Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/11/2017 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
07/11/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-22935
|
07/11/2017 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. | | |
07/12/2017 | Filing Fee | Cross-Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | | |
07/12/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 17-23227
|
07/20/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice - Amended Notice of Appeal. The State appeals the May 31, 2017, order granting in part the fourth petition for writ of habeas corpus and the amended judgment of conviction filed on July 12, 2017. | | 17-24094
|
07/20/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 17-24115
|
08/01/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 17-25593
|
08/15/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 17-27218
|
08/15/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 17-27221
|
08/22/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 17-28075
|
08/23/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/19/17. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay. | | 17-28361
|
10/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Consolidation. Nos. 73431/73444. | | 17-33941
|
10/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Request for Extension of Time (Opposition to Motion for Consolidation). | | 17-35156
|
10/18/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. William Witter shall have until October 30, 2017, to file and serve the opposition to the State's motions to consolidate these appeals. Nos. 73431/73444. | | 17-35631
|
10/31/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Consolidation. Nos. 73431/73444. | | 17-37270
|
10/31/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Dismiss State's Notice of Appeal and Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 17-37272
|
10/31/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Suspend Briefing in Docket Nos 73431 and 73444. | | 17-37273
|
11/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Motion to Dismiss State's Notice of Appeal and Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 17-37662
|
11/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Non-Opposition to Motion to Suspend Briefing. | | 17-37692
|
11/08/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 17-38579
|
11/09/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Request for Extension of Time (Reply to the State's Response to Motion to Dismiss State's Notice of Appeal and Amended Notice of Appeal). | | 17-38602
|
11/17/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. William Witter's motion for an extension of time to file a reply to the State's opposition to Witter's motion to dismiss is granted. Reply due: November 22, 2017. Additionally, Witter's unopposed motion to suspend the briefing schedule is granted. Briefing Suspended. | | 17-39817
|
11/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Notice of Appeal and Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 17-40340
|
02/23/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal, Modifying Caption, and Reinstating Briefing. Witter's motion to dismiss the State's appeal and amended appeal is granted, and the State's appeal is dismissed. Witter's appeal from the district court's order denying his postconviction petition for writ of habeas corpus shall proceed. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption in this appeal to designate William Lester Witter as the appellant, and the State of Nevada as the respondent. Witter's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. fn1[Having considered the State's motion to consolidate this appeal with the appeal in Docket No. 73444, the motion is denied.] fn2[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in this matter.] | | 18-07115
|
04/24/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion Request for Extension of Time (Opening Brief). | | 18-15555
|
05/03/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 25, 2018. | | 18-16792
|
06/25/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay Appeal. | | 18-24223
|
07/23/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The deadline to file briefs in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Status Report due: 120 days. | | 18-28054
|
11/20/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Report on Status of Proceedings. (SC) | | 18-905060
|
11/29/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file a report regarding the status of the appeal in Docket No. 73444. (SC) | | 18-906207
|
02/27/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Report on Status of Proceedings. (SC) | | 19-09055
|
11/14/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The briefing schedule in this appeal has been suspended pending the resolution of a related appeal in Docket No. 73444. An opinion affirming was entered in Docket No. 73444 on November 14, 2019. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether he wishes to proceed with the instant appeal. (SC) | | 19-46748
|
11/26/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Intent to Proceed. (SC) | | 19-48344
|
12/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC). | | 19-49969
|
02/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time (Opening Brief). (SC) | | 20-05421
|
02/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 7, 2020. (SC). | | 20-06639
|
04/02/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Co-Counsel (Stacy M. Newman, Assistant Federal Public Defender as co-counsel for Appellant). (SC) | | 20-12703
|
04/07/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-13063
|
04/07/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-13070
|
05/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 20-17264
|
05/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until July 6, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-18210
|
06/30/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC). | | 20-24259
|
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol.1. (SC). | | 20-24261
|
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC). | | 20-24262
|
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol. 3. (SC). | | 20-24263
|
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol. 4. (SC). | | 20-24264
|
07/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-27518
|
07/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 28, 2020. (SC) | | 20-27887
|
09/28/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-35569
|
05/06/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 21-12997
|
06/01/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-15479
|
06/01/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/18/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-15479
|