Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/13/2017 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
06/13/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-19562
|
06/21/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 17-20529
|
06/28/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 17-21461
|
07/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 73223/73462. | | 17-23720
|
07/18/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. | | 17-23891
|
07/24/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 73223/73462. | | 17-24329
|
10/11/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-34510
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume 1. | | 17-34511
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume 2. | | 17-34573
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume 3. | | 17-34574
|
10/11/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Exhibit. | | 17-34607
|
10/12/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant and Petitioners have filed motions to consolidate these matters. We deny the motion to consolidate without prejudice. Nos. 73223/73462. | | 17-34893
|
10/12/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Exhibit. | | 17-34931
|
10/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Strike. | | 17-35012
|
10/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Exhibit. | | 17-35236
|
10/18/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion to Strike. | | 17-35638
|
10/20/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike. | | 17-36057
|
11/07/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. We grant the motion to file the exhibit and direct the clerk of this court to file Exhibit 1 to appellant's opening brief, received on October 11, 2017. Respondent has also filed a motion to strike the reference to Exhibit 1 found at page 23, line 2-6 and page 23, footnote 9 of appellant's opening brief. We deny the motion to strike. | | 17-38269
|
11/07/2017 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit 1 to Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-38270
|
11/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 17-38867
|
11/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief. | | 17-39589
|
11/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 17-39643
|
11/22/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: January 9, 2018. | | 17-40424
|
01/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 18-01043
|
01/10/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to State's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 18-01412
|
01/11/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Second Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 18-01596
|
01/18/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Answering Brief due: 11 days. | | 18-02432
|
01/30/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 18-04106
|
02/14/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-06097
|
02/14/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
02/14/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-06148
|
02/16/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Second Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-06439
|
02/23/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Response to Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-07099
|
02/23/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-07222
|
02/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Strike Response to Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-07229
|
02/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Strike Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-07267
|
02/26/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-07510
|
03/01/2018 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike Response to State's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-08306
|
03/01/2018 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike Response to Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-08307
|
03/05/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Third Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-08445
|
03/05/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-08446
|
03/05/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Response to Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-08450
|
03/06/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-08793
|
03/06/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Response to Third Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-08869
|
03/07/2018 | Motion | Filed Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-09108
|
03/07/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike Response to Third Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-09109
|
03/14/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Response to Third Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 18-09925
|
05/15/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-18572
|
12/17/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Third Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC) | | 18-909110
|
05/31/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Fourth Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC) | | |
09/20/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [There are multiple pending motions in this case, filed by both parties, requesting that this court strike documents filed by the other party and/or rebuke the other party's attorney. We decline to take action on those motions.] En Banc. (SC). | | 19-39317
|
10/15/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-42551
|
10/15/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/01/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 18, 2019. (SC) | | 19-42551
|
12/16/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice US Supreme Court (extension of time within which to file a petition for writ of certiorari). (SC) | | 19-50860
|
02/21/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on February 11, 2020 and placed on the docket as Case No. 19-7680. (SC) | | 20-07174
|
04/27/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SC) | | 20-15961
|