Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/17/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | | |
08/17/2017 | Order/Incoming | Filed Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon, U.S. District Court Judge. | | 17-27545
|
08/17/2017 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
09/11/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Accepting Certified Question, Directing Briefing and Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief addressing the certified question. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date the opening brief is served to file and serve an answering brief. Appellant shall then have 20 days from the date the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply brief. Appellant and respondents shall each tender to the clerk of this court, within 11 days from the date of this order, the sum of $125, representing half of the filing fee. The parties may submit a joint appendix containing any documents they believe are necessary for this court to resolve the certified question. fn1[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] | | 17-30338
|
09/20/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $125.00 from Christian, Kravitz, Dichter, Johnson & Sluga LLC. Check no. 4179. | | |
09/27/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Correction of Attorney Business and Contact Information (Maria Louise Cousineau). | | 17-32940
|
10/10/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant Century Surety Company's Motion to Associate Counsel (J. Ric Gass, ESQ). | | 17-34447
|
10/10/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant Century Surety Company's Motion to Associate Counsel (Michael Yellin, ESQ). | | 17-34448
|
10/11/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Brief is not double Spaced, Not 1 Inch on all 4 sides). | | 17-34665
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1. | | 17-34668
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2. | | 17-34669
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3. | | 17-34670
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 4. | | 17-34671
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 5. | | 17-34672
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 6. | | 17-34673
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 7. | | 17-34674
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 8. | | 17-34675
|
10/11/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 9. | | 17-34690
|
10/11/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | |
10/12/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-34900
|
10/18/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Federation of Defense & Corporate Counsel in Support of Appellant. | | 17-35625
|
10/18/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Associate and Directing Payment of Filing Fee. Mr. Yellin and Mr. Gass shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellant in this matter. Respondents shall have 11 days from the date of this order to remit the sum of $125 to this court, representing their half of the filing fee. | | 17-35658
|
10/20/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Complex Insurance Claims Litigation Association, American Insurance Association, and Property Casualty Insurers Association of America. | | 17-36051
|
10/25/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answering Brief. | | 17-36711
|
10/30/2017 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's Motion to Associate Laura Anne Foggan as Counsel. | | 17-36960
|
11/07/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents shall have 5 days form the date of this order to remit the sum of $125 to this court, representing their half of the filing fee. We will take no action on respondents' motion for an extension of time to file their answering brief until the filing fee is paid. | | 17-38125
|
11/08/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the amicus brief received on October 18, 2017. The clerk shall file the amicus brief received on October 20, 2017. Attorney Laura Anne Foggan shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus curiae CICLA, AIA, and PCI in this matter. Nevada attorney Joel D. Henriod of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. Foggan in this appeal. | | 17-38408
|
11/08/2017 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief of the Federation of Defense & Corporate Counsel in Support of Appellant. | | 17-38409
|
11/08/2017 | Brief | Filed Amici Curiae Brief of Complex Insurance Claims Litigation Association, American Insurance Association, and Property Casualty Insurers Association of America. | | 17-38410
|
11/09/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $125.00 from Eglet Prince. Check no. 24112. (Respondent) | | |
11/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondent's to File their Answering Brief. | | 17-39596
|
11/20/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties have filed a stipulation for an extension of time to file the answering brief. We treat the stipulation as a motion, and cause appearing, grant it. Answering Brief due: January 5, 2018. fn1[In light of this order, we take no action on the extension motion filed on October 25, 2017.] | | 17-39983
|
01/08/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 18-00795
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 1. | | 18-00798
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 2. | | 18-00799
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 3. | | 18-00800
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 4. | | 18-00801
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 5. | | 18-00802
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 6. | | 18-00803
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 7. | | 18-00804
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 8. | | 18-00805
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 9. | | 18-00806
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 10. | | 18-00807
|
01/08/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief Vol. 11. | | 18-00808
|
01/18/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of The Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondents. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 02/01/18 ORDER). | | 18-02549
|
01/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant Century Surety Company's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondents. | | 18-03249
|
01/26/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-03760
|
01/26/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
01/29/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellant Century Surety Company's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondents. | | 18-03863
|
01/30/2018 | Motion | Filed Reply to Opposition to the Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondents. | | 18-04156
|
01/30/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-04213
|
02/01/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Nevada Justice Association has filed a motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of respondents. We grant the motion. The clerk shall detach the amicus brief from the motion filed January 18, 2018, and file it separately. | | 18-04399
|
02/01/2018 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondents. | | 18-04403
|
03/21/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-11059
|
04/23/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument. | | 18-15452
|
04/25/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, June 4, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 18-15828
|
05/21/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-19307
|
06/04/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-20992
|
06/04/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
06/07/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 18-21709
|
12/13/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Question answered." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Stiglich. Fn1{ The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, is disqualified from participation in the decision of this matter.] 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 100. EN BANC (SC) | | 18-908481
|
01/07/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-00816
|
01/07/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/12/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by U.S. District Court Clerk on April 2, 2019. (SC) | | 19-00816
|