Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/20/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Tory M. Pankopf. Check no. 5913. | | |
06/20/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-20458
|
06/20/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 17-20462
|
06/21/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (James Walsh as counsel for the Respondent Rosehill, LLC). | | 17-20610
|
06/23/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb. | | 17-21001
|
07/18/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for week of August 18. 2017. | | 17-23821
|
07/18/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | | 17-23867
|
08/04/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court issued a notice directing appellants to file the docketing statement. To date, appellants have failed to comply with that notice. Docketing Statement due: 10 days. | | 17-26019
|
08/08/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-26224
|
08/11/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-26901
|
08/22/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 17-28165
|
08/22/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 17-28179
|
08/23/2017 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 17-28352
|
09/22/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 17-32161
|
09/25/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Amended Docketing Statement. Due: 20 days. | | 17-32405
|
10/03/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for CD-Rom Containing Audio File of Proceeding and Notice of Transcription of Same. | | 17-33526
|
10/09/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-34138
|
11/07/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Amended Docketing Statement due: 11 days. | | 17-38108
|
11/07/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-38296
|
11/20/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Request for Notice of Counsel (Thomas N. Beckom hereby Requests Notice as Counsel for Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation). | | 17-39929
|
11/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief). | | 17-40351
|
11/22/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 21, 2017. | | 17-40364
|
11/22/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. | | 17-40395
|
12/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 17-44444
|
12/29/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Completion and Delivery of Transcript. | | 17-44923
|
01/03/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 18-00231
|
05/09/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Supplemental Briefs. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve their supplemental brief. Respondents shall have 10 days from service of appellants' brief to file and serve their supplemental brief. The supplemental briefs shall not exceed 15 pages or 7,000 words. | | 18-17587
|
05/25/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. | | 18-20128
|
05/30/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: June 7, 2018. Respondents shall have 10 days from service of appellant's brief to file and serve their supplemental brief. | | 18-20465
|
06/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion For Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. | | 18-22891
|
06/26/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the supplemental brief received on June 15, 2018. Respondent shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve their supplemental brief. | | 18-24288
|
06/26/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief to Order to Show Cause. | | 18-24292
|
07/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Response to the Supplemental Brief Responding to this Court's Order to Show Cause. | | 18-26342
|
07/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent Rosehill LLC's Supplemental Brief. (In Response to Order to Show Cause filed May 9, 2018.) | | 18-26440
|
12/27/2018 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Appeal may proceed." Appellants: Opening brief and Appendix due: 60 days. Before: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 105. NNP18-KP/MG/JH (SC) | | 18-910516
|
02/25/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 11, 2019. (SC). | | 19-08557
|
03/12/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-10904
|
03/13/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent Rosehill, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-11075
|
03/13/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Quality Loan Service Corp.'s Joinder to Rosehill, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-11122
|
04/04/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellants have filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. Respondents oppose the motion and move to dismiss this appeal. Despite appellants' failure to oppose the dismissal motions, this court denies the motions at this time. Appellants shall have until April 10, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 19-14652
|
04/10/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for 1-Day Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-15776
|
04/11/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) (STRICKEN PER 04/16/19 ORDER). | | |
04/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1 & 2. (SC) | | 19-16046
|
04/16/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, the motion for an extension of time filed on April 10, 2019, is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on April 11, 2019. However, the opening brief is deficient because it lacks a disclosure and a routing statement. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on April 11, 2019. Appellants' Amended Opening Brief due: 7 days. (SC). | | 19-16563
|
04/18/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-17141
|
04/18/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Appellant's Opening Brief). (SC) | | 19-17179
|
04/26/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service (Opening Brief and Excerpts of Record). (SC) | | 19-18514
|
05/17/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Answering Brief due: June 3, 2019. (SC). | | 19-21771
|
05/17/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Rosehill, LLC's Answering Brief due: June 3, 2019. (SC). | | 19-21775
|
06/03/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-24042
|
06/03/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Certificate of Service (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 19-24059
|
06/03/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent Rosehill, LLC's Joinder to Respondent Quality Loan Service, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-24072
|
08/14/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Brief Filed. (SC) | | |
02/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC). | | 20-05197
|
02/27/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC). | | 20-07912
|
03/03/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 20-08571
|
03/10/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 20-09521
|
03/20/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 20-10931
|
03/23/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-11054
|
03/23/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/25/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC). | | 20-11518
|
04/22/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 24, 2020. (SC) | | 20-11054
|