the motion to consolidate received on October 18, 2017.] Nos. 72778/72819/73838. | | 17-38413
|
02/07/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 18-05193
|
02/07/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume I. | | 18-05194
|
02/07/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume II. | | 18-05196
|
02/07/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume III. | | 18-05197
|
02/07/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume IV. | | 18-05198
|
02/07/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume V. | | 18-05199
|
02/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Petitioners. | | 18-07225
|
03/06/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Reply Brief by 30 Days (First Request). | | 18-08690
|
03/06/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 9, 2018. | | 18-08703
|
03/06/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's 'Motion of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Petitioners.' | | 18-08775
|
03/07/2018 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Motion of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. | | 18-08962
|
03/07/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Declaration of Anat Levy in Reply to Respondents' Opposition to the Filing of an Amicus Brief by the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and the Nevada Press Association. | | 18-09094
|
03/08/2018 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's Notice of Errata Regarding Reply in Support of Motion of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief (In Support of Neither Party). | | 18-09133
|
04/09/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. | | 18-13470
|
04/09/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/19/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association have filed an untimely motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of neither party. The motion is denied. The clerk shall reject the proposed brief of amicus curiae received on February 23, 2018. Respondents' request to sanction appellant Steve Sanson, counsel for appellant, and counsel for proposed amicus curiae is denied. | | 18-15083
|
07/25/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument. | | 18-28497
|
08/22/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, October 12, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-32729
|
08/23/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. On August 22, 2018, a notice was entered scheduling this matter for oral argument on October 12, 2018. That notice was entered in error. Accordingly, the oral argument scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas is vacated. | | 18-32830
|
09/10/2018 | Other | Justice Michael A. Cherry disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
09/10/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On April 19, 2018, this court denied an untimely motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of neither party filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association. Upon further consideration, we conclude that briefing by amicus curiae would be of assistance. The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association are invited to participate as amicus curiae in this proceeding and to file a brief addressing the issues raised in this appeal. The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Nevada Press Association Amicus Curiae Briefs due: 30 days. appellants and respondents shall have 30 days from service of the amicus brief to submit supplemental briefs in response to the brief filed by amicus curiae. Furthermore, amicus curiae are invited to participate in the oral argument of this matter. | | 18-35134
|
10/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. | | 18-39900
|
11/14/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Supplement Brief to Answering Brief re: Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (SC) | | 18-904063
|
12/04/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, January 9, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-906968
|
12/17/2018 | Other | Justice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties | | |
12/21/2018 | Other | Judge Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
12/24/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 18-910063
|
01/02/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Joshua P. Gilmore will Appear on Behalf of Respondents). (SC) | | 19-00227
|
01/03/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on January 9, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and the Nevada Press Association, amicus curiae were previously permitted to file an amicus brief and invited to participate in the oral argument in this matter. Accordingly, in addition to the 30 minutes previously allotted to the parties, amicus shall have 5 minutes to present oral argument respecting the position of amicus. The oral argument shall now be limited to a total of 35 minutes. (SC). | | 19-00399
|
01/03/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press' Notice of Supplemental Authority and of Intent Not to Attend Oral Argument. (SC) | | 19-00439
|
01/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. On January 3, 2019, this court entered an order allowing amicus to participate in oral argument in this matter on January 9, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. On that same day, amicus filed a notice of supplemental authority and intent not to attend oral argument. Accordingly, amicus will not participate in argument. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes, with appellants and respondents each afforded 15 minutes for argument. (SC). | | 19-00851
|
01/09/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |
01/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Addressing this Court's Requests During Oral Argument. (SC) | | 19-02087
|
01/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to File a Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 19-03165
|
01/30/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file a supplemental brief addressing inquiries this court made during oral argument in this matter. The motion is granted in part. Respondent's Revised Supplemental Brief due: 5 days; Appellant's shall have 5 days from the filing and service of respondents' revised supplemental brief to file a similarly limited responding brief. (SC). | | 19-04583
|
02/07/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief Addressing this Court's Request During Oral Argument. (SC) | | 19-05875
|
02/15/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Response to Respondents' Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 19-07240
|
02/19/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix in Support of Appellants' Response to Respondents' Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 19-07562
|
04/05/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Recusal. I have no personal bias or prejudice concerning any of the parties to this proceeding, nor do I possess any personal knowledge of the facts that are in dispute in this proceeding. However, I believe my impartiality might reasonably questioned because of the above described relationship with VIPI. Accordingly, I have decided to recuse myself voluntarily. (SC). | | 19-15009
|
04/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order Granting Bailey Kennedy Leave to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Respondents. (SC) | | 19-18957
|
05/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove Bailey Kennedy as counsel of record for respondents. Respondents shall remain represented by the Abrams & Mayo Law Firm. (SC) | | 19-20028
|
02/21/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversing and Remanding. "We REVERSE the district court's order denying the anti-SLAPP motion to dismiss, and REMAND for further proceedings consistent with this order and pursuant to NRS 41.660(3)(b)." fn3 [The Honorable Elissa Cadish, Justice, and the Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] En Banc. (SC). | | 20-07108
|
03/10/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-09581
|
03/10/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Jennifer V. Abrams. (SC) | | |
04/02/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [The Honorable Elissa Cadish, Justice, and the Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] (SC). | | 20-12624
|
04/27/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-15810
|
04/27/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/13/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 30, 2020. (SC) | | 20-15810
|